Tumer v. United States of America
Petitioner: Avery Leanard Tumer
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00239
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Endorsed ORDER granting #3 Motion for Order to Show Cause to the extent the relief requested is consistant with this Order, See doc. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/1/2021. (LMF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing United States of America to respond to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 5:17-cr-19-RBD-PRL within 90 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/1/2021. (LMF)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Avery Leanard Tumer. (LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/3/2021. (RLK)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 5:17-cr-19-RBD-PRL filed by Avery Leanard Tumer. Erroneously filed in case 5:21-cv-110(RLK) Modified on 5/3/2021 (RLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tumer v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Avery Leanard Tumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Felicetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?