Solano-Moreta v. Warden, FCC Coleman - USP II
Petitioner: Jorge Solano-Moreta
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - USP II
Case Number: 5:2023cv00559
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for failure to comply with a Court order and failure to prosecute. The Clerk is DIRECTED to deny as moot any pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/22/2023. (BGS)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/4/2023. (LAB)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - federal filed by Jorge Solano-Moreta. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano-Moreta v. Warden, FCC Coleman - USP II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Solano-Moreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCC Coleman - USP II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?