Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. Phonex Realty Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Phonex Realty Homes, Inc., Kim Disalvo, Patrick J. Disalvo, James Scelfo, Alan Tarpell, Keith Clarke, Richard Arrighi and Bae Scelfo
Case Number: 5:2020cv00384
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Ripeness or Alternatively Decline to Extend Jurisdiction by Bae Scelfo, James Scelfo. (Cvercko, Alexander)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for Defendants Phoenix Realty Homes, Inc., Alan Tarpell, Kim Disalvo, and Patrick J. Disalvo to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 22, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/2/2020. (SMB)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Boyle, Sr on behalf of Kim Disalvo, Patrick J. Disalvo, Phonex Realty Homes, Inc., Alan Tarpell (Boyle, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Kim Disalvo, Patrick J. Disalvo, Phonex Realty Homes, Inc., Alan Tarpell. (Chafe Brockmeyer, Molly)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Chafe Brockmeyer on behalf of Kim Disalvo, Patrick J. Disalvo, Phonex Realty Homes, Inc., Alan Tarpell (Chafe Brockmeyer, Molly)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 9/11/20 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to Alan Tarpell. (Chambers, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 9/16/20 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to Phonex Realty Homes, Inc.. (Chambers, William)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 9/14/2020 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to James Scelfo. (Chambers, William)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 9/14/2020 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to Bae Scelfo. (Chambers, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Richard Arrighi, Keith Clarke, Kim Disalvo, Patrick J. Disalvo, Phonex Realty Homes, Inc., Bae Scelfo, James Scelfo, Alan Tarpell. (RLK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Bae Scelfo by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to James Scelfo by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Kim Disalvo by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Patrick J. Disalvo by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Keith Clarke by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Richard Arrighi by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Phoenix Realty Homes, Inc by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Alan Tarpell by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (RLK).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Chambers, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT Civil cover sheet to Complaint filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company.(Chambers, William) Modified on 8/24/2020 (RLK).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (KAC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-384-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Southern-Owners Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17195930) filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chambers, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. Phonex Realty Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: William S. Chambers, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phonex Realty Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Disalvo
Represented By: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Disalvo
Represented By: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Scelfo
Represented By: Alexander B. Cvercko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Tarpell
Represented By: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Arrighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bae Scelfo
Represented By: Alexander B. Cvercko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?