Tucker v. Wray
Plaintiff: Jason D Tucker
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 5:2021cv00391
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
2 Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By Tuesday, September 28, 2021, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file will result in this action being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/7/2021. (BIA)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Christopher A. Wray. (Ragler, Phillip)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/2/2021. (BIA)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for all pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/30/2021. (HAI)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 5:21-cv-391-RBD-PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0391-JSM-PRL. (SJB)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Christopher A. Wray. Related case(s): Yes (Ragler, Phillip)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit, case number 2021 SC 002699 AX filed in State Court on 06/21/2021. filed by Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?