Adams v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Kara Adams
Defendant: Kathy Lane, Kathleen Hawk Sawyer, Rivera, Roy Cheatham, William Barr, J.A. Keller and FNU Rivera
Petitioner: Gail Owens, Sailor Jones, Quinetta Grant, Barbara Duprey, Danyell Roberts, Lauren Ransom, Brenda Willoughby, Clara Rodriguez-Iznaga, Christel Ivester, Nelly Herrera, Qujuania Williams, Mary Lassabe, Angelina Smith, Alci Bonannee, Tanya M. Fox, Eneshia Carlyle, Cora Ford, Cristy Bright, Rosa Enedia Pazos Cingari, Ashlei Robinson, Angela Willingham, Tracy Williams, Monica Rigsby, Delixsia Harris, Natisha Aponte, Toni Corker, Latasha Pharr, Karen Nieves, Lavonya Polite, Crystal Tunning, Beverly A Carden, Jeralyn R Dougherty, Alita Edeker, Whitney Castillo-Cruz, Vicki Garland, Ana G. Mursuli-Caballero, Sonyini Clay, Keshia Lanier, Carol Biggs, Jessica Judge, Magda Luz Lavin, Jennifer Smith, Karen Kallen-Zury, Jamila Longmire, D Anda Norbergs, Anita Sgarro, Anastassia Bogomolova, Belkis Soca Fernandez, Rosetta V. Cannata, Teresa Wolfe, Jean Sanchez, Toni Lee Platt, Nicole Simon and Nicole Clark
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 156 Renewed MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Alci Bonannee. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
April 8, 2020 Filing 155 Renewed DECLARATION of Alci Bonannee re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
April 8, 2020 Filing 154 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sonyini Clay. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
April 8, 2020 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Sonyini Clay re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #52 Motion for compassionate release, #138 Motion for assistance with service of process, #141 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #141 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #143 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #143 Motion for Joinder, #143 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #144 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #144 Motion for Joinder, #144 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #146 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #146 Motion for Joinder, #146 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #148 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #148 Motion for Joinder, #148 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #150 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #150 Motion for Joinder, and #150 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/23/2020. (CRR) Modified on 4/1/2020 (LMF).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2020. (SMS)
March 6, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Vicki Garland. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 6, 2020 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Vicki Garland re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 6, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brenda Willoughby. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 6, 2020 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Brenda Willoughby re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 6, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jennifer Smith. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 6, 2020 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Jennifer Smith re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB) Modified on 3/9/2020 (LAB).
March 5, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Crystal Tunning. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 4, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Alita Edeker. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 4, 2020 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Alita Edeker re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 3, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cora Ford. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 3, 2020 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Cora Ford re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying without prejudice #114 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #114 Motion for Joinder, #114 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #115 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #115 Motion for Joinder, #115 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #117 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #117 Motion for Joinder, #117 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #119 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #119 Motion for Joinder, #119 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #121 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #121 Motion for Joinder, #121 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #123 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #123 Motion for Joinder, #123 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #125 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #125 Motion for Joinder, #125 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #126 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #126 Motion for Joinder, #126 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #127 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #127 Motion for Joinder, #127 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #129 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #129 Motion for Joinder, #129 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #130 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #130 Motion for Joinder, #130 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #132 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #132 Motion for Joinder, #132 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and #134 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/3/2020. (CLF) Modified on 4/1/2020 (LMF).
March 2, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for an order directing service of process by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 137 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Kara Adams re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction, #134 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by plaintiff only. Motion referred to Philip R. Lammens. (LAB) Modified on 3/3/2020 (LAB). (LAB).
March 2, 2020 Filing 136 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kara Adams. Signed by plaintiff only. (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kara Adams. Related case(s): y (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION to Appoint Counsel or Interim Counsel by Kara Adams. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 3/3/2020 (LAB).
March 2, 2020 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Alci Bonannee re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Alci Bonannee. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Latasha Pharr re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB) (LAB).
March 2, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Latasha Pharr. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 129 Renewed MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carol Biggs. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Nicole Simon re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicole Simon. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 126 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Belkis Soca Fernandez. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Natisha Aponte. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Magda Luz Lavin re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magda Luz Lavin. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Jeralyn R Dougherty re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams.(LAB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeralyn R Dougherty. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 2, 2020 Filing 120 Renewed DECLARATION of Cristy Bright re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Cristy Bright. (LAB)
February 28, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicole Clark. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 28, 2020 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Cristy Bright re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Cristy Bright. (LAB)
February 28, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cristy Bright. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 28, 2020 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Jean Sanchez re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 28, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jean Sanchez. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (LAB).
