Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. The Surf Restaurant, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, ANIWI MUSIC, LLC, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, 4U2ASKY Entertainment Inc., Lost Boys Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., APOLLINAIRE MUSIC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and House of Bryant Publications, LLC
Defendant: THE SURF RESTAURANT, LLC, DENNIS ROLLKA and MIKE NARDONE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00046
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. This cause is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/18/2019. (SMB)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by 4U2ASKY Entertainment Inc., ANIWI MUSIC, LLC, Apollinaire Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, House of Bryant Publications, LLC, Lost Boys Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Messa, Zachary)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Copyright Report sent to Washington with Complaint and Civil Docket Sheet. (LAB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Mike Nardone. (LAB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Dennis Rollka. (LAB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to The Surf Restaurant, LLC. (LAB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/5/2019. (AC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-46-Oc-30PRL. (NAS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Nardone, Dennis Rollka and The Surf Restaurant, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15085420) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Surf, #4 Proposed Summons Summons Rollka, #5 Proposed Summons Summons Nardone)(Messa, Zachary) Modified on 2/5/2019 (LAB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. The Surf Restaurant, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibb Brothers Music
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIWI MUSIC, LLC
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R and R Nomad Publishing Company
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4U2ASKY Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs, LLC
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APOLLINAIRE MUSIC
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Bryant Publications, LLC
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SURF RESTAURANT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS ROLLKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE NARDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?