United States of America v. Bowden
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Christopher Bowden
Case Number: 5:2020mc00003
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Show Cause Hearing hearing previously scheduled for 04/21/20 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (MJT)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing. The hearing will be rescheduled by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/15/2020. (MJT)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue the April 21, 2020 Hearing by United States of America. (Park, Scott)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF of service by United States of America (Park, Scott)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (MJT)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing respondent to show cause why he should not be compelled to comply with IRS Summons. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/24/2020. (AR) (HAI).
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Summons)(LAB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2020: #3 Exhibit civil cover sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?