Regions Bank v. Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Vineel Sompalli, Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC and Sompalli Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 6:2017cv01671
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
2 Judge: T B Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 25 JUDGMENT in favor of Regions Bank against Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC, Sompalli Holdings, LLC, Vineel Sompalli in the amount of $461,070.67 plus $78.51 interest and against Orlando Heart & Vascular Center and Vineel Sompalli in the amount of $98,925.45 plus interest of $16.51 (pursuant to the Joint Stipulation entered at Doc. No. 40 in main case 6:17-cv-1669-Orl-18TBS). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/31/2018. Clerk is directed to CLOSE the case. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
December 4, 2017 Filing 24 ALL FURTHER FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE NUMBER 6:17-cv-1669-ORL-18TBS (DMA)
December 4, 2017 Cases associated: Create association to 6:17-cv-01669-GKS-TBS. (DMA)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE -re #22 Notice (Other) filed by Regions Bank. This case is consolidating into case no. 6:17-cv-1669-Orl-18TBS. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/4/2017. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
December 1, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE by Regions Bank of Joint Motion to Consolidate with Supporting Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Joint Motion to Consolidate with Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Werrenrath, Eric)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties shall SHOW CAUSE why the related actions should not be consolidated. If a party deems consolidation to be appropriate, the party shall file a motion to consolidate within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 11/21/2017. (SC)
November 17, 2017 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Werrenrath, Eric)
October 17, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC, Vineel Sompalli, Sompalli Holdings, LLC.(Cohen, David)
October 11, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC, Vineel Sompalli, Sompalli Holdings, LLC. (Cohen, David)
October 11, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC, Vineel Sompalli, Sompalli Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Cohen, David)
October 5, 2017 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on September 26, 2017 by Regions Bank as to Vineel Sompalli. (Werrenrath, Eric)
October 5, 2017 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on September 26, 2017 by Regions Bank as to Sompalli Holdings, LLC. (Werrenrath, Eric)
October 5, 2017 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on September 26, 2017 by Regions Bank as to Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC. (Werrenrath, Eric)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/4/2017. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
October 3, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Cohen on behalf of Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC, Vineel Sompalli, Sompalli Holdings, LLC (Cohen, David)
October 3, 2017 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:17-cv-01671-Orl-18-TBS. Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick no longer assigned to the case. (DMA)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER transferring case to United States Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2017. (RN)
September 29, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): yes (Werrenrath, Eric)
September 29, 2017 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Regions Bank. (Werrenrath, Eric)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/25/2017. (counsel emailed)(AKJ)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/25/2017. (Counsel emailed)(AKJ)
September 21, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC. (Issued at intake.) (JP)
September 21, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Vineel Sompalli. (Issued at intake.) (JP)
September 21, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Sompalli Holdings, LLC. (Issued at intake.) (JP)
September 21, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JP)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL067088) filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(JP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Eric F. Werrenrath
Represented By: W. Glenn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineel Sompalli
Represented By: David S. Cohen
Represented By: Lee N. Bernbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Heart & Vascular Center, LLC
Represented By: David S. Cohen
Represented By: Lee N. Bernbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompalli Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David S. Cohen
Represented By: Lee N. Bernbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?