Properties of the Villages, Inc. v. Kranz et al
Defendant: Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Toni McChesney and KD Premier Realty, LLC
Counter Claimant: Christopher Day, Jason Kranz, Angela Kranz, Kathleen Roth and Kelly Shipes
Counter Defendant: Properties of the Villages, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Paul J. Ullom
Case Number: 5:2019cv00647
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying as moot #328 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #272 motion to compel discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/17/2021. (SA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 331 MOTION to Amend/Accept Amended Answers to Writ of Garnishment by Executive Florida Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amd Ans to Writ as to Angie Taylor, #2 Proposed Amd Ans to Writ as to Nanette Elliott, #3 Proposed Amd Ans to Writ as to Angela Kranz, #4 Proposed Amd Ans to Writ as to Christopher Day, #5 Proposed Amd Ans to Writ as to Jason Kranz)(LMF)
September 16, 2021 Filing 330 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Executive Florida Realty, Inc. and MOTION to Strike Exhibit B email attachments to counsel as to Garnishee Executive Florida Realty, Inc by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Email and Answers to Writs)(Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 9/17/2021 (LMF).
September 16, 2021 Filing 329 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Christopher Day by Christopher Ryan Day P.A. (HAI) Modified on 9/17/2021 (LMF).
September 15, 2021 Filing 328 NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #320 Order pdf, #272 MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution and Motion for Attorneys' Fees ; and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission Under Seal (Lauro, John) Modified on 9/16/2021 (SMB).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER setting hearing on #311 claim of exemption for September 29, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. in Ocala Courtroom 1A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/15/2021. (SA)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #317 Motion for Writ of execution. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/15/2021. (SA)
September 14, 2021 Filing 325 RESPONSE re #311 MOTION for Hearing and Claim of Exemption of Defendant, Jason Kranz filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 10, 2021 Filing 324 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Charging Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Against Defendant Christopher Day's Interests in Certain Limited Liability Companies by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Portions of Defendant's Verified Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Records of Florida Division of Corporations)(Muldowney, Patrick)
September 10, 2021 Filing 323 NOTICE of lis pendens by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 9, 2021 Filing 322 MOTION to Compel Defendant Christopher Day's Appearance at a Deposition in Aid of Execution Noticed for September 29, 2021 and for Sanctions by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lauro, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting #309 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/8/2021. (SA) (HAI). (HAI).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER striking Defendants' answers to interrogatories 300, 305, 306 and Defendants' responses to requests for production 301, 307, 308. The Clerk is directed to remove the documents from the docket and return it to the defendants with a copy of this Order. On or before September 15, 2021, Plaintiff shall notify the court if the motion to compel is now moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/8/2021. (SA) Modified on 9/8/2021 (HAI).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying without prejudice #271 CLAIM of Exemption and MOTION for Hearing. The motion may be renewed if appropriate once the case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/8/2021. (SA)
September 7, 2021 Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition re #309 MOTION for Christopher Shipley to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION for hearing filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lauro, John)
September 7, 2021 Filing 317 MOTION for Writ of Execution and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Execution - Dft Jason Kranz, #2 Proposed Writ of Execution - Dft Christopher Day, #3 Proposed Writ of Execution - Dft Angela Kranz, #4 Proposed Writ of Execution - Dft Nanette Elliott)(Muldowney, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 316 RESPONSE re #265 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #262 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #266 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #264 Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 315 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #304 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #310 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #312 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 3, 2021 Filing 314 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 3, 2021 Filing 313 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re 290 EXPARTE MOTION For Continuing Writ of Garnishment Directed to Christopher Ryan Day, P.A. , #294 Writ of garnishment issued Pursuant to Section 77.041(2), Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 3, 2021 Filing 309 NOTICE of Completed Representation or, in the alternative, MOTION for Christopher Shipley to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and MOTION for Hearing by Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz and Angie Taylor. (Shipley, Christopher) Modified on 9/3/2021 (LMF).
September 2, 2021 Filing 312 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Angela Machele Kranz, P.A.. (HAI)
September 2, 2021 Filing 311 CLAIM of Exemption and MOTION for Hearing by Jason Kranz, P.A.. (HAI)
September 2, 2021 Filing 310 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Jason Kranz. (HAI) (HAI).
September 2, 2021 Filing 308 RESPONSE re #199 Notice of appearance Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents in Aid of Execution to Defendant filed by Angela Kranz. (Shipley, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 307 RESPONSE re #199 Notice of appearance Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents in Aid of Execution to Defendant filed by Jason Kranz. (Shipley, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 306 ANSWER to court interrogatories by Angela Kranz. (Shipley, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 305 ANSWER to court interrogatories by Jason Kranz. (Shipley, Christopher)
September 1, 2021 Filing 304 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Angie R. Taylor by Citizens First Bank. (Morrison, Fred)
August 31, 2021 Filing 303 NOTICE canceling Virtual MOTION hearing on CLAIM of Exemption scheduled for 09/03/21. (MJT)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ENDORSED ORDER re #274 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by KD Premier Realty, LLC and #299 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Angie Taylor. In view of the fact that Defendants KD Premier Realty, LLC and Angie Taylor have filed bankruptcy, this matter should be stayed as to these two defendants only. Plaintiff may move to lift the stay as to Defendants KD Premier Realty, LLC and Angie Taylor within fifteen (15) days after it obtains from the Bankruptcy Court an Order lifting the automatic stay. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/31/2021. (SMB)
August 31, 2021 Filing 301 RESPONSE re #196 Notice of appearance Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents in Aid of Execution to Defendant by Christopher Day. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 300 ANSWER to court interrogatories by Christopher Day. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 30, 2021 Filing 299 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Angie Taylor. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 30, 2021 Filing 298 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Local Rule 7.01(c) by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lauro, John)
August 30, 2021 Filing 297 NOTICE of hearing: re: #271 CLAIM of Exemption and MOTION for hearing. Virtual Hearing set for 9/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens via Zoom. (Counsel will receive the meeting invite via email.) Members of the press and public who wish to attend remote hearings must use the web form on the court's internet site: https:// www.flmd.uscourts.gov/webforms/request-remote-access-courtroom-proceedings-press-and-public. (MJT)
August 27, 2021 Filing 296 RESPONSE re #271 MOTION for hearing and Claim for Exemption of Defendant, Angie Taylor filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 295 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re 273 EXPARTE MOTION for Writ of Garnishment Directed to Citizens First Bank Based on Judgment Against Defendant Angie Taylor , #286 Writ of garnishment issued Pursuant to Section 77.041(2), Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 294 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher Ryan Day, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI) (HAI).
