Garcia o/b/o S.G. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Garcia o/b/o S.G.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00473
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RLK)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing Plaintiff to provide service documents to Clerk by October 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/1/2020. (AR)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Elizabeth Garcia o/b/o S.G.. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/29/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (LAB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-473-Oc-18PRL. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (SJB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Elizabeth Garcia o/b/o S.G.. (Steinberg, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Elizabeth Garcia o/b/o S.G.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia o/b/o S.G. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Garcia o/b/o S.G.
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?