Borchers v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: George E. Borchers
Defendant: Hon Robert L. Wilkie
Case Number: 5:2019cv00157
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction titled "Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment" filed by George E. Borchers. (HAQ)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #5) is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff George Borchers bringing the claim in the proper jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/3/2019. (SMB)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to order to show cause re , #8 Order to show cause, and Response to motion to dismiss #5 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction titled as "Notice of Motion, Motion, Memorandum in Support of Motion..." filed by George E. Borchers. (RLK)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response to #5 Defendant's Motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order or shall SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen (14) days of this Order why the Court should not consider said Motion without a response by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/22/2019. (SMB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George E. Borchers. Related case(s): No (HAQ)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by George E. Borchers.(HAQ)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Robert L. Wilkie. (Ragler, Phillip)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/28/2019. (AC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert L. Wilkie. Related case(s): yes (Ragler, Phillip)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-157-Oca-30PRL. (SJB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Citrus County Court, case number 2019-SC-00212 filed in State Court on 02/12/2019. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borchers v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George E. Borchers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Robert L. Wilkie
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?