Tillman v. Henriquez et al
Plaintiff: Earnest E. Tillman
Defendant: Orange County, Florida, Kevin E. Beary, P. Parks Duncan, Jr., Timothy Henriquez, Sylvester Herrerra, Jr. and Carlos Torres
Case Number: 6:2009cv01667
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: David A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 108 motion to dismiss; denying 110 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants Melville and Duncan by no later than September 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/22/2013. (NWH)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 78 Motion for summary judgment. Defendant Henriquez is entitled to summary judgment as a matter of law on Plaintiff's claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/10/2012. (TKW)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to dismiss; denying as moot 48 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 49 Motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/24/2011. (ED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Henriquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest E. Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin E. Beary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Parks Duncan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Henriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Herrerra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?