Leira v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Armando Robert Leira, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00118
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
2 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF of service as to Office of General Counsel by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. (RLK)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF of service as to Attorney General by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. (RLK)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 5:22-cv-0118-TJC-PRL. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (SJB)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (RLK)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
March 8, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RLK)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/4/2022. (SA) Modified on 3/4/2022 (LMF).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed - Plaintiff complied at Doc. No. #3) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions - Plaintiff complied at Doc. No. #4). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 3/3/2022. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (LAB)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-0118-GKS-PRL. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (SJB)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. (Berger, Erik)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. (Berger, Erik)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Armando Robert Leira, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leira v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Robert Leira, Jr.
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?