Anki v. Swanees Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KATIE ANKI
Defendant: JIMMY RAY MCDONALD, JR, SWANEES TRUCKING, LLC and Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00084
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Joinder of Third-Parties due by 4/30/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/30/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/29/2021. (RLK)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2022; Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2022; Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2022, at 10:30 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr.; Jury Trial set on the JANUARY 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr.; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/1/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/19/2021. (SMB)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stokes, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr., Swanees Trucking, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Canal Insurance Company for Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr., Swanees Trucking, LLC.. (Stokes, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action Defendants Related Case Notice per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr., Swanees Trucking, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Stokes, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Answer and Defenses of Defendant, Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr. ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr..(Stokes, Brian)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Katie Anki. (Huttman, Laurence)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (SMB)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0084-JSM-PRL. (SJB)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit, in and for Marion County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-001970 filed in State Court on 12/09/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17864842 filed by JIMMY RAY MCDONALD, JR, SWANEES TRUCKING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court ANSWER Exhibit B - Answer and Defenses, #3 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibits C-S, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anki v. Swanees Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMY RAY MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWANEES TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Ray McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATIE ANKI
Represented By: Laurence Craig Huttman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?