Roor International BV et al v. Prapti Five, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Prapti Five, LLC d/b/a One Love Smoke Shop, Pratiksha Patel and Prapti Five, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00010
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Philip R Lammens
1 Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Pratiksha Patel. (LAB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Prapti Five, LLC. (LAB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LAB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2019. (AC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-10-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14995018) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Prapti Five, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prapti Five, LLC d/b/a One Love Smoke Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratiksha Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prapti Five, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?