August 26, 2021 Filing 293 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #292 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 26, 2021 Filing 292 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Orange Elite Title Agency, LLC. (HAI)
August 24, 2021 Filing 289 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #276 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #265 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #268 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #263 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #267 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #278 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #262 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #277 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #280 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #266 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #264 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #270 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #269 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #279 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 23, 2021 Filing 288 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #283 Response Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 23, 2021 Filing 287 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #284 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 23, 2021 Filing 286 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Citizens First Bank in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 20, 2021 Filing 284 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Truist Bank. (Hendrix, David)
August 20, 2021 Filing 283 RESPONSE re #227 Writ of garnishment issued August 10, 2021 filed by US Realty Hub LLC. (Hennen, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 282 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #257 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #260 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #256 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #258 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #261 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #259 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Pursuant to Section 77.055, Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 19, 2021 Filing 281 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to KD Premier Realty, LLC by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 280 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angela Kranz by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 279 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angie Taylor by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 278 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Christopher Day by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 277 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Jason Kranz by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 276 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Nanette Elliott by Pollard PLLC. (Prater, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 275 CERTIFICATE of service by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #219 Writ of garnishment issued, #248 Writ of garnishment issued, #225 Writ of garnishment issued, #226 Writ of garnishment issued, #227 Writ of garnishment issued, #230 Writ of garnishment issued, 203 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment and Continuing Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant Jason Kranz , #255 Writ of garnishment issued, #216 Writ of garnishment issued, #232 Writ of garnishment issued, #222 Writ of garnishment issued, #247 Writ of garnishment issued, #223 Writ of garnishment issued, 205 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment and Continuing Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant Angela Kranz , 208 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant KD Premier Realty, LLC , #241 Writ of garnishment issued, #231 Writ of garnishment issued, #250 Writ of garnishment issued, #224 Writ of garnishment issued, #221 Writ of garnishment issued, #243 Writ of garnishment issued, #242 Writ of garnishment issued, #245 Writ of garnishment issued, #228 Writ of garnishment issued, #229 Writ of garnishment issued, #220 Writ of garnishment issued, #237 Writ of garnishment issued, #254 Writ of garnishment issued, #246 Writ of garnishment issued, 204 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment and Continuing Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant Christopher Day , #236 Writ of garnishment issued, #249 Writ of garnishment issued, #234 Writ of garnishment issued, 207 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment and Continuing Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant Angie Taylor , 206 EXPARTE MOTION for Writs of Garnishment and Continuing Writs of Garnishment as to Judgment Against Defendant Nanette Elliott , #252 Writ of garnishment issued, #239 Writ of garnishment issued, #218 Writ of garnishment issued, #235 Writ of garnishment issued, #251 Writ of garnishment issued, #253 Writ of garnishment issued, #238 Writ of garnishment issued, #233 Writ of garnishment issued, #244 Writ of garnishment issued, #215 Writ of garnishment issued, #240 Writ of garnishment issued, #217 Writ of garnishment issued Pursuant to Section 77.041(2), Florida Statutes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 19, 2021 Filing 274 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by KD Premier Realty, LLC. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 272 MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution and Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interrogatories to Christopher Day, #2 Exhibit Interrogatories to Jason Kranz, #3 Appendix Interrogatories to Angela Kranz, #4 Exhibit Interrogatories to Angie Taylor, #5 Exhibit Interrogatories to Nanette Elliott, #6 Exhibit Interrogatories to KD Premier Realty, #7 Exhibit Notice of Service of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit RFP to Christopher Day, #9 Exhibit RFP to Jason Kranz, #10 Exhibit RFP to Angela Kranz, #11 Exhibit RFP to Angie Taylor, #12 Exhibit RFP to Nanette Elliott, #13 Exhibit RFP to KD Premier Realty, #14 Exhibit Correspondence between counsel, #15 Exhibit Correspondence between counsel, #16 Exhibit Correspondence between counsel, #17 Appendix Index to Exhibits)(Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
August 18, 2021 Filing 271 RESPONSE re #180 Order - Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing filed by Angie Taylor. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 270 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Nanette Elliott by Citizens First Bank. (Morrison, Fred)
August 18, 2021 Filing 269 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Jason Kranz by Citizens First Bank. (Morrison, Fred)
August 18, 2021 Filing 268 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Angela Kranz by Citizens First Bank. (Morrison, Fred)
August 18, 2021 Filing 267 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment for Christopher Day by Citizens First Bank. (Morrison, Fred)
August 17, 2021 Filing 266 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angela Kranz by Shipley Law Firm. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 265 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Jason Kranz by Shipley Law Firm. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 264 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Nanette Elliott by Shipley Law Firm. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 263 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angie Taylor by Shipley Law Firm. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 262 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Christopher Day by Shipley Law Firm. (Shipley, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving 1 Volume of pleadings (thumb drive) on 8/06/2021 re #185 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 21-11748-A. (ABC)
August 11, 2021 Filing 261 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Nanette Elliott by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 11, 2021 Filing 260 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Jason Kranz by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 11, 2021 Filing 259 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angie Taylor by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 11, 2021 Filing 258 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Angela Kranz by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 11, 2021 Filing 257 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Chris Day by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 11, 2021 Filing 256 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to KD Premier Realty, LLC by Blanchard Merriam Adel Kirkland & Green PA. (Blanchard, Dock)
August 10, 2021 Filing 255 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Meriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A. & Kirkland, P.A. Trust Account in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 254 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 253 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Chirstopher J. Shipley in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 252 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Executive Florida Realty, Inc. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 251 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against KD Premier Realty, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 250 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Angie Renee Taylor, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 249 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 248 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 247 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher J. Shipley, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 246 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Truist Financial Corp. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 245 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Executive Florida Realty, Inc. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 244 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against KD Premier Realty, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 243 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Angie Renee Taylor, P.A, in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 242 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Nanette Elliott, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 241 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 240 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 239 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher J. Shipley, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 238 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Citizens First Bank in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI) (LAB).
August 10, 2021 Filing 237 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Executive Florida Realty in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 236 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Angela Machele Kranz P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 235 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Xena Vallone Realty, Inc. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 234 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 233 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 232 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher J. Shipley in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 231 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Citizens First Bank in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 230 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Executive Florida Realty, Inc. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 229 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Orange Elite Title Agency, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 228 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Orange Title Insurance Agency, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 227 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against US Realty Hub, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 226 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against KD Premier Realty, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 225 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 224 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 223 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher J. Shipley in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 222 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Citizens First Bank in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 221 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jason Kranz PA in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 220 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Executive Florida Realty, Inc in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 219 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Xena Vallone Realty, Inc. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 218 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green P.A. & Kirkland, P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 217 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Jonathan Pollard LLC in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 216 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Christopher J. Shipley P.A. in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 10, 2021 Filing 215 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Citizens First Bank in the amount of $603,700.36. (HAI)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Christopher S. Prater and Jonathan E. Pollard of the law firm Pollard PLLC are hereby relieved of further responsibility for the representation of Defendants Jason Kranz, Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, and KD Premier Realty, LLC. Within 30 days of this Order, KD Premier Realty, LLC shall retain new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/4/2021. (SA)
August 4, 2021 Filing 201 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #185 Notice of Appeal. The following documents have been forwarded in paper format to the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of exhibits: 1 (thumb drive). USCA number: 21-11748-A (ABC) Modified on 8/5/2021 (ABC).
July 19, 2021 Filing 200 MOTION for Jonathan Pollard, Esq. and Christopher S. Prater, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Filing 199 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Christopher J. Shipley on behalf of Jason Kranz (Shipley, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Dkt. #183) is granted. Defendants' Motion to Determine Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. #184) is denied. Plaintiff shall move for fees and costs within forty-five (45) days of this Order in accordance with Local Rule 7.01(c). Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/16/2021. (SMB)
July 13, 2021 Filing 197 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Christopher J. Shipley on behalf of Nanette Elliott (Shipley, Christopher)
July 12, 2021 Filing 196 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Christopher J. Shipley on behalf of Christopher Day (Shipley, Christopher)
July 12, 2021 Filing 195 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Christopher J. Shipley on behalf of Angie Taylor (Shipley, Christopher)
June 21, 2021 Filing 194 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor re #185 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 21-11748. (Prater, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 193 USCA NOTICE of Over the phone extension to file the Appellant's Civil Appeal Statement, granted by clerk. Appellant's Civil Appeal Statement is due on 6/21/2021. (LAB)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: Defendants' Time-Sensitive Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (Dkt. #187) is denied. Defendants may post a supersedeas bond in the amount of $664,070.40 (110% of the Court's judgment) to stay execution of the money judgment entered against them. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/1/2021. (SMB)
May 27, 2021 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay pending appeal re #181 Judgment, #180 Order filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lauro, John)
May 27, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving notice of appeal on 5/25/2021 re #185 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 21-11748-A. (LAB)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file an expedited response to #187 Defendants' Time-Sensitive Motion to Stay Appeal by noon on Friday, May 28, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/25/2021. (SMB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #183 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
May 24, 2021 Filing 187 Time Sensitive MOTION to Stay pending appeal re #181 Judgment, #180 Order by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher) Modified on 5/25/2021 (HAI).