February 28, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anita Sgarro. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 28, 2020 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #81 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #86 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #97 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #79 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #102 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction, #105 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #82 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #74 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #101 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #104 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder, #108 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #109 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #87 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #96 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #93 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder, #77 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #52 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically "compassionate Release', #88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #103 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #99 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #107 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #95 MOTION to Appoint Custodian MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #78 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #73 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #83 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #84 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #100 MOTION to Appoint Custodian MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #75 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #90 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Kathy Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2nd Salter Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Venuto Declaration)(Smart, Adam)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER APPOINTING Attorney Patrick Barthle and the law firm of Morgan as pro bono counsel in this case. The pending motions to appoint counsel, (Docs. 15, 71-88, 90, 92-109, 111), are DENIED as moot. The Motions to Proceed in Joinder and In Forma Pauperis will be addressed once counsel has had an opportunity to review the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/28/2020. (GMD)
February 27, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Qujuania Williams. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 110 Renewed DECLARATION of Louise Smith re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (HAI)
February 27, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Keshia Lanier. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lavonya Polite. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ana G. Mursuli-Caballero. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tanya M. Fox. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Teresa Wolfe. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosa Enedia Pazos Cingari. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lauren Ransom. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gail Owens. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Delixsia Harris. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION to Appoint Custodian, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Danyell Roberts. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Christel Ivester. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mary Lassabe. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sailor Jones. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nelly Herrera. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION to Appoint Custodian, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Karen Nieves. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jamila Longmire. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Angelina Smith. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Beverly A Carden. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2020 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Beverly A Carden re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (HAI)
February 27, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tracy Williams. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Eneshia Carlyle re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (HAI)
February 26, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eneshia Carlyle. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Toni Corker. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anastassia Bogomolova. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder by D Anda Norbergs. ***Document not signed (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 84 2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Whitney Castillo-Cruz. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 83 2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosetta V. Cannata. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jessica Judge. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Toni Lee Platt. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ashlei Robinson. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Quinetta Grant. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carol Biggs. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clara Rodriguez-Iznaga. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 76 Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Whitney Castillo-Cruz. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Whitney Castillo-Cruz. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Barbara Duprey. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosetta V. Cannata. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Angela Willingham. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 26, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Joinder by Karen Kallen-Zury. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 25, 2020 Filing 70 DECLARATION of D. Anda Norbergs re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Louise Smith re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Angela Willingham re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Monica Rigsby re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Clara Rodriguez-Iznaga re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Lynette Byers re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Nicole Clark re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB) Modified on 2/25/2020 (LAB).
February 24, 2020 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Whitney Castillo-Cruz re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Keshia Lanier re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Scharlene Hudson re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Arnouse Merlien re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Betty McLain re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Mary Lassabe re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Teresa Wolfe re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Minerva Nundez re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Sila Luis re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Erika Cordova re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Carol Biggs re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for "compassionate Release" and Declaration on behalf of Kara Adams, filed by Anita Sgarro. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Rosetta Cannata re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Chiquita Tyler re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Kewanda Love re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Jamila Longmire re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Quinetta Grant re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jessica Judge re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Ashlei Robinson re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Sonya Pittman re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kara Adams. (LAB) Modified on 2/25/2020 (LAB).
February 24, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Pilar Chantel Melvin re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Ana G. Mursoli-Caballero re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of LaVonya Polite re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Gail Owens re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Danyell Roberts re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Angelina Smith re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Angela Crystal Nash re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Anastassia Bogomolova re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Nelly Herrera re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Delexsia Harris re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB) Modified on 2/27/2020 (LMF).
February 24, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Crystal F. Tunning re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Karen Colie re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Rosa Emedia re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Hilary Roark re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Magner Dellanna re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Belkis Soca re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Michelle Baty re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Tamaica Hoskins re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Jacqueline M. Garcia re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Fabiola Moreno re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Toni Corker re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Toni Lee Platt re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Kerri Torres re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Karen Kallen-Zury re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Christel Ivester re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Donna M. Demps re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jenifer Hoffman re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB) Modified on 2/26/2020 (LAB).
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kara Adams re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (LAB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Proceed in Joinder by Monica Rigsby. Pleading not signed. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 2/26/2020 (LAB).
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Quinetta Grant on behalf of plaintiff. (LAB)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Louise Smith on behalf of plaintiff. (LAB)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of D. Anda Norbergs on behalf of plaintiff. (LAB) ).
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction and Exhibits filed by Kathy Lane. (Middendorf, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Monica Rigsby on behalf of plaintiff. (LAB) Modified on 2/18/2020 (LAB).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/27/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/13/2020. (MR)
February 13, 2020 Received confirmation email from Warden, FCC Coleman Low as to receiving Docs. 2 & 8; Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Order. (CRR)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Warden Lane to respond to the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. 2) on or before Tuesday, February 18, 2020, at Noon.The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order and the emergency motion (Doc. 2) by facsimile or e-mail to the Warden at FCC Coleman - Low Women's. The Clerk shall confirm that such notification was received and make an entry on the docket reflecting that the notification was sent to and received by the appropriate officials. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/13/2020. (CLF) (LMF).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RLK)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFER IN from Orlando Division Case Number :6:20-cv-230-Orl-31JEK. Case assigned to District Judge Philip R. Lammens and Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven. New Case Number: 5:20-cv-60-Oc-35PRL. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (RLK)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to Ocala. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/12/2020. (LAM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION in support of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kara Adams. (RDO)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kara Adams. (RDO) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order and MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kara Adams. (RDO)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants filed by Kara Adams.(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lane
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Middendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hawk Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Adams
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sailor Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quinetta Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barbara Duprey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danyell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lauren Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brenda Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clara Rodriguez-Iznaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christel Ivester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelly Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Qujuania Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mary Lassabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelina Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alci Bonannee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eneshia Carlyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cora Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cristy Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosa Enedia Pazos Cingari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashlei Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Monica Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delixsia Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natisha Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toni Corker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latasha Pharr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lavonya Polite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crystal Tunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beverly A Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeralyn R Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alita Edeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whitney Castillo-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vicki Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ana G. Mursuli-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonyini Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keshia Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carol Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Magda Luz Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Kallen-Zury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamila Longmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D Anda Norbergs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anita Sgarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anastassia Bogomolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Belkis Soca Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosetta V. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teresa Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jean Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toni Lee Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicole Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicole Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?