Gunn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Heidi H. Gunn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00382
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF of service as to Office of Attorney General by Heidi H. Gunn. (RLK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel by Heidi H. Gunn. (RLK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Heidi H. Gunn. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (RLK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney Office)(RLK)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/20/2020. (JWM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Heidi H. Gunn. Related case(s): No (Culbertson, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (LAB)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/18/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-382-Oc-18PRL. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Heidi H. Gunn (Jacobs, Sarah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Heidi H. Gunn. (Culbertson, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Heidi H. Gunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi H. Gunn
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?