Scala v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Scala
Defendant: ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS GmbH, Eisai Co., Ltd., ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and Eisai, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00210
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Abel, Jonathan)
June 7, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law of Joinder (Abel, Jonathan)
June 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for W. Roger Smith, III to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18336217 for $150 by Colleen Scala. (Dearing, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 7, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Ryan J. Duplechin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18336148 for $150 by Colleen Scala. (Dearing, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part,and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Eisai, Inc.. (Raiford, Anitra) Modified on 6/8/2021 (LAB).
June 7, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 9/15/2021. (LAB)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Joint Agreed Motion to Extend Case Management Report Deadline. The parties' deadline to file a Case Management Report is extended to September 15, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/4/2021. (SMB)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report with Memorandum of Law by Eisai, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Re: Belviq (Lorcaserin HCI) Prods. Liab. Litig., No. 3005, Doc. 1, #2 Exhibit In Re: Belviq (Lorcaserin HCI) Prods. Liab. Litig., No. 3005, Doc. 2, #3 Exhibit Defendants Memorandum in Opp to Motion to Transfer Actions, #4 Exhibit Interested Parties Response to Motion to Transfer, #5 Exhibit Stanton v. Wells Fargo Order)(Raiford, Anitra)
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Eisai, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Raiford, Anitra)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/13/2021. (JWM)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Alan E. Rothman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18238265 for $150 by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Abel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Heidi Levine to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18238241 for $150 by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Abel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Abel, Jonathan)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendants Eisai Inc. and Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Eisai Inc. and Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to June 7, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/29/2021. (SMB)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eisai, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Eisai Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Eisai Corporation of North America for Eisai, Inc... (Raiford, Anitra)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eisai, Inc.. (Raiford, Anitra)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Martin Levin on behalf of Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Levin, Drew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Farinas Soto on behalf of Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Soto, Nicole)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Calmus Abel on behalf of Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Abel, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Colleen Scala (Dearing, David)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Colleen Scala as to Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Dearing, David) Modified on 4/16/2021 (LAB).
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Colleen Scala. Related case(s): Yes (Dearing, David)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Eisai, Inc.(LAB)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (SMB)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0210-JSM-PRL. (SJB)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arena Pharmaceuticals, GmbH, Arena Pharmaceuticals, INC., Eisai Co., Ltd., Eisai, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18120298) filed by Colleen Scala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Dearing, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scala v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisai Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Drew Martin Levin
Represented By: Jonathan Calmus Abel
Represented By: Nicole Farinas Soto
Represented By: Alan E. Rothman
Represented By: Anitra F. Raiford
Represented By: Heidi Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisai, Inc.
Represented By: Anitra F. Raiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Scala
Represented By: David Patrick Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?