Virtue RX, LLC v. The Sera Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Virtue RX, LLC
Defendant: The Sera Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00344
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER remanding case to state court; finding as moot #12 Motion for Remand; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/16/2022. (EK)
September 13, 2022 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cohen, Corey)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Gregory Gershuni to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 14 days. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/26/2022. (AKC)
August 22, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Sera Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sawyer Smith, Ashley)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. After this Order, the Clerk will no longer send copies of docket entries by U.S. Mail to counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/16/2022. (KLM)
August 16, 2022 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Virtue RX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cohen, Corey)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #10 Motion for Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/15/2022. (EK)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Virtue RX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cohen, Corey)
August 11, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Gregory Gershuni to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19876421 for $150 by The Sera Labs, Inc.. (Sawyer Smith, Ashley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #4 Order, Amended Notice of Removal in Response to Court's August 5, 2022 Order filed by The Sera Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit)(Sawyer Smith, Ashley)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Virtue RX, LLC. (Cohen, Corey)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by The Sera Labs, Inc..(Sawyer Smith, Ashley)
August 5, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Sera Labs, Inc.. (Sawyer Smith, Ashley)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: no later than Monday, August 15, 2022, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal that establishes the grounds for the Court's exercise of subject-matter jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/5/2022. (BRS)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/4/2022. (AKC)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-0344-JA-PRL. (SJB)
August 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit in and for Lake County, Florida, case number 2022-CA1071 filed in State Court on June 17, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number BFLMDC-19843415 filed by The Sera Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sawyer Smith, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virtue RX, LLC v. The Sera Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virtue RX, LLC
Represented By: Charles Martin Tatelbaum
Represented By: Corey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sera Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley A. Sawyer Smith
Represented By: Gregory Gershuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?