McGill et al v. Pinnacle Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas C. McGill and Vickie D. McGill
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., IMH Assets Corporation, Impac CMB Trust Series 2007-A, Christiana Bank and Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS"), Impac Funding Corporation, All Persons Claiming By, Through or Under Such Person, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaini, Does 1 to 20, Inclusive and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 6:2012cv01142
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Seminole
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER adopting 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; denying 38 MOTION to Reinstate Case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/9/2013. (BRS)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Damages; dismissing case with prejudice; directing the Clerk of the Court to close this file. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/9/2013. (BRS)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER striking 3 First Amended Complaint; denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; and setting deadline of January 11, 2013, for the filing of a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/14/2012. (EK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill et al v. Pinnacle Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie D. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMH Assets Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impac CMB Trust Series 2007-A
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS")
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impac Funding Corporation
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Claiming By, Through or Under Such Person, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Christian Watson Hancock
Represented By: Jose David Vega
Represented By: Nicholas J. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?