Soto v. Geico Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Silverio Soto, Jr.
Defendant: Ana Martinez and Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 6:2013cv00181
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Volusia
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Presiding Judge: Karla R. Spaulding
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Defendant's Third Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/28/2014. (SEN)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OMNIBUS ORDER granting 68 Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine; granting 69 Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiff's Third Motion in Limine; granting 71 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 72 Defendant's First Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice in part and deferring ruling in part 73 Defendant's Second Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/21/2014. (SEN)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 51 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/16/2014. (SEN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Geico Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Raymond L. Roebuck
Represented By: Alexis Marie Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverio Soto, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?