Timmons v. Secretary of the U.S. Departmnet of Helath and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: William Timmons, Jr.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Matthew G. Whitaker and Maria Chapa Lopez
Case Number: 5:2018cv00595
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/16/2019. (LMF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Maria Chapa Lopez, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Matthew G. Whitaker. (HAQ)
December 14, 2018 Received a completed copies of summons, 285 forms and copies of complaints for each defendant. (HAQ)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/6/2018. (AD)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall send service documents to Plaintiff who shall return them to the Clerk on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/3/2018. (AR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Timmons, Jr. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maria Chapa Lopez, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Matthew G. Whitaker filed by William Timmons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmons v. Secretary of the U.S. Departmnet of Helath and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Chapa Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Timmons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?