City of Ocala, FL v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Ocala, FL
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corp., 3M Company, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Dupont de Nemours & Company, BASF Corporation, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., United Technologies Corp., TYCO Fire Products L.P., The Chemours Company, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Dynax Corp., Corteva, Inc., Arkema Inc., National Foam, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Angus Fire Armour Corporation and Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00623
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the District of South Carolina as case 2:21-cv-00130, filed on 1/13/2021. (LAB)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of South Carolina. Conditional Transfer Order. (CTO-41) MDL case number: 2873. (LAB)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 #7 motions by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc., and Arkema, Inc. to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 30 days after Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision regarding transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/7/2021. (AR)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Appearance and Notice of Designation of primary email address by Charles Roy Forman on behalf of City of Ocala, FL (Forman, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2021 (HAI).
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/20/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/6/2021. (BIA)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Roy Forman on behalf of City of Ocala, FL (Forman, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2021 (HAI).
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P... (Sloan, Michael)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arkema Inc.. (Thompson, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 5:20-cv-00623-Oc-37PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/4/2021. (SMB)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P.. (Sloan, Michael)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/31/2020. (KAC)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-623-Orl-30PRL. (SJB)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in and for Marion County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-1703 filed in State Court on 10/20/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17706762 filed by TYCO Fire Products L.P., Chemguard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court Pending Motions Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents All Remaining State Court Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sloan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Ocala, FL v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont de Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYCO Fire Products L.P.
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ocala, FL
Represented By: Vanessa Thomas
Represented By: Charles Roy Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?