Cruz v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Cruz
Defendant: A. Jones, J Smith, FNU Spearly, J. Lopez, FNU Rodriguez, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON and FNU Hill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00576
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/27/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding emergency filing. The Clerk shall immediately transmit, via email and/or facsimile, a copy of Plaintiff's filings (Doc. 7, 8) and this Order to the warden of the institution at which the inmate is confined, in this case Coleman - USP II, for whatever action may be deemed appropriate in light of the inmate's allegations. This is merely a notification to appropriate officials and not a ruling on the merits of the case or the complaint. The Clerk shall confirm that such notification was received and make an entry on the docket reflecting that such notification was sent to the appropriate officials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/20/2019. (CLF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Alexander Cruz. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court titled "Amended Report to Court" by Alexander Cruz. (RLK)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court titled " Emergency Report to Court" by Alexander Cruz. (RLK)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for copies by Alexander Cruz. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Received confirmation email from Warden at USP Coleman II as to Docs 3 & 4. Motion for preliminary injunction and ORDER REGARDING EMEREGENCY MOTION. (CRR)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING EMEREGENCY MOTION. The clerk shall immediately transmit, via email and/or facsimile, a copy of motion (Doc. 3) and this Order to the Warden of the institution at which the inmate is Confined, in this case USP Coleman II, for whatever action may be deemed appropriate in light of the inmate's allegations. This is merely a notification to appropriate officials and not a ruling on the merits of the case or the complaint. The Clerk shall confirm that such notification was received and make entry on the docket reflecting that such notification was sent to the appropriate officials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/27/2019. (CRR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Alexander Cruz. (RLK)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachement)(RLK)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FNU Hill, A. Jones, J. Lopez, FNU Rodriguez, J Smith, FNU Spearly filed by Alexander Cruz. (no fees paid, no service copies provided)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Spearly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?