Weaver v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Danatte Weaver
Defendant: Commisisoner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 5:2021cv00076
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service as to Attorney General by Danatte Weaver. (RLK)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service as to Office of Regional Counsel by Danatte Weaver. (RLK)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Danatte Weaver. Commisisoner of Social Security served on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (RLK)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Danatte Weaver. (Liebenhaut, Matthew) Modified on 2/23/2021 (RLK).
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commisisoner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RLK)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 form for Civil Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USM-285 for SSA, #2 Supplement USM-285 for Atty Gen)(Liebenhaut, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/10/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/10/2021. (SA)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (LAB)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Danatte Weaver. See Document filed with #1 Complaint as attachment. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (counsel emailed) (AKC)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-76-GKS-PRL. (LRB)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danatte Weaver filed by Danatte Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Affidavit Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Affidavit)(Liebenhaut, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danatte Weaver
Represented By: Matthew David Liebenhaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisisoner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?