Santivanez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Paul Santivanez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00355
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2019. (MD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00778. File received electronically
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Santivanez' 2241 Habeas Corpus Petition is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Authority by Paul Santivanez. (rg) [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Paul Santivanez.(rf) [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 ****PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS IT WAS DOCKETED IN ERROR***This civil action is opened for statistical purposes only. ALL documents should be filed in criminal case number 5:98-cr-00304-OLG-2. (dtg) Modified on 7/9/2019, to edit text (rf). [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS IT WAS DOCKETED IN ERROR***MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Paul Santivanez.(dtg) Modified on 7/9/2019 , to edit text (rf). [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg) [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (dtg) [Transferred from txwd on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santivanez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Santivanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?