Marion County, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Marion County, Florida
Defendant: SPECGX, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Actavis, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., CVS Health Corp., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00165
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/26/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Walmart, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by Marion County, Florida as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/17/19 by Marion County, Florida as to SPECGX, LLC. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/18/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/11/19 by Marion County, Florida as to McKesson Corporation. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/17/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Mallinckrodt LLC. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Johnson & Johnson. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Cardinal Health, Inc. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/7/19 by Marion County, Florida as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/7/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/9/19 by Marion County, Florida as to CVS Health Corp.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Actavis, LLC. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Cephalon, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/15/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Allergan Finance LLC. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/15/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Allergan PLC. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/20/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/24/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/30/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/6/19 by Marion County, Florida as to Noramco, Inc.. (Romano, Eric)
April 18, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45272, filed on 4/17/19. (LMF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel conditional transfer order (CTO-88) transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number: 2804. (LMF)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/3/2019. (SMB)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Marion County, Florida to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Romano, Eric) Modified on 4/4/2019 (LAB).
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-165-Oca-30PRL. (SJB)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15313114) filed by Marion County, Florida.(Romano, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion County, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion County, Florida
Represented By: Eric Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?