Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc., David C. Brosius, Art Walker Auto Service, Inc. and David C. Brosius doing business as Martins Auto Body Works, Inc.
Defendant: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Nationwide General Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, LM Insurance Corporation, General Insurance Company of America, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, 21st Century Assurance Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Travco Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, Esurance Insurance Company, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Dairyland Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and 21st Century Centennial Insurance
Case Number: 6:2014cv06019
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER for the parties to confer and advise the Court by July 10, 2020, how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENDORSED ORDER granting #84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Francis Reklaitis terminated. The Clerk shall remove Mr. Reklaitis from the CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/2/2019. (RML)
July 31, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Robert F. Reklaitis to withdraw as attorney by Elephant Insurance Company. (Litchford, Hal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
July 31, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal Kemp Litchford on behalf of Elephant Insurance Company (Litchford, Hal)
July 25, 2019 Filing 82 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 78 MANDATE of USCA as to #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 03/12/19 USCA number: 15-14179. AFFIRMED in part; VACATED in part; and REMANDED in part. (JP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 77 EN BANC OPINION of USCA as to #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc.. EOD: 03/04/19; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14179. AFFIRMED in part/ VACATED in part and REMANDED. (JP)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (304) Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Paula A. Parker and Joseph T. Kissane terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/26/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 13, 2017 Filing 75 OPINION/ORDER of USCA as to #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. EOD: 9/7/2017; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 15-14179. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (JEV)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ENDORSED ORDER granting #73 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Cynthia Fleming Crawford terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/24/2017. (Smith, Thomas)
February 23, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for Cynthia Fleming Crawford to withdraw as attorney by Elephant Insurance Company. (Crawford, Cynthia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (300) Motion to appoint new liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and all related and associated cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Claire Carothers Oates terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/1/2016. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER of USCA reinstating #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc.. EOD: 4/5/16; USCA number: 15-14179-AA. (RDO)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to refile its Motion for Attorney's Fees until 30 days after the later of the resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate or the resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2016. (TKW)
March 4, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to refile Motion for Attorney Fees by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldfine, Dan) Modified on 3/4/2016 (JET).
February 16, 2016 Filing 66 MANDATE of USCA (Order of Dismissal issued as Mandate) as to #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 2/9/16 USCA number: 15-14179-AA. (JET)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS; 6:14-cv-6001-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6010-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6012-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6013-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6015-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6018-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS; 6:14-cv-6022-Orl-31TBS. John C. Trimble and Eric C. McNamar Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/2/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying without prejudice #61 Motion for Attorney Fees, directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/22/2015. (ED)
October 20, 2015 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. re #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #58 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 15-14179. (Fry, Allison)
October 7, 2015 Set deadline as to #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 11/3/2015 (MAL)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
October 6, 2015 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL047694 re #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. (IGC) Copy of Nef showing appeal fee paid mailed to USCA
September 30, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goldfine, Dan)
September 17, 2015 Filing 60 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (MAL)
September 17, 2015 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. (MAL)
September 16, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #56 Order on motion to dismissOrder on Report and Recommendations by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. Filing fee paid. (MAL) Modified on 10/7/2015 (IGC).
September 16, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #56 Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. Filing fee paid. (Fry, Allison) (#58 termed and redocketed at #59)(GJS). Modified on 10/8/2015 (IGC).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
August 17, 2015 Set deadline: Amended complaint due by 9/8/2015 (MAL)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #38 motion to dismiss; granting #39 motion to dismiss; terminating #48 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 31, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel (Grabel, Joshua)
July 16, 2015 Filing 54 RESPONSE to objections to #48 Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travco Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company, State Farm General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
July 16, 2015 Filing 53 RESPONSE to objections to #48 Report and Recommendations GEICO's Response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Objection to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
June 29, 2015 Filing 52 OMNIBUS OBJECTION by various plaintiffs re #48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (94 in 6:14-cv-06008-GAP-TBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiffs . (Fry, Allison) Modified on 6/30/2015 (MAL). Modified on 6/30/2015 (LAK).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Christine A. Hopkinson terminated as counsel for Progressive defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Reset deadline: Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2015 (MAL)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (195) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to remove William R. Sevier from the CM/ECF service list and discontinue serving pleadings and papers on him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 3, 2015 Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: all pending motions to dismiss in cases 6:14-cv-6006, 6:14-cv-6007, 6:14-cv-6008, 6:14-cv-6009, 6:14-cv-6010, 6:14-cv-6011, 6:14-cv-6012, 6:14-cv-6013, 6:14-cv-6014, 6:14-cv-6015, 6:14-cv-6018, 6:14-cv-6019, 6:14-cv-6020, and 6:15-cv-6022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/3/2015. (SMW)
March 26, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company re #30 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Notice of Errata (Fischer, Ian)
March 24, 2015 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travco Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clark, Johanna)
March 24, 2015 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
March 17, 2015 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ultimate Collision v. State Farm)(Fry, Allison)
March 9, 2015 Set deadlines as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 3/13/2015 by Plaintiffs. (IGC)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting (153) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/6/2015. (SMW)
February 25, 2015 Filing 42 Return of service executed on 12/17/14 by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. as to LM General Insurance Company(Fry, Allison) Modified on 2/26/2015 (MAL).
