Bingham v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Loura Bingham
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv00225
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to #15 the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/27/2024. (JCD)
June 27, 2024 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Janousek, John) Modified on 6/27/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Loura Bingham (Ahmad, Dana) Modified on 6/27/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Notice of Settlement, directing the parties to file a joint motion for dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out the file by 8/2/2024. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/3/2024. (JCD)
May 31, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of settlement by The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Janousek, John)
May 17, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to Defendant filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Janousek, John)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Janousek, John)
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Morgan Janousek on behalf of The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John Janousek. (Janousek, John)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Janousek, John)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to Defendant by Loura Bingham. (Ahmad, Dana)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Filed in State Court on 03/21/2024. (EVK) Modified to edit docket text on 5/2/2024 (EVK).
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against The Standard Fire Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Loura Bingham. Filed in State Court on 2/14/2024.(EVK) Modified to edit docket text on 5/2/2024 (EVK).
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-225-TJC-PRL. (ARL)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, in and for Marion County, case number 2024-CA-000312 filed in State Court on 2/14/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22048220 filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit Police Report, #6 Exhibit Voter Registration Record for Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit Citizenship of Defendant, #8 Exhibit Demand Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janousek, John) Modified to edit docket text on 5/2/2024 (EVK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bingham v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loura Bingham
Represented By: Dana Lynn Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John Morgan Janousek
Represented By: Brad Stewart Higginbotham
Represented By: Douglas G. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?