Whetstone v. Warden, FCC Coleman-Low
Petitioner: Caster Delaney Whetstone
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - Low
Case Number: 5:2021cv00289
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and directing Clerk to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/19/2021. (CCB)
June 21, 2021 FEES paid by Caster Delaney Whetstone (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number OCA-12006) (LAB)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/27/2021. (HAI)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Caster Delaney Whetstone. (No fees paid, no service copies provided) (HAI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whetstone v. Warden, FCC Coleman-Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Caster Delaney Whetstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?