Singh v. Secretary, Department of Corrections
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and Florida Attorney General
Petitioner: Kenard Singh
Case Number: 5:2019cv00617
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. and Notice to Petitioner. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. (Marion County). Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(CRR)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Sworn Oath for 2254 Petition by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/30/2019 (HAI).
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (JLC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-617-Oc-37PRL. (SJB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/6/2019 (LMF).
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Kenard Singh. (Reese, Rachael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-16215456) filed by Kenard Singh.(Reese, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenard Singh
Represented By: Rachael Elizabeth Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?