Dorsey v. Social Security Administration, Regional Office
Plaintiff: Allen L Dorsey, Sr
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Regional Office
Case Number: 5:2020cv00465
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Deputy Clerk
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFER IN from the Eastern District of Virginia. Case assigned to District Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New Case Number: 5:20-cv-465-Oc-32PRL. (LAB)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00723. File received electronically
September 22, 2020 Case TRANSFERRED electronically to the Middle District of Florida at Ocala. Original electronic case file, #8 Transfer Order, and Docket Report sent. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court following transfer from the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division. (ECF No. #5.) Having determined that this case was erroneously transferred to this Court instead of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Ocala Division, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Ocala Division. Upon transfer, this case shall be administratively CLOSED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 09/22/2020. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Notification of transfer of 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights from the Middle District of Florida Case No. 6:20cv1302 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, ) [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-01302. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2020: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ). [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of inquiry by Allen L. Dorsey, Sr. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.] [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/15/2020. (SC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.] [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allen L. Dorsey, Sr. Related case(s): yes. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MAA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.][Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 7/22/2020. (copy mailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.] [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Allen L. Dorsey, Sr. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.] [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT titled "Petition for Release of Benefits" against Social Security Administration, Regional Office filed by Allen L. Dorsey, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/16/2020.] [Transferred from vaed on 9/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Social Security Administration, Regional Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Regional Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen L Dorsey, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?