Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. 84.115 Acres of Land in Marion County Florida et al
Plaintiff: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC
Defendant: 84.115 Acres of Land in Marion County Florida, AZ Ocala Ranch, LLC, Will Bellamy and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 5:2016cv00208
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:0717
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER striking 37 Defendant AZ Ocala Ranch's recent filing, which includes a notice of Rule26(a)(1) initial disclosures. The Clerk is directed to remove the documents from the docket, and return them to counsel with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/14/2016. (CAB)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/31/2016. (LN)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 15 Defendants AZ Ocala Ranch, LLC and Will Bellamy's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/9/2016. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. 84.115 Acres of Land in Marion County Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Kurtis T. Bauerle
Represented By: Bruce M. Harris
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Edgar Lopez
Represented By: Felecia G. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84.115 Acres of Land in Marion County Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZ Ocala Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Blake H. Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Bellamy
Represented By: Blake H. Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Represented By: Blake H. Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?