Lorincz v. State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance
Plaintiff: Susan Lorincz
Defendant: State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance
Case Number: 5:2020cv00422
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/18/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/14/2021. (RLK)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/30/2021; Dispositive motions due by 8/27/2021; Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 8, 2021, at 9:15 AM. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Jury Trial set on the JANUARY 2022 trial term in Ocala Courtroom TBD before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/24/2020. (KAC)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Susan Lorincz. (Speziok, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance (Knight, Thomas) Modified on 9/10/2020 (RLK).
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance. Related case(s): Yes (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance. (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Speziok on behalf of Susan Lorincz (Speziok, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/9/2020. (KAC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Thomas Kevin Knight on behalf of State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance (Knight, Thomas) Modified on 9/9/2020 (LAB).
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Brandon Jay Bornstein on behalf of State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance (Knight, Thomas) Modified on 9/9/2020 (LAB).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-422-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 5th Judicial Circuit in and for Marion County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-001277 filed in State Court on 8/10/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17279708 filed by State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Composite exhibit A, #2 State Court ANSWER Composite exhibit A, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Composite exhibit A, #5 State Court Other Documents Composite exhibit A)(Knight, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorincz v. State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lorincz
Represented By: Paul Bruce Brockway
Represented By: Christopher M. Speziok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutal Automobile Insurance
Represented By: Brandon Jay Bornstein
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?