Bowman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Eric Bowman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2013cv00614
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Osceola
Presiding Judge: Gregory A. Presnell
Referring Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 406(b) filed by Eric Bowman.The Uncontested Petition and Memorandum in Support for Reasonable Attorney Fees Pursuant to 4 2 U.S.C. 406(b) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded a fee of $20,714.00, conditioned upon return of the $6,464.67 EAJA fee payment, resulting in a net fee of $14,278.92 paid out of the past due benefits awarded to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/29/2015. (TKW)
October 22, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2312(d) filed by Eric Bowman. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/22/2014. (TKW)
August 14, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Memorandum social security - plaintiff filed by Eric Bowman. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/14/2014. (TKW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowman
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?