Silva v. Burch et al
Plaintiff: Marlin Silva
Defendant: John H Burch, Michael Facundus, Erica Burch, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C., Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4 and John H. Burch, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00417
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Erica Burch, John H. Burch, Jr, Michael Facundus, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C., Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4. Answer due by 10/29/2021. (HAI)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Clerk's Default; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their response on or before October 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/8/2021. (SA)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Murray B. Silverstein on behalf of Erica Burch, John H. Burch, Jr, Michael Facundus, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C., Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4 (Silverstein, Murray)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, and Petition to Set Aside Default Against Defendant Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 LLC by All Defendants. (Cummings, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Cummings on behalf of Erica Burch, John H. Burch, Jr, Michael Facundus, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C., Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4 (Cummings, Brian)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C. by Marlin Silva. (Chatzky, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 09/24/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Erica Burch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Penalta, Gabrielle)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 09/24/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Penalta, Gabrielle)
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/24/2021 by Marlin Silva as to John H. Burch, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process)(Penalta, Gabrielle)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/22/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Rise N Vape Smoke Shop)(Penalta, Gabrielle)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons)(Penalta, Gabrielle) Modified on 9/23/2021 (HAI).
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 09/17/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Michael Facundus. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Michael Facundus)(Penalta, Gabrielle) Modified on 9/23/2021 (HAI).
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 09/15/2021 by Marlin Silva as to Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service on Rise N Vape Smoke Shop)(Penalta, Gabrielle) Modified on 9/23/2021 (HAI).
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Erica Burch, John H. Burch, Jr, Michael Facundus, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C., Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1, Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4. (LAB)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (LAB)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 5:21-cv-00417-MMH-PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-417-JSM-PRL. (SJB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18602918) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons)(Penalta, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Burch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Silva
Represented By: Gabrielle Alexa Penalta
Represented By: Emily Benson Chatzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Facundus
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Burch
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #1
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise N Vape Smoke Shop 2 L.L.C.
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise N Vape Smoke Shop LLC. #4
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Burch, Jr.
Represented By: Brian R. Cummings
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?