May 24, 2021 Filing 186 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #185 Notice of Appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (HAI)
May 21, 2021 Filing 185 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #181 Judgment, #180 Order by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AFLMDC-18282179. (Prater, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 184 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 182 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 26, 2021 Filing 181 JUDGMENT in favor of Properties of the Villages, Inc. against KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Angie Taylor, Christopher Day, Jason Kranz, Nanette Elliott. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RLK)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER: Defendants, Jason Kranz, Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, and KD Premier Realty, LLC, are enjoined from doing business as real estate brokers or agents in The Villages for a period of 18-months beginning June 1, 2021. That gives Defendants a wind down period of a little over 30-days. Defendants shall return to POV by June 1, 2021, all customer lists or other information taken from POV's computer systems. Plaintiff is granted judgment against Jason Kranz, Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, and KD Premier Realty, LLC in the amount of $603,700.36, for all of which let execution issue. All other claims raised by Plaintiff or Defendants are hereby denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order. The Clerk is directed to close the case and terminate all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/23/2021. (SMB)
April 14, 2021 Filing 179 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Closing Argument by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Pollard, Jonathan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 178 TRIAL BRIEF (Plaintiff's Closing Arguments) by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
April 12, 2021 Filing 177 Exhibit List by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-1, #2 Exhibit01-2, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05-1, #6 Exhibit05-2, #7 Exhibit 05-3, #8 Exhibit 05-4, #9 Exhibit 05-5, #10 Exhibit 05-6, #11 Exhibit 05-7, #12 Exhibit 05-8, #13 Exhibit 05-9, #14 Exhibit 08-1, #15 Exhibit 08-2, #16 Exhibit 08-3, #17 Exhibit 09-30, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17-1, #21 Exhibit 17-2, #22 Exhibit 17-3, #23 Exhibit 17-4, #24 Exhibit17-5, #25 Exhibit17-6, #26 Exhibit 17-7, #27 Exhibit 17-8, #28 Exhibit 17-9, #29 Exhibit 17-10, #30 Exhibit 17-11, #31 Exhibit 17-12, #32 Exhibit 17-13, #33 Exhibit 17-14, #34 Exhibit 17-15, #35 Exhibit 17-16, #36 Exhibit 17-17, #37 Exhibit 17-18, #38 Exhibit 17-19, #39 Exhibit 17-20, #40 Exhibit 19, #41 Exhibit 20-1, #42 Exhibit 20-2, #43 Exhibit 20-3, #44 Exhibit20-4, #45 Exhibit20-5, #46 Exhibit 20-6, #47 Exhibit 20-7, #48 Exhibit 20-8, #49 Exhibit 20-9, #50 Exhibit 20-10, #51 Exhibit 21-1, #52 Exhibit 21-2, #53 Exhibit 21-3, #54 Exhibit 21-4, #55 Exhibit 21-5, #56 Exhibit 21-6, #57 Exhibit 21-7, #58 Exhibit 21-8, #59 Exhibit 21-9, #60 Exhibit 21-10, #61 Exhibit 21-11, #62 Exhibit 21-12, #63 Exhibit 21-13, #64 Exhibit 21-14, #65 Exhibit 21-15, #66 Exhibit 21-16, #67 Exhibit 21-17, #68 Exhibit 21-18, #69 Exhibit 21-19, #70 Exhibit 21-20, #71 Exhibit 21-21, #72 Exhibit 21-22, #73 Exhibit 21-23, #74 Exhibit 21-24, #75 Exhibit 21-25, #76 Exhibit 21-26, #77 Exhibit 21-27, #78 Exhibit 21-28, #79 Exhibit 21-29, #80 Exhibit 21-30, #81 Exhibit 22, #82 Exhibit 24, #83 Exhibit 26)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 176 Exhibit List (PART SEVEN) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_6147, #2 Exhibit P_6148, #3 Exhibit P_6149, #4 Exhibit P_6150, #5 Exhibit P_6151, #6 Exhibit P_6152, #7 Exhibit P_6153, #8 Exhibit P_6154, #9 Exhibit P_6155, #10 Exhibit P_6156, #11 Exhibit P_6157, #12 Exhibit P_6160, #13 Exhibit P_6161, #14 Exhibit P_6168, #15 Exhibit P_6201, #16 Exhibit P_6202, #17 Exhibit P_7000, #18 Exhibit P_7001, #19 Exhibit P_7002, #20 Exhibit P_7003, #21 Exhibit P_7004, #22 Exhibit P_7004B, #23 Exhibit P_7005, #24 Exhibit P_7006, #25 Exhibit P_7007, #26 Exhibit P_7008, #27 Exhibit P_7009, #28 Exhibit P_7009B, #29 Exhibit P_7010, #30 Exhibit P_7011, #31 Exhibit P_7012, #32 Exhibit P_7013, #33 Exhibit P_7013B, #34 Exhibit P_7014, #35 Exhibit P_7015, #36 Exhibit P_7016, #37 Exhibit P_7017, #38 Exhibit P_7018, #39 Exhibit P_7019, #40 Exhibit P_7020, #41 Exhibit P_7021, #42 Exhibit P_7022, #43 Exhibit P_7023, #44 Exhibit P_7024, #45 Exhibit P_7025, #46 Exhibit P_7201, #47 Exhibit P_8000, #48 Exhibit P_8005, #49 Exhibit P_8006, #50 Exhibit P_8007, #51 Exhibit P_8008, #52 Exhibit P_8010, #53 Exhibit P_8012, #54 Exhibit P_8015, #55 Exhibit P_8016, #56 Exhibit P_8031, #57 Exhibit P_8032, #58 Exhibit P_9009, #59 Exhibit P_10001, #60 Exhibit P_10002, #61 Exhibit P_10003, #62 Exhibit P_10004, #63 Exhibit P_10005, #64 Exhibit P_10006, #65 Exhibit P_10007, #66 Exhibit P_10008, #67 Exhibit P_10009, #68 Exhibit P_11000, #69 Exhibit P_11008, #70 Exhibit P_11009, #71 Exhibit P_11010, #72 Exhibit P_11011, #73 