Richards v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Richards
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00385
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/17/2021 (HAI)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/12/2021; Dispositive motions due by 11/12/2021; Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 10, 2022, at 11:00 AM. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Bench Trial set on the MARCH 2022 trial term in Ocala Courtroom TBD before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/14/2020. (KAC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hinckley, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Proposal for Settlement to Defendant, GEICO by Michael Richards (Hinckley, Christopher) Modified on 10/1/2020 (HAI).
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Richards. Related case(s): n (Hinckley, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael Richards. (Hinckley, Christopher)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company.(Lawson, Jennifer)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Rae Daum on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Daum, Cassandra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dion K. Bass on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Bass, Dion)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Bechtold on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Bechtold, Jill)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon D. Pressley on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Pressley, Jonathon)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Dkt. #5) is granted to the extent Plaintiff's claim in Count III of the Complaint for statutory bad faith is abated pending the determination of Plaintiff's uninsured motorist claim. Defendant shall file its Answer to the Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (SMB)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Michael Richards. (Hinckley, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response to #5 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order or the Court will consider the Motion unopposed. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/10/2020. (SMB)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GEICO General Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Lawson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Lawson, Jennifer)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company.. (Lawson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (KAC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-385-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Marion County, FL, case number 2020-CA-0785 filed in State Court on 05/08/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17198652 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brust, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richards
Represented By: Christopher J. Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Eric Brust
Represented By: Jennifer Pruden Lawson
Represented By: Jill Bechtold
Represented By: Dion K. Bass
Represented By: Cassandra Rae Daum
Represented By: Jonathon D. Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?