Turcotte v. Pub 44, Inc.
Plaintiff: Annette Turcotte
Defendant: Pub 44, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv00484
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Volusia
Presiding Judge: G. Kendall Sharp
Presiding Judge: David A. Baker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; dismissing case for lack of prosecution; directing the Clerk to close the file. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/13/2010. (BRS)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Annette Turcotte. It is RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED that the case be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 12/21/2009. (TMT)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Attorney David Glasser is publicly admonished and sanctioned in the amount of $500.00; striking 19 Case Management Report. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/12/2009. (BRS)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 20 & 21 to this Court's Order to Show Cause. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court admonish and sanction the Plaintiff, David Glasser. That the case management report be stricken, and the parties be ordered to file a completed report by a time and date certain. Further misconduct will result in referral to the Florida Bar and Grievance Committee of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/8/2009. (TMT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turcotte v. Pub 44, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Turcotte
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pub 44, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?