Exhibit P_2000022)(AMS) Modified on 4/12/2021: NOTE: Exhibits P3406A, P_4000A, P_4236, and P_4502 are on a thumb drive located in the Clerk's Office exhibit vault. (AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 175 Exhibit List (PART SIX) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_4003B, #2 Exhibit P_4005B, #3 Exhibit P_4024, #4 Exhibit P_4100, #5 Exhibit P_4213, #6 Exhibit P_4227, #7 Exhibit P_4234, #8 Exhibit P_4235, #9 Exhibit P_4243, #10 Exhibit P_4245, #11 Exhibit P_4247, #12 Exhibit P_4249, #13 Exhibit P_4267, #14 Exhibit P_4269, #15 Exhibit P_4271, #16 Exhibit P_4272, #17 Exhibit P_4275, #18 Exhibit P_4276, #19 Exhibit P_4282, #20 Exhibit P_4283, #21 Exhibit P_4289, #22 Exhibit P_4291, #23 Exhibit P_4299, #24 Exhibit P_4300, #25 Exhibit P_4302, #26 Exhibit P_4304, #27 Exhibit P_4314, #28 Exhibit P_4332, #29 Exhibit P_4338, #30 Exhibit P_4344, #31 Exhibit P_4347, #32 Exhibit P_4355, #33 Exhibit P_4358, #34 Exhibit P_4364, #35 Exhibit P_4365, #36 Exhibit P_4376, #37 Exhibit P_4412, #38 Exhibit P_4424, #39 Exhibit P_4428, #40 Exhibit P_4431, #41 Exhibit P_4501, #42 Exhibit P_4503, #43 Exhibit P_4505, #44 Exhibit P_4507, #45 Exhibit P_4509, #46 Exhibit P_4710, #47 Exhibit P_4900, #48 Exhibit P_4903, #49 Exhibit P_4904, #50 Exhibit P_4905, #51 Exhibit P_4906, #52 Exhibit P_5000, #53 Exhibit P_5005, #54 Exhibit P_5400-7, #55 Exhibit P_5400C, #56 Exhibit P_5400C, #57 Exhibit P_5500, #58 Exhibit P_5510, #59 Exhibit P_5523, #60 Exhibit P_5609, #61 Exhibit P_6000, #62 Exhibit P_6110, #63 Exhibit P_6111, #64 Exhibit P_6113, #65 Exhibit P_6115, #66 Exhibit P_6118, #67 Exhibit P_6123, #68 Exhibit P_6128, #69 Exhibit P_6130, #70 Exhibit P_6131, #71 Exhibit P_6133, #72 Exhibit P_6136, #73 Exhibit P_6138, #74 Exhibit P_6139, #75 Exhibit P_6140, #76 Exhibit P_6144, #77 Exhibit P_6146)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 174 Exhibit List (PART FIVE) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_3700, #2 Exhibit P_3701, #3 Exhibit P_3702, #4 Exhibit P_3703, #5 Exhibit P_3704, #6 Exhibit P_3705, #7 Exhibit P_3706, #8 Exhibit P_3707, #9 Exhibit P_3708, #10 Exhibit P_3709, #11 Exhibit P_3710, #12 Exhibit P_3711, #13 Exhibit P_3712, #14 Exhibit P_3713, #15 Exhibit P_3714, #16 Exhibit P_3715, #17 Exhibit P_3716, #18 Exhibit P_3717, #19 Exhibit P_3718, #20 Exhibit P_3719, #21 Exhibit P_3720, #22 Exhibit P_3721, #23 Exhibit P_3722, #24 Exhibit P_3723, #25 Exhibit P_3724, #26 Exhibit P_3725, #27 Exhibit P_3726, #28 Exhibit P_3727, #29 Exhibit P_3728, #30 Exhibit P_3729, #31 Exhibit P_3730, #32 Exhibit P_3731, #33 Exhibit P_3732, #34 Exhibit P_3733, #35 Exhibit P_3734, #36 Exhibit P_3735, #37 Exhibit P_3736, #38 Exhibit P_3737, #39 Exhibit P_3738, #40 Exhibit P_3739, #41 Exhibit P_3740, #42 Exhibit P_3741, #43 Exhibit P_3742, #44 Exhibit P_3743, #45 Exhibit P_3744, #46 Exhibit P_3745, #47 Exhibit P_3746, #48 Exhibit P_3747, #49 Exhibit P_3748, #50 Exhibit P_3749, #51 Exhibit P_3750, #52 Exhibit P_3751, #53 Exhibit P_3752, #54 Exhibit P_3753, #55 Exhibit P_3754, #56 Exhibit P_3755, #57 Exhibit P_3756, #58 Exhibit P_3757, #59 Exhibit P_3758, #60 Exhibit P_3759, #61 Exhibit P_3760, #62 Exhibit P_3761, #63 Exhibit P_3762, #64 Exhibit P_3763, #65 Exhibit P_3764, #66 Exhibit P_3765, #67 Exhibit P_3766, #68 Exhibit P_3767, #69 Exhibit P_3768, #70 Exhibit P_3769, #71 Exhibit P_3770, #72 Exhibit P_3771, #73 Exhibit P_3772, #74 Exhibit P_3773, #75 Exhibit P_3774, #76 Exhibit P_3775, #77 Exhibit P_3776, #78 Exhibit P_3777, #79 Exhibit P_3778, #80 Exhibit P_3779, #81 Exhibit P_3780, #82 Exhibit P_3781, #83 Exhibit P_3782, #84 Exhibit P_3783, #85 Exhibit P_3875)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 173 Exhibit List (PART FOUR) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_3630, #2 Exhibit P_3631, #3 Exhibit P_3633, #4 Exhibit P_3634, #5 Exhibit P_3635, #6 Exhibit P_3636, #7 Exhibit P_3637, #8 Exhibit P_3638, #9 Exhibit P_3639, #10 Exhibit P_3640, #11 Exhibit P_3641, #12 Exhibit P_3642, #13 Exhibit P_3643, #14 Exhibit P_3644, #15 Exhibit P_3645, #16 Exhibit P_3646, #17 Exhibit P_3647, #18 Exhibit P_3648, #19 Exhibit P_3649, #20 Exhibit P_3650, #21 Exhibit P_3651, #22 Exhibit P_3652, #23 Exhibit P_3653, #24 Exhibit P_3654, #25 Exhibit P_3655, #26 Exhibit P_3656, #27 Exhibit P_3657, #28 Exhibit P_3658, #29 Exhibit P_3659, #30 Exhibit P_3660, #31 Exhibit P_3661, #32 Exhibit P_3662, #33 Exhibit P_3663, #34 Exhibit P_3664, #35 Exhibit P_3665, #36 Exhibit P_3666, #37 Exhibit P_3667, #38 Exhibit P_3668, #39 Exhibit P_3669, #40 Exhibit P_3670, #41 Exhibit P_3671, #42 Exhibit P_3672, #43 Exhibit P_3673, #44 Exhibit P_3674, #45 Exhibit P_3675, #46 Exhibit P_3676, #47 Exhibit P_3677, #48 Exhibit P_3678, #49 Exhibit P_3679, #50 Exhibit P_3680, #51 Exhibit P_3681, #52 Exhibit P_3682, #53 Exhibit P_3683, #54 Exhibit P_3684, #55 Exhibit P_3685, #56 Exhibit P_3686, #57 Exhibit P_3687, #58 Exhibit P_3688, #59 Exhibit P_3689, #60 Exhibit P_3690, #61 Exhibit P_3691, #62 Exhibit P_3692, #63 Exhibit P_3693, #64 Exhibit P_3694, #65 Exhibit P_3695, #66 Exhibit P_3696, #67 Exhibit P_3697, #68 Exhibit P_3698, #69 Exhibit P_3699)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 172 Exhibit List (PART THREE) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_3550, #2 Exhibit P_3551, #3 Exhibit P_3552, #4 Exhibit P_3553, #5 Exhibit P_3554, #6 Exhibit P_3555, #7 Exhibit P_3556, #8 Exhibit P_3557, #9 Exhibit P_3558, #10 Exhibit P_3559, #11 Exhibit P_3560, #12 Exhibit P_3561, #13 Exhibit P_3562, #14 Exhibit P_3563, #15 Exhibit P_3564, #16 Exhibit P_3565, #17 Exhibit P_3566, #18 Exhibit P_3567, #19 Exhibit P_3568, #20 Exhibit P_3569, #21 Exhibit P_3570, #22 Exhibit P_3571, #23 Exhibit P_3572, #24 Exhibit P_3573, #25 Exhibit P_3574, #26 Exhibit P_3575, #27 Exhibit P_3576, #28 Exhibit P_3577, #29 Exhibit P_3578, #30 Exhibit P_3579, #31 Exhibit P_3580, #32 Exhibit P_3581, #33 Exhibit P_3582, #34 Exhibit P_3583, #35 Exhibit P_3585, #36 Exhibit P_3586, #37 Exhibit P_3587, #38 Exhibit P_3588, #39 Exhibit P_3589, #40 Exhibit P_3590, #41 Exhibit P_3591, #42 Exhibit P_3592, #43 Exhibit P_3593, #44 Exhibit P_3594, #45 Exhibit P_3595, #46 Exhibit P_3596, #47 Exhibit P_3597, #48 Exhibit P_3598, #49 Exhibit P_3599, #50 Exhibit P_3600, #51 Exhibit P_3601, #52 Exhibit P_3602, #53 Exhibit P_3603, #54 Exhibit P_3604, #55 Exhibit P_3605, #56 Exhibit P_3606, #57 Exhibit P_3607, #58 Exhibit P_3608, #59 Exhibit P_3610, #60 Exhibit P_3611, #61 Exhibit P_3612, #62 Exhibit P_3613, #63 Exhibit P_3614, #64 Exhibit P_3615, #65 Exhibit P_3616, #66 Exhibit P_3617, #67 Exhibit P_3618, #68 Exhibit P_3619, #69 Exhibit P_3620, #70 Exhibit P_3621, #71 Exhibit P_3622, #72 Exhibit P_3623, #73 Exhibit P_3624, #74 Exhibit P_3625, #75 Exhibit P_3626, #76 Exhibit P_3627, #77 Exhibit P_3628, #78 Exhibit P_3629)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 171 Exhibit List (PART TWO) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit P_2149, #2 Exhibit P_2149A, #3 Exhibit P_2151, #4 Exhibit P_2152, #5 Exhibit P_2156, #6 Exhibit P_2163, #7 Exhibit P_2164, #8 Exhibit P_2202, #9 Exhibit P_2207, #10 Exhibit P_2301, #11 Exhibit P_2304, #12 Exhibit P_2306, #13 Exhibit P_2307, #14 Exhibit P_2400, #15 Exhibit P_2401, #16 Exhibit P_3134, #17 Exhibit P_3200, #18 Exhibit P_3202, #19 Exhibit P_3203, #20 Exhibit P_3204, #21 Exhibit P_3205, #22 Exhibit P_3206, #23 Exhibit P_3403, #24 Exhibit P_3500, #25 Exhibit P_3501, #26 Exhibit P_3502, #27 Exhibit P_3503, #28 Exhibit P_3504, #29 Exhibit P_3505, #30 Exhibit P_3506, #31 Exhibit P_3507, #32 Exhibit P_3508, #33 Exhibit P_3509, #34 Exhibit P_3510, #35 Exhibit P_3511, #36 Exhibit P_3512, #37 Exhibit P_3513, #38 Exhibit P_3514, #39 Exhibit P_3515, #40 Exhibit P_3516, #41 Exhibit P_3517, #42 Exhibit P_3518, #43 Exhibit P_3519, #44 Exhibit P_3520, #45 Exhibit P_3522, #46 Exhibit P_3523, #47 Exhibit P_3524, #48 Exhibit P_3525, #49 Exhibit P_3526, #50 Exhibit P_3527, #51 Exhibit P_3528, #52 Exhibit P_3529, #53 Exhibit P_3530, #54 Exhibit P_3531, #55 Exhibit P_3532, #56 Exhibit P_3533, #57 Exhibit P_3534, #58 Exhibit P_3535, #59 Exhibit P_3536, #60 Exhibit P_3537, #61 Exhibit P_3539, #62 Exhibit P_3540, #63 Exhibit P_3541, #64 Exhibit P_3542, #65 Exhibit P_3543, #66 Exhibit P_3544, #67 Exhibit P_3545, #68 Exhibit P_3546, #69 Exhibit P_3547, #70 Exhibit P_3548, #71 Exhibit P_3549)(AMS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 170 Exhibit List (PART ONE) by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P_006, #2 Exhibit P_00013, #3 Exhibit P_0016, #4 Exhibit P_0023, #5 Exhibit P_0036, #6 Exhibit P_1000, #7 Exhibit P_1003, #8 Exhibit P_1034, #9 Exhibit P_1038, #10 Exhibit P_1063, #11 Exhibit P_1068, #12 Exhibit P_1309, #13 Exhibit P_1357, #14 Exhibit P_1358, #15 Exhibit P_1359, #16 Exhibit P_1360, #17 Exhibit P_1361, #18 Exhibit P_1362, #19 Exhibit P_1363, #20 Exhibit P_1364, #21 Exhibit P_1400, #22 Exhibit P_1403, #23 Supplement P_1776, #24 Exhibit P_2100, #25 Exhibit P_2101, #26 Exhibit P_2102, #27 Exhibit P_2103, #28 Exhibit P_2104, #29 Exhibit P_2105, #30 Exhibit P_2106, #31 Exhibit P_2107, #32 Exhibit P_2108, #33 Exhibit P_2109, #34 Exhibit P_2110, #35 Exhibit P_2111, #36 Exhibit P_2112, #37 Exhibit P_2113, #38 Exhibit P_2114, #39 Exhibit P_2115, #40 Exhibit P_2116, #41 Exhibit P_2117, #42 Exhibit P_2120, #43 Exhibit P_2121, #44 Exhibit P_2122, #45 Exhibit P_2123, #46 Exhibit P_2124, #47 Exhibit P_2125, #48 Exhibit P_2126, #49 Exhibit P_2127, #50 Exhibit P_2140, #51 Exhibit P_2148)(AMS)
April 7, 2021 Filing 169 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Day 5 held on 4/2/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Day 4 held on 4/1/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Day 3 held on 3/31/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Day 2 held on 3/30/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Day 1 held on 3/29/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
April 6, 2021 Filing 163 NOTICE Regarding Exhibits P_10005 Through P_10009 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 4/6/2021 (HAI).
April 2, 2021 Filing 162 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL (DAY 5) COMPLETED on 4/2/2021. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC)
April 1, 2021 Filing 161 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL DAY 4 held on 4/1/2021. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC).
