Federal Trade Commission v. Romero et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Frank Romero, Patricia Martinez and ARPA Real Estate LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00473
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 3001 Federal Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 the Federal Trade Commission's unopposed Motion for Extension of case deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/7/2024. (AR)
October 4, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Judicial Assistant). (AMP)
October 4, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint, and Joint Case Management Report by Federal Trade Commission. (Erickson, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 20, 2024 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 5:24-cv-473-BJD-PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This cause is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, with his consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/19/2024. (SMB)
September 18, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 09/18/2024 by Federal Trade Commission as to Arpa Real Estate LLC (St. Marie, Hanna) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (AM).
September 18, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 09/18/2024 by Federal Trade Commission as to Patricia Martinez (St. Marie, Hanna) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (AM).
September 18, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 09/18/2024 by Federal Trade Commission as to Frank Romero. (St. Marie, Hanna) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (AM).
September 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Federal Trade Commission. Related case(s): Yes (St. Marie, Hanna)
September 4, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to ARPA Real Estate LLC, Patricia Martinez, Frank Romero. (JDR)
September 4, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-00473-JSM-PRL. (JOS)
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Romero, #3 Proposed Summons - Martinez, #4 Proposed Summons - ARPA)(St. Marie, Hanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARPA Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Hanna L. St. Marie
Represented By: Christopher Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?