Shellman v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Joseph Henry Shellman, Jr.
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2021cv00135
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 TRANSFER to Tampa Division and assigned case number 8:21-cv-629-SDM-SPF (HAI)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Tampa Division of this Court for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall immediately forward the file to that Division. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/17/2021. (JND)
March 16, 2021 FEES paid by Joseph Henry Shellman, Jr (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number OCA-11820). (RLK)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/16/2021. (HAI)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Henry Shellman, Jr. (No service copies provided)(LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shellman v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Henry Shellman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?