March 31, 2021 Filing 160 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL DAY 3 held on 3/31/2021. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ENDORSED ORDER denying in part and reserving ruling in part 158 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the merits under Rule 52(c). Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/1/2021. (ABC)
March 31, 2021 Filing 158 ORAL MOTION for Judgment on the merits under Rule 52(c) by All Defendants. (ABC)
March 30, 2021 Filing 157 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL DAY 2 held on 3/30/2021. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's Time-Sensitive Motion to Determine Confidentiality of Two Trial Exhibits and for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Section 688.006, Florida Statutes (Dkt. #151) is granted in part and reserved in part as stated on the record. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/30/2021. (SMB)
March 29, 2021 Filing 155 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL DAY 1 held on 3/29/2021. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION REGARDING KELLY SHIPES AND ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT granting #153 Joint Motion by Plaintiff and Defendant Kelly Shipes for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (SMB)
March 29, 2021 Filing 153 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction (by Plaintiff and Defendant Kelly Shipes) by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Muldowney, Patrick)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION REGARDING CYNTHIA HUGHES AND ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT granting #149 Joint Motion by Plaintiff and Defendant Cynthia Hughes for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (SMB)
March 26, 2021 Filing 151 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Determine Confidentiality of Two Trial Exhibits and for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Section 688.006, Florida Statutes - Time Sensitive by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 26, 2021 Filing 150 TRIAL BRIEF by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
March 25, 2021 Filing 149 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction (by Plaintiff and Defendant Cynthia Hughes) by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Muldowney, Patrick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 148 ENDORSED ORDER granting #146 Defendants' Motion to Present Testimony by Remote Transmission to the extent that the Court can accommodate the witness's appearance by Zoom in Courtroom 17 only. If the trial is conducted in another courtroom, then the witness may not appear by Zoom because other courtrooms in the Tampa Division are not equipped with video conferencing capabilities. (SMB)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #144 Defendants' Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment; granting #145 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/25/2021. (SMB)
March 24, 2021 Filing 146 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Present Testimony of Terry Hamilton By Remote Transmission - TIME SENSITIVE by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Terry Hamilton)(Prater, Christopher)
March 23, 2021 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically laptop computers, cell phones, mobile hotspot, and related equipment by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically a laptop computer and a hotspot by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ENDORSED ORDER terminating as moot #138 Defendants' Motion to Continue Trial due to the filing of #142 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/5/2021. (SMB)
March 5, 2021 Filing 142 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor re #138 MOTION to Continue Trial - Time Sensitive - filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz (Pollard, Jonathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 141 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson. (Pierson, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of teleconference motion hearing held on 3/2/2021 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/25/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2021. (Pierson, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Continue Trial - Time Sensitive - filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Lauro, John)
March 3, 2021 Filing 138 MOTION to Continue Trial - Time Sensitive by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Scheduling 3/29/2021 Jury Trial in Larweth v. Magellan Health, Inc.)(Pollard, Jonathan) Modified on 3/4/2021 (RLK).
March 3, 2021 Filing 137 TRIAL NOTICE (date certain): BENCH TRIAL is set for MONDAY, MARCH 29, 2021, at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. (SMB)
March 2, 2021 Filing 136 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2021, MOTION HEARING held on 3/2/2021 re #125 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Testimony and Other Evidence filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc., #133 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, #126 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Evidence and Testimony filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (ABC)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Dkt. #125) is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated on the record. Defendants' Motion in Limine (Dkt. #126) is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply (Dkt. #133) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/2/2021. (SMB)
March 1, 2021 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 1, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
February 24, 2021 Filing 132 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Pretrial Conference hearing set for March 2, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is rescheduled as to time only. New hearing time: TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING is reset for TUESDAY, MARCH 2, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680.(SMB)
February 23, 2021 Filing 131 JOINT PRETRIAL statement by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - POV's Statement of the Case, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Statement of the Case, #3 Exhibit C - POV's Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit E - POV's Witness List, #6 Exhibit F - Defendants' Witness List, #7 Exhibit G - POV's damages breakdown, #8 Exhibit H - Defendants' damages breakdown, #9 Exhibit I - POV's list of depositions, #10 Exhibit J - Defendants' list of depositions, #11 Exhibit K - Admitted Facts, #12 Exhibit L - Agreed Principles of Law, #13 Exhibit M - Issues of Fact that remain to be litigated, #14 Exhibit N - Issues of Law which remain for determination by the Court)(Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 2/24/2021 (RLK).
February 23, 2021 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Evidence and Testimony filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - J. Kranz Depo. Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Day Depo. Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 - KD's Amended Response to First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' RFP)(Muldowney, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Testimony and Other Evidence filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Pollard, Jonathan)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: Defendants' Time-Sensitive Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order and Continue Trial (Dkt. #123) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/10/2021. (SMB) (SMB).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #120) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this order for all purposes, including appellate review. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. #107) is denied. Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #101) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #100) is granted in part as to Defendants' third and fifth affirmative defenses, denied in part as to Defendants' tenth affirmative defenses, and denied as moot as to Defendants' affirmative defenses 1, 6-9 and 13. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/10/2021. (SMB)
February 9, 2021 Filing 126 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Evidence and Testimony by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Properties of the Villages - Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Properties of the Villages - Amended Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C - Properties of the Villages - Second Amended Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of C - Properties of the Villages' Corporate Representative Deposition)(Prater, Christopher)
February 9, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION In Limine regarding Exclusion of Testimony and Other Evidence by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
February 8, 2021 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 MOTION to Amend #22 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order and Continue Trial - Time-Sensitive filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sundeep Gulati)(Muldowney, Patrick)
February 3, 2021 Filing 123 MOTION to Amend #22 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order and Continue Trial - Time-Sensitive by Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 29, 2021 through Feb. 2, 2021 Email Chain)(Prater, Christopher)
February 2, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Michael Singer on behalf of Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Singer, Gregory)
February 2, 2021 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Lauro on behalf of Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Lauro, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 120 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc., #107 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/25/2021. (SA)
December 21, 2020 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. 5-7 Email Chain)(Prater, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #99 Order on Motion to Compel, 115 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, #108 Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Notice of Compliance with Court's Discovery Orders (Muldowney, Patrick)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendants shall file a reply not exceeding five pages on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/16/2020. (SA)
December 14, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in support of motion for sanctions against plaintiff properties of the Villages, Inc. by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher) Modified on 12/15/2020 (HAI).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER granting #114 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension of Time. The deadline for Properties of the Villages, Inc. to produce e-mails pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt. #108) is extended to December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/14/2020. (SMB)
December 11, 2020 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Brief Extension Of Time To Produce E-Mails Pursuant To The Court's Order Granting Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion For Modification by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ENDORSED ORDER referring motions for report and recommendation: #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc. and #101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/10/2020. (SMB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 9, 2020 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #107 Motion for Sanctions filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emails)(Muldowney, Patrick)
December 7, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of portion of Motion for Sanctions being Moot by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor re #107 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff (Prater, Christopher) Modified on 12/8/2020 (HAI).
December 2, 2020 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher Day, #2 Exhibit B - POV Flyer, #3 Exhibit C - POV Advertisement)(Prater, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-1 - J. Kranz's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A-2 - J. Kranz's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 2), #4 Exhibit A-3 - J. Kranz's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 3), #5 Exhibit A-4 - J. Kranz's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 4), #6 Exhibit B-1 - N. Elliott's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 1), #7 Exhibit B-2 - N. Elliott's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 2), #8 Exhibit B-3 - N. Elliott's Documents Produced Responsive to Plaintiff's First Request for Production No. 2 - Marketing Materials (Part 3), #9 Exhibit C - J. Kranz Agreement, #10 Exhibit D - A. Kranz Agreement, #11 Appendix E - A. Taylor Agreement, #12 Exhibit F - C. Hughes Agreement, #13 Exhibit G - K. Shipes Agreement, #14 Exhibit H - N. Elliott Agreement, #15 Exhibit I - Acceptable Use Policy, #16 Exhibit J - C. Day's Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #17 Exhibit K - J. Kranz's Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #18 Exhibit L - A. Kranz's Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit M - A. Taylor's Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #20 Exhibit N - C. Hughes' Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit O - K. Shipes' Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #22 Exhibit P - N. Elliott's Amended Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #23 Exhibit Q - Declaration of Dale Borrowman)(Muldowney, Patrick)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Modify. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/1/2020. (SA) (HAI).
