United States v. Village Pest Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Village Pest Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00624
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States. Related case(s): No (Hervey, Mary)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Village Pest Services, Inc.. Related case(s): no (RLK)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Village Pest Services, Inc..(RLK)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 12/12/2018 by United States as to Village Pest Services, Inc.. (Hervey, Mary)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Village Pest Services, Inc.. (LAB)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/10/2018. (AD)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:18-cv-624-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Village Pest Services, Inc. filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hervey, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Village Pest Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Pest Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Mary Apostolakos Hervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?