Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Professional Finish, Inc., Lantagne's Auto Body, LLC, H.D. Way Corporation, Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc., Northville Collision, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Bernardi & Judge Corp., Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., Bernardi & Judge Corp. a Michigan corporation doing business as Berkley Collision, Inc. and H.D. Way Corporation a Michigan corporation doing business as Alpine Collision Center
Defendant: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Meemic Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., United Services Automobile Association, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2014cv06007
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 66 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney David Danny O'Brien terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/16/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for David D. O'Brien to withdraw as attorney by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Litchford, Hal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Kyle Patrick Konwinski terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 11/1/2017. (Smith, Thomas)
November 1, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for Kyle Patrick Konwinski to withdraw as attorney by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Konwinski, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Gary J. Mouw terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/31/2017. (Smith, Thomas)
October 31, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for Gary Mouw to withdraw as attorney by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mouw, Gary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Attorney G. Calvin Hayes to be removed from the service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/14/2016. (JMP)
January 13, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for G. Calvin Hayes to withdraw as attorney and from CM/ECF Filing Notices by Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company. (Hayes, G.) Modified on 1/14/2016 (IGC).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/21/2015. (ED)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Set deadlines: Amended complaint due by 9/8/2015 (IGC)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #36 motion to dismiss; terminating #41 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015.Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 16, 2015 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #45 objections to #41 Report and Recommendations by Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yohai, David) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET).
June 29, 2015 Filing 45 OMNIBUS OBJECTION filed by Various Plaintiffs re #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (IGC). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Set as to #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) . Responses due by 6/29/2015 (IGC) Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 12, 2015 Entered Error
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 3, 2015 Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW)
April 20, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Carothers Oates on behalf of Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co. (Oates, Claire)
March 24, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Yohai, David)
March 17, 2015 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Bernardi & Judge Corp., Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantagne's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Franklin v. US, #2 Exhibit Ultimate Collision v. State Farm)(Fry, Allison)
March 9, 2015 Set deadlines as to #36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Responses due by 3/13/2015 by Plaintiffs. (IGC)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting (153) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/6/2015. (SMW)
February 20, 2015 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Cincinatti Insurance Company, The, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Marathon Ins. Co., Progressive Michigan Ins. Co., Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yohai, David)
February 18, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori McAllister on behalf of Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company (McAllister, Lori)
February 13, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company Withdrawal of Appearance of Holly L. Cline (Cline, Holly)
January 7, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter, Michael N. Beekhuizen, Peter T. Snow and Mark J. Botti on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Carpenter, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2015 (JET).
December 23, 2014 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan. (Ezzie, Joseph) Modified on 12/24/2014 (JET).
December 11, 2014 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 30 MDL tag along case / Multidistrict litigation member by Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto Club Insurance Association for Auto Club Group Insurance Company, Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, Meemic Insurance Company.. (Hayes, G.)
December 4, 2014 Filing 30 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31TBS receipt of original record from the District of Western District of Michigan, case number: 1:14-cv-1107-GJQ. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:14-cv-6007-Orl-31TBS. (LAM)
December 3, 2014 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:14-cv-01107. File received electronically
December 2, 2014 Filing 28 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Middle District of Florida; case transferred to Middle District of Florida under MDL No. 2557, In Re: Auto Body Shop Antitrust Litigation (pjw) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 27 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Middle District of Florida regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2557, In Re: Auto Body Shop Antitrust Litigation (pjw) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 25, 2014 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by defendant Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (French, Thomas) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 25, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Holly Lechliter Cline on behalf of defendant Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Cline, Holly) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 25, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas Anthony French on behalf of defendant Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (French, Thomas) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan (Kogut, Anthony) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Kogut, Anthony) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Secura Supreme Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company, Corporate Parent Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Secura Supreme Insurance Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Secura Insurance a Mutual Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Joint Motion #10 to Stay; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanover American Insurance Company, The identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, The, Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Company, The, Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Hanover American Insurance Company, The (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hanover Insurance Company, The identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, The, Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Hanover Insurance Company, The (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, The, Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc., Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Company for Citizens Insurance Company of America (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hastings Mutual Insurance Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 18, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott L. Mandel on behalf of defendants Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company (Mandel, Scott) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE (Service Copy of Motion to Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Voluminous Exhibits)(jlg) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Expedited Consideration Requested #10 filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAllister, Lori) Modified text on 11/13/2014 (pjw). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Expedited Consideration Requested, by defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Hastings Mutual Insurance Company, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company, Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company, Secura Insurance a Mutual Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; (McAllister, Lori) Modified text on 11/13/2014 (pjw). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Theodore Joseph Greeley on behalf of defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company (Greeley, Theodore) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lori McAllister on behalf of defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover American Insurance Company, The, Hanover Insurance Company, The, Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company (McAllister, Lori) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cranmer, Thomas) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 12, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Danny O'Brien on behalf of defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (O'Brien, David) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 5, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyle Patrick Konwinski on behalf of defendant Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Konwinski, Kyle) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
November 5, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gary J. Mouw on behalf of defendant Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Mouw, Gary) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 30, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 30, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anthony S. Kogut on behalf of defendants Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan (Kogut, Anthony) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to all defendants (kvt) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Gordon J. Quist (kvt) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 3 FIRST MOTION to expedite the return to Plaintiffs the proposed Summonses by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.; (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Bernardi & Judge Corp, Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., H.D. Way Corporation, Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Northville Collision, Inc., Professional Finish, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3023117 (Rodenhouse, Andrew) [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons)(Rodenhouse, Andrew) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by H.D. Way Corporation, Bernardi & Judge Corp, Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc., R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc., Judd's Body Shop, Inc., Lantange's Auto Body, LLC, Professional Finish, Inc., Classic Auto Collision, Inc., Jerry's Body Shop, Inc., Northville Collision, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body, Inc., Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits 1-4, #2 Summonses)(Rodenhouse, Andrew) Modified text on 10/27/2014 (kvt). [Transferred from miwd on 12/3/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas A. French
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Holly L. Cline
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover American Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Millers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Co. of Michigan
Represented By: Joseph Edward Ezzie
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David Michael Peterson, II
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: G. Calvin Hayes
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Anthony S. Kogut
Represented By: John A. Yeager
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meemic Insurance Company
Represented By: G. Calvin Hayes
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer State Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Lee Mandel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Anthony S. Kogut
Represented By: John A. Yeager
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Insurance a Mutual Company
Represented By: Scott Lee Mandel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Michigan Ins. Co.
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Mann Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Marjorie M. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinatti Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Lee Mandel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: David Danny O'Brien
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Group Insurance Company
Represented By: G. Calvin Hayes
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Brian J. D'Amico
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Lee Mandel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Lee Mandel
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allmerica Financial Alliance Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Marathon Ins. Co.
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan, IV
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Greeley
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: David Danny O'Brien
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Finish, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lantagne's Auto Body, LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. Way Corporation
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodenhouse Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northville Collision, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarkston Auto Body II, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R & R Auto Body Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarkston Auto Body, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardi & Judge Corp.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry's Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judd's Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Classic Auto Collision, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardi & Judge Corp. a Michigan corporation doing business as Berkley Collision, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. Way Corporation a Michigan corporation doing business as Alpine Collision Center
Represented By: Andrew John Rodenhouse
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?