November 25, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain, #2 Exhibit B - Search Term Report)(Prater, Christopher)
November 25, 2020 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Modify #99 Order on Motion to Compel and for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant Thereto filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain, #2 Exhibit B - Search Term Report)(Prater, Christopher)
November 20, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #104 MOTION to Modify #99 Order on Motion to Compel and for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant Thereto of Production of Text Messages (Muldowney, Patrick)
November 16, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION to Modify #99 Order on Motion to Compel and for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant Thereto by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nov. 14, 2020, e-mail to Christopher Prater, and search reports attached thereto, #2 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 13, 2020, e-mail from Christopher Prater, #3 Exhibit 3 - Nov. 6, 2020, e-mail from Christopher Prater, #4 Exhibit 4 - E-mail from Patrick M. Muldowney)(Muldowney, Patrick)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ENDORSED ORDER granting #102 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Parties' Respective Motions for Summary Judgment. The deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. #100) and Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #101) is extended to December 2, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (SMB)
November 10, 2020 Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
November 2, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Deposition of Corporate Representative of POV, #2 Exhibit B - POV's Amended Initial Disclosures)(Prater, Christopher)
November 2, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part #89 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/2/2020. (SA)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ENDORSED ORDER terminating as moot #91 Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories due to filing of #96 Joint Notice of Complete Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr.on 10/16/2020. (ADM)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENDORSED ORDER terminating as moot #90 Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production due to filing of #95 Joint Notice of Complete Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests to Produce. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/16/2020. (ADM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 96 JOINT NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #91 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Joint) (Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 10/16/2020 (LAB).
October 15, 2020 Filing 95 JOINT NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #90 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Production and Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Joint) (Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 10/16/2020 (LAB).
October 15, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated July 7, 2020, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated July 17, 2020)(Muldowney, Patrick)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #71) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects, and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #52) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Declaration under Seal (Dkt. #81) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority (Dkt. #79) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/7/2020. (SMB)
October 2, 2020 Filing 92 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION REGARDING TONI McCHESNEY AND KATHLEEN ROTH. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/2/2020. (SMB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Kelly Shipes, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant KD Premier Realty, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Nanette Elliott, #6 Exhibit F - June 26, 2020, email, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Service of Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H - Angela Kranz' Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit I - Angie Taylor's Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit J - Christopher Day's Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit K - Cynthia Hughes' Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit L - Jason Kranz' Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit M - Nanette Elliott's Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories, #14 Exhibit N - Kelly Shipes' Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit O - July 10, 2020, email, #16 Exhibit P - September 8, 2020, deficiency letter)(Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
October 1, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Production and Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant Kelly Shipes, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant KD Premier Realty, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production to Defendant Nanette Elliott, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production to Defendant Christopher Day, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production to Defendant Angie Taylor, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Second Request for Production to Defendant Cynthia Hughes, #7 Exhibit G - June 26, 2020 email, #8 Exhibit H - July 10, 2020 email, #9 Exhibit I - September 8, 2020, deficiency letter, #10 Exhibit J - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Christopher Day's Response to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Second Request for Production, #11 Exhibit K - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Nanette Elliott's Response to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Second Request for Production, #12 Exhibit L - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Cynthia Hughes' Response to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Second Request for Production, #13 Exhibit M - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Angie Taylor's Response to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Second Request for Production, #14 Exhibit N - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Kelly Shipes' Response to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's First Request for Production)(Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
October 1, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comp. Ex. A - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from A. Kranz and Plaintiff's Resp., #2 Exhibit Comp. Ex. B - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from Taylor and Plaintiff's Resp., #3 Exhibit Comp. Ex. C - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from Hughes and Plaintiff's Resp., #4 Exhibit Comp. Ex. D - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from Day and Plaintiff's Resp., #5 Exhibit Comp. Ex. E - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from J. Kranz and Plaintiff's Resp., #6 Exhibit Comp. Ex. F - 1st RFP to Plaintiff from Elliot and Plntf's Resp., #7 Exhibit Comp. Ex. G - Defendants' 1st RFP to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Resp., #8 Exhibit Ex. H - 9.25.2020 Conferral Correspondence, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 9.30.2020 Conferral Correspondence)(Prater, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 29, 2020 Filing 88 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Permanent Injunction Regarding Toni McChesney and Kathleen Roth)(Muldowney, Patrick)
September 25, 2020 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Declaration Under Seal filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER granting #85 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation on #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' time to file their response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation is extended to October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/23/2020. (SMB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #83 Objection by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Prater, Christopher)
September 17, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Strike #68 Notice of filing supplemental authority filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 11, 2020 Filing 83 OBJECTION re #71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kings Point v. Gibson)(Muldowney, Patrick)
September 11, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Declaration Under Seal by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER appointing Paul J. Ullom, Esq. as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/10/2020. (SMB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 2, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Paul J. Ullom. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 3, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike #68 Notice of filing supplemental authority by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Pollard, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ENDORSED ORDER granting #77 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation on Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's time to file objections to the Report and Recommendations on the Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 71) is extended to September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/26/2020. (ADM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation on Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #60 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/24/2020. (SA)
August 20, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel. cindyrprfcrr@gmail.com (CLP)
August 20, 2020 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on August 6, 2020 before Judge Philip R. Lammens. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Packevicz Jarriel,Telephone number 904-301-6843; cindyrprfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 9/10/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2020. (CLP)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED ORDER granting #72 Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel. The law firm of Pollard PLLC is substituted as counsel in place of Blanchard, Merriam, Adel & Kirkland, P.A. for Defendants and Counter Claimants Jason Kranz, Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Cynthia Hughes, Nanette Elliott, Angie Taylor, Kelly Shipes, and KD Premier Realty, LLC. (Attorney Dock A. Blanchard terminated.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/20/2020. (SMB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consent)(Pollard, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/14/2020. (SA)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: The Joint Motion by Plaintiff and Defendant Jan Hickerson for Approval of Settlement Agreement (Dkt. #69) is GRANTED. The Settlement Agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant Jan Hickerson is approved. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Jan Hickerson are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Jan Hickerson's counterclaim against Plaintiff is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Jan Hickerson from this action. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/12/2020. (SMB)
August 12, 2020 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Approval of Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff and Defendant Jan Hickerson by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Muldowney, Patrick)
August 9, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #66 Motion Hearing, #65 Order pdf by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kings Point v. Gibson, #2 Exhibit Ventimiglia v. Sunshine Realty)(Muldowney, Patrick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 66 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 8/6/2020 re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc. (DIGITAL/Zoom) (MJT)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER taking under advisement #60 Motion requesting an Evidentiary Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/4/2020. (SA)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendants Jan Hickerson, Toni McChesney and Kathleen Roth pursuant to #62 Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Jan Hickerson, Toni McChesney and Kathleen Roth from this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/4/2020. (SMB)
August 3, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically an evidentiary hearing filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
July 31, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jan Hickerson, Toni McChesney, Kathleen Roth. (Blanchard, Dock)
July 30, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Properties of the Villages - Deposition Excerpts)(Prater, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically requesting an Evidentiary Hearing by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor re #25 Order pdf (Pollard, Jonathan) Modified on 7/29/2020 (HAI). Modified on 7/30/2020 (LMF).
