Tassa-Racha v. R.T.G. Furniture Corp
Plaintiff: Adelaide Tassa-Racha
Defendant: R.T.G. Furniture Corp
Case Number: 5:2019cv00291
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by R.T.G. Furniture Corp. Related case(s): no (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by R.T.G. Furniture Corp. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
July 22, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for R.T.G. Furniture Corp. Answer due by 8/12/2019. (HAI)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer or response is due by August 12, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/22/2019. (SMB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by R.T.G. Furniture Corp. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 07/01/2019 by Adelaide Tassa-Racha as to R.T.G. Furniture Corp. (HAI)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to R.T.G. Furniture Corp. (HAI)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED 285 Form by Adelaide Tassa-Racha re #3 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency (Birk, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 (HAI).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and directing Plaintiff to submit all service documents on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/17/2019. (AR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Adelaide Tassa-Racha. Summons provided. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.T.G. Furniture Corp with Jury Demand filed by Adelaide Tassa-Racha. (no service copies provided) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tassa-Racha v. R.T.G. Furniture Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaide Tassa-Racha
Represented By: Matthew W. Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.T.G. Furniture Corp
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?