February 25, 2015 Filing 41 PROOF of service on 12/12/14 as to Erie Insurance Exchange by Art Walker Auto Service, Inc., David C. Brosius, Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc. (Fry, Allison) Modified on 2/26/2015 (MAL).
February 23, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE by Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A)(Clark, Johanna)
February 20, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travco Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Clark, Johanna)
February 20, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Goldfine, Dan)
February 20, 2015 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Erie Insurance Exchange. (Coburn, Joseph)
February 20, 2015 Filing 36 Amended (as to signature only) re #33 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation. (Skilling, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/20/2015 (MAL).
February 20, 2015 Filing 35 Amended (as to signature only)re #32 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Skilling, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/20/2015 (MAL).
February 20, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance re #31 Notice Amended as to Signature Only by Elizabeth Skilling on behalf of Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation (Skilling, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/20/2015 (MAL).
February 19, 2015 Filing 33 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation. (Skilling, ELizabeth)
February 19, 2015 Filing 32 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Skilling, ELizabeth)
February 19, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ELizabeth Skilling on behalf of Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation (Skilling, ELizabeth) Modified on 2/20/2015 (MAL). (NOT SIGNED BY ATTORNEY, REFILING).
February 17, 2015 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Government Employee's Insurance Company. (Fischer, Ian)
February 17, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Dan W. Goldfine, Joshua Grabel, Ian Fischer and Jamie Halavais Appearance by Ian Matthew Fischer on behalf of GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Government Employee's Insurance Company (Fischer, Ian)
February 13, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company Withdrawal of Appearance of Holly L. Cline (Cline, Holly)
January 23, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurin H. Mills on behalf of Elephant Insurance Company (Mills, Laurin)
January 23, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Fleming Crawford on behalf of Elephant Insurance Company (Crawford, Cynthia)
January 23, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Sims on behalf of Elephant Insurance Company (Sims, Charles)
January 23, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Francis Reklaitis on behalf of Elephant Insurance Company (Reklaitis, Robert)
January 13, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Coburn on behalf of Erie Insurance Exchange (Coburn, Joseph)
January 13, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Anderson T. Bailey on behalf of Erie Insurance Exchange (Bailey, Anderson)
January 13, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Jones on behalf of Erie Insurance Exchange (Jones, James)
January 13, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Ubersax on behalf of Erie Insurance Exchange (Ubersax, Jeffery)
January 7, 2015 Filing 19 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/06/2015 by Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., David C. Brosius, Art Walker Auto Service, Inc. as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association. (Fry, Allison)
January 7, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carpenter on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Carpenter, Michael)
December 19, 2014 Filing 17 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31TBS. Receipt of original record from the District of Eastern District of Viginia, case number: 3:14-cv-764-HEH. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:14-cv-6019-Orl-31TBS. Copies mailed. (LAM)
December 16, 2014 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00764. File received electronically
December 16, 2014 Case TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida. Original file and Docket Report sent re: 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER ("CTO-4"), MDL No. 2557, In Re: Auto Body Shop Antitrust Litigation. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #11 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. Accordingly, all proceedings in this matter, except the Plaintiff's serving and filing return of summons, are HEREBY STAYED until the JPML renders its transfer decision. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/25/2014. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service re #9 Notice of Appearance, by Gordon A. Coffee on behalf of TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon A. Coffee on behalf of TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Appearance of Counsel)(Coffee, Gordon) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company for the Admission of Holly L. Cline, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/24/2014. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company for the Admission of Thomas A. French, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/24/2014. (walk, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly Lechliter Cline and Certification of Local Counsel Maurice Mullins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4203244. by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Anthony French and Certification of Local Counsel Maurice Mullins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4203230. by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Mullins, Maurice) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 10, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company. Brielle from Plaintiff's attorney's office will come in on 11/12/14 to pick up summons. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 21st Century Assurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance, AIG Property Casualty Company, Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation, Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Elephant Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, General Insurance Company Of America, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TRAVCO Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, and Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 34683027194), filed by Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc., Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc., and David C. Brosius, Art Walker Auto Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas A. French
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Holly L. Cline
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon A. Coffee
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon A. Coffee
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee's Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Jeffery D. Ubersax
Represented By: James Michael Jones
Represented By: Anderson T. Bailey
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon A. Coffee
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Assurance Company
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Secure Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travco Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon A. Coffee
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elephant Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Francis Reklaitis
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Cynthia Fleming Crawford
Represented By: Charles M. Sims
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Laurin H. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Gordon A. Coffee
Represented By: Norman K. Beck
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Timothy J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Vision Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Skilling
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Skilling
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairyland Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Keenan Cottrell
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Farm Bureau Town and Country Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Hardt
Represented By: Kevin V. Logan
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Thomas G. Rohback
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Donovan
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Peter T. Snow
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Represented By: Jason B. Bonk
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John Mastando, III
Represented By: Eric Hochstadt
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Pappas Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whiteford Collision and Refinishing, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Brosius
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Walker Auto Service, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Brosius doing business as Martins Auto Body Works, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: William R. Sevier
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?