July 28, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edgar Pollard on behalf of Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor (Pollard, Jonathan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by Properties of the Villages, Inc. re #52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Filing Errata Sheets to Deposition Transcripts (Attachments: #1 1 - Errata sheet to the deposition of Christopher Day, #2 2- Errata Sheet to the deposition of Angela Kranz, #3 3 - Errata Sheet to the deposition of Nanette Elliott, #4 4 - Errata Sheet to the deposition of Toni McChesney, #5 5 - Errata Sheet to the deposition of Angie Taylor, #6 6 - Errata Sheet to the deposition of Kathleen Roth, #7 7 - Errata sheet to the deposition of Kelly Shipes)(Muldowney, Patrick)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER referring case to mediation and directing selection of a mediator on or before 9/10/2020. Mediation shall be conducted on or before 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/27/2020. (SMB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 07/20/20 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens via video conference. (Counsel will receive the meeting invite via email two days prior to the hearing.) Members of the press and public who wish to attend remote hearings must use the web form on the court's internet site: https:// www.flmd.uscourts.gov/webforms/request-remote-access-courtroom-proceedings-press-and-public. (MJT)
July 9, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Defendant shall file opposing affidavits and a responsive Brief due by 7/30/2020. (HAI)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part #54 Motion to Continue. The hearing will be held by video via Zoom on August 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Defendants shall file opposing affidavits and a responsive brief no later than July 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/8/2020. (SA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Continue by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Toni McChesney, Kathleen Roth, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Blanchard, Dock)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER setting a hearing via Zoom on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #52 on July 20, 2020 at 11:00 a.m.; and directing Defendants to file opposing affidavits and a responsive brief no later than July 13, 2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/29/2020. (SA)
June 26, 2020 Filing 52 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sundeep ("Bobby") Gulati, with exhibits A through G, #3 Exhibit 1- A - Exhibits H though CC to the Declaration of Sundeep ("Bobby") Gulati, #4 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Christopher Day, including exhibits, taken on May 19, 2020, #5 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Jason Kranz, including exhibits, taken on May 20, 2020, #6 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Angela Kranz, including exhibits, taken on May 28, 2020, #7 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Cynthia Hughes, including exhibits, taken on May 28, 2020, #8 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Nanette Elliott, including exhibits, taken on June 3, 2020, #9 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Toni McChesney, including exhibits, taken on June 3, 2020, #10 Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Kathleen Roth, including exhibits, taken on June 19, 2020, #11 Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Jan Hickerson, including exhibits, taken on June 19, 2020, #12 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Kelly Shipes, including exhibits, taken on June 24, 2020, #13 Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Angie Taylor, including exhibits, taken on June 4, 2020)(Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 6/29/2020 (HAI).
June 22, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Angie Taylor. (Blanchard, Dock)
June 9, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to #49 Counterclaim by Properties of the Villages, Inc.(a Florida Corporation). Related document: #49 Answer to amended complaintCounterclaim filed by Toni McChesney, Christopher Day, Kelly Shipes, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Kathleen Roth, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz.(Muldowney, Patrick)
May 26, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #41 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Angie Taylor, Cynthia Hughes, Nanette Elliott, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Kelly Shipes, Jan Hickerson, Christopher Day, Toni McChesney, KD Premier Realty, LLC, Kathleen Roth.(Blanchard, Dock)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED ORDER granting #47 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Additional Extension of Time to June 26, 2020 to Re-file Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/8/2020. (SMB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Re-file) Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
May 7, 2020 Filing 46 RETURN of service executed on 05/06/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Kelly Shipes. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 27, 2020 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 04/24/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Toni McChesney. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 27, 2020 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 04/24/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Kathleen Roth. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 04/23/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to KD Premier Realty, LLC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS issued as to KD Premier Realty, LLC, Toni McChesney, Kathleen Roth, Kelly Shipes. (HAI)
April 17, 2020 Filing 41 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor, Kelly Shipes, Toni McChesney, Kathleen Roth, KD Premier Realty, LLC filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jason Kranz Independent Contractor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Christopher Day Independent Contractor Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Angela Kranz Independent Contractor Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Cynthia Hughes Independent Contractor Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Nanette Elliott Independent Contractor Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Jan Hickerson Independent Contractor Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Angie Taylor Independent Contractor Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Kelly Shipes Independent Contractor Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Kathleen Roth Independent Contractor Agreement, #10 Exhibit J - Toni McChesney Independent Contractor Agreement, #11 Exhibit K - Secretary of State Record, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons)(Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 4/20/2020 (HAI).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall separately file its Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/16/2020. (SMB)
April 15, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #8 Amended Complaint by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Muldowney, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. (Blanchard, Dock)
March 31, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to #34 Counterclaim by Properties of the Villages, Inc..(Muldowney, Patrick)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Re-file Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/18/2020. (SMB)
March 18, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Re-file) Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Emergency Motion for Continuance)(Muldowney, Patrick)
March 10, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #8 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jan Hickerson, Christopher Day, Angie Taylor, Jason Kranz, Angela Kranz, Nanette Elliott, Cynthia Hughes.(Blanchard, Dock)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer or response is due by March 11, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/4/2020. (SMB)
March 4, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Blanchard, Dock)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER terminating without prejudice #23 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/24/2020. (SA)
February 24, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON #28 MOTION held on 2/24/2020. (DIGITAL) (MJT)
February 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of telephonic hearing: re: #28 Joint MOTION for Adjournment of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Telephone Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 11:30 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Counsel shall call the reserved conference call number (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 5344767. Counsel will then be prompted to enter security code 022420. Parties are directed to call in 10 minutes prior to the start of the hearing. (MJT)
February 20, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Adjournment of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick) Modified on 2/20/2020 (MJT).
February 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (MJT)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #12) is denied. Defendants' shall file their Answers to the First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/19/2020. (SMB)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER setting an in person hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #23 on March 12, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Ocala Courtroom 1A; and directing Defendants to file opposing affidavits and a responsive brief no later than March 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/19/2020. (SA)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER referring motion for report and recommendation: #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/18/2020. (SMB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sundeep ("Bobby") Gulati, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Muldowney, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/31/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/30/2020 (HAI)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/1/2020; Dispositive motions due by 11/2/2020; Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, MARCH 2, 2021 at 10:30 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Bench Trial is set on the APRIL 2021 trial term in Ocala Courtroom TBD before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/6/2020. (SMB)
February 3, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #12 Motion to dismissMotion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Seegers on behalf of Properties of the Villages, Inc. (Seegers, James)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss and for Extension of Time to Respond to Certain Counts of First Amended Complaint. Response is due by February 3, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/21/2020. (SMB)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Properties of the Villages, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Villages of Lake-Sumter, Inc., Corporate Parent Holding Company of the Villages, Inc. for Properties of the Villages, Inc... (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 01/10/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Nanette Elliott. (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 01/08/2020 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Jan Hickerson. (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor. Related case(s): yes (Blanchard, Dock)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Blanchard, Dock) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dock A. Blanchard on behalf of Christopher Day, Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz, Angie Taylor (Blanchard, Dock)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Nanette Elliott, Jan Hickerson, Cynthia Hughes, Angie Taylor. (HAI) (HAI).
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jason Kranz Independent Contractor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Christopher Day Independent Contractor Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Angela Kranz Independent Contractor Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Cynthia Hughes Independent Contractor Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Nanette Elliott Independent Contractor Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Jan Hickerson Independent Contractor Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Angie Taylor Independent Contractor Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Secretary of State Record, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons)(Muldowney, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 01/03/20 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Jason Kranz. (Muldowney, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 01/03/20 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Angela Kranz. (Muldowney, Patrick)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 12/26/19 by Properties of the Villages, Inc. as to Christopher Day. (Muldowney, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/23/2019. (KAC)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz. (LAB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-647-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Day, Angela Kranz, Jason Kranz (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16283117) filed by Properties of the Villages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Muldowney, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Properties of the Villages, Inc. v. Kranz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christopher Day
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jason Kranz
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Angela Kranz
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kathleen Roth
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kelly Shipes
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Properties of the Villages, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Represented By: James W. Seegers
Represented By: John F. Lauro
Represented By: Gregory Michael Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Hickerson
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hughes
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanette Elliott
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Taylor
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni McChesney
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KD Premier Realty, LLC
Represented By: Dock A. Blanchard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paul J. Ullom
Represented By: Paul J. Ullom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?