Leblanc v. USG7, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Leblanc
Defendant: USG7, LLC, USDS, LLC and Mike Keen
Case Number: 6:2012cv01235
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part 100 Motion for Attorney Fees and costs; Adopting Report and Recommendations - re 101 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $24,409.50 and taxable costs in the amount of $808.75. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs as follows: Against USG7, LLC and USDS, LLC, jointly and severally, for $13,167.00. Against USG7, LLC for $5,689.50. Against USDS, LLC for $5, 553.00. On or before April 13, 2016, Plaintiffs shall submit Bills of Costs in accordance with this Order. Specifically, Plaintiffs shall submit the following Bills of Costs: Against USG7, LLC and USDS, LLC, jointly and severally, for $350.00. Against USG7, LLC for $153.75. Against USDS, LLC for $305.00. The Clerk is directed to tax costs immediately upon receipt of the Bills of Costs. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/6/2016. (DJD)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part 90 Renewed Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/3/2015. (KMS)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 57 Report and Recommendations. The Answer (Doc. 26) of Defendants is stricken from the record. The Clerk shall enter default against Defendant USDS, LLC d/b/a Fugitive Extraditions Unit and Defenda nt Mike Keen. Plaintiffs shall be awarded their reasonable expenses incurred as a result of Defendants' failure to attend the noticed mediation conference held May 15, 2014. Plaintiffs shall document their mediation expenses on or before Friday, September 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/5/2014. (DJD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leblanc v. USG7, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leblanc
Represented By: Scott C. Adams
Represented By: N. Ryan LaBar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USG7, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?