Plawecki v. King

Plaintiff: Daniel Plawecki
Defendant: Jody King and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00181
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant Jody King's Motion to Dismiss Jody King and Substituting the United States of America as Defendant (Doc. #4) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute the United States of America as Defendant and terminate Jody King from this action. Defendant the United States' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #3) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SMB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to show cause filed by Daniel Plawecki. (RLK)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response to #3, #4 Defendant's motions within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order or shall SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen (14) days of this Order why the Court should not consider said Motions without a response by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/3/2019. (SMB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jody King. (Stegeby, Erik)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jody King. Related case(s): no (Stegeby, Erik)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/30/2019. (LMF)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel Plawecki. Related case(s): No (HAQ)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/15/2019. (AC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jody King and Substituting the United States of America as Defendant by Jody King. (Stegeby, Erik)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss State Complaint by Jody King. (Stegeby, Erik)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-181-Oca-30PRL. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the County Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in and for Marion County, case number 19SC000940AX filed in State Court on 2/22/2019. filed by Jody King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stegeby, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plawecki v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody King
Represented By: Erik Kenneth Stegeby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erik Kenneth Stegeby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Plawecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?