United States of America v. Sachs et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Daniel F. Sweigard, Adam L. Sachs, Roberta Gail Henry and Lake County Tax Collector
Case Number: 5:2020cv00073
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lake County Tax Collector.(Brionez, Stephanie)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 03/12/2020 by United States of America as to Roberta Gail Henry. (Carroll, Allison)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 03/18/2020 by United States of America as to Daniel F. Sweigard. (Carroll, Allison)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 03/05/2020 by United States of America as to Lake County Tax Collector. (Carroll, Allison)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (HAI)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (KAC)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): No (Carroll, Allison)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-73-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Carroll, Allison)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for A. Sachs, #3 Proposed Summons for R. Henry, #4 Proposed Summons for Lake Co. Tax Collector, #5 Proposed Summons for D. Sweigard)(Carroll, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sachs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Sweigard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam L. Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Gail Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Tax Collector
Represented By: Stephanie Brionez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Allison C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?