Batchelor v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Donna R. Batchelor
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2011cv01071
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Brevard
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 275 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/29/2016. (VMF)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 278 Motion to extend time. See Order for Details.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/9/2016. (VMF)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/22/2015. (VMF)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 122 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/16/2014. (VMF)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER -- Geico's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Doc. 110) is OVERRULED. Magistrate Judge Kelly's Order (Doc. 108) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/16/2014. (VMF)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Pretrial Order (Doc 72) (Doc. 75) are SUSTAINED. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly's Order Dated March 4, 2014 (Doc. 72) is REVERSED. Geico Casualty Company's Motion to Compel Plaintiff Responses to Interrogatories (Doc. 53) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/9/2014. (VMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batchelor v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna R. Batchelor
Represented By: David Michael Alpizar
Represented By: O. John Alpizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Adam A. Duke
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?