Ragusa et al v. Bali Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary S. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Arthur N. Ragusa and Joseph C. Hatcher
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc., RSM US LLP, Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. and Bali Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2017cv00842
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/2017. (CAC)
September 5, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa (Kelly, Sean)
September 1, 2017 Filing 46 Remark: Docs. 31 and 35 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (CAC)
August 30, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (VMF) (ctp)
August 23, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Bali Condominium Association, Inc.. (Deery, James)
August 23, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Third Amended Complaint by Diamond Resorts International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Pelosi, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bali Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bali By-Laws)(Crossland, Brandon)
August 22, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's "Third" Amended Class Action Complaint by Parkway International Owners Association, Inc.. (Huff, Sara)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a motion for class certification is extended to Friday, September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/21/2017. (ZRR)
August 17, 2017 Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Brady, Julie)
August 11, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Diamond Resorts International, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Quimby, Paul)
August 11, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Parkway International Owners Association, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Short, Houston)
August 9, 2017 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bali Condominium Association, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kelly, Sean)
August 9, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Interested persons order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bali Condominium Association, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Deery, James) Modified on 8/10/2017 (RMF).
August 9, 2017 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Bali Condominium Association, Inc.. (Deery, James)
August 7, 2017 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/8/17 to File Motion for Class Certification under Local Rule 4.04 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa. (Meyer, J.) Modified on 8/8/2017 (RMF).
August 3, 2017 reset deadline: Case management report due by 8/28/2017 (RMF)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference. On or before August 21, 2017, the parties shall conduct the case management conference. On or before August 28, 2017, the parties shall file the case management report. Further extensions should not be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/3/2017. (Irick, Daniel)
August 2, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE by RSM US LLP That Service List Should be Amended Removing W.L. Kirk (Kirk, W.)
August 1, 2017 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Parkway International Owners Association, Inc.. (Short, Houston)
July 31, 2017 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/21/17 to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference and 8/28/17 to file the case management report by Diamond Resorts International, Inc.. (Quimby, Paul) Modified on 8/1/2017 (RMF).
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER to Show Cause: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before August 11,2017, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/28/2017. (RN)
July 27, 2017 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bali Condominium Association, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kelly, Sean)
July 27, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Huff on behalf of Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. (Huff, Sara)
July 27, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Short on behalf of Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. (Short, Houston)
July 27, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James Jeffrey Deery on behalf of Bali Condominium Association, Inc. (Deery, James)
July 11, 2017 Filing 24 Remark: Doc. #18 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/10/2017. (ZRR)
July 10, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE by Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant RSM US LLP with Prejudice (Meyer, J.)
July 6, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Richard Kelly on behalf of Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa (Kelly, Sean)
June 30, 2017 reset deadlines: Answer due 8/1/17 for RSM US LLP. (RMF)
June 30, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by W. L. Kirk, Jr on behalf of RSM US LLP (Kirk, W.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. On or before August 1, 2017, Defendant RSM US LLP shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/30/2017. (Irick, Daniel)
June 30, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by RSM US LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Duke, Samantha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 29, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Diamond Resorts International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International, Inc... (Crossland, Brandon)
June 27, 2017 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/02/2017 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa as to Parkway International Owners Association, Inc.. (Meyer, J.)
June 27, 2017 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/02/2017 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa as to Diamond Resorts International, Inc.. (Meyer, J.)
June 27, 2017 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 06/19/2017 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa as to RSM US LLP. (Meyer, J.)
June 27, 2017 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/02/2017 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa as to Bali Condominium Association, Inc.. (Meyer, J.)
June 15, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Thomas Crossland on behalf of Diamond Resorts International, Inc. (Crossland, Brandon)
June 14, 2017 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/11/2017. (SN)
May 31, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa. Related case(s): no (Meyer, J.)
May 31, 2017 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement #8 by Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa. (Meyer, J.) Modified on 6/1/2017 (RMF).
May 31, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Andrew Meyer on behalf of Joseph C. Hatcher, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa, Sandra Ragusa (Meyer, J.)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/17/2017. (VMF) (ctp)
May 17, 2017 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/17/2017. (Attachments: #1, #2, #3 )(VMF) (ctp)
May 11, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). Sent to Sean R. Kelly (RMF)
May 11, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to RSM US LLP. (RMF)
May 11, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Diamond Resorts International, Inc. (RMF)
May 11, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Parkway International Owners Association, Inc. (RMF)
May 11, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Bali Condominium Association, Inc.(RMF)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bali Condominium Association, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Parkway International Owners Association, Inc., RSM US LLP with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL 63469) filed by Joseph C. Hatcher, Sandra Ragusa, Rosemary S. Hatcher, Arthur N. Ragusa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(RMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragusa et al v. Bali Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Alexander Quimby
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Crossland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM US LLP
Represented By: W. L. Kirk, Jr.
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkway International Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Huff Potter
Represented By: Houston Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bali Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: James Jeffrey Deery
Represented By: Heidi Marie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary S. Hatcher
Represented By: Michael D. Finn
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Represented By: Sean Richard Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ragusa
Represented By: Michael D. Finn
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Represented By: Sean Richard Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur N. Ragusa
Represented By: Michael D. Finn
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Represented By: Sean Richard Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Hatcher
Represented By: Michael D. Finn
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Represented By: Sean Richard Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?