Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al v. Orlando Ventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation and Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Defendant: Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., Orlando Ventures, Inc., Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, William W. Howell, Jr., Allan Campbell, Andrea M. Roebuck, Best Defense Law, P.A., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC, Best Defense Law Team, Roderic Lee Boling, III and Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2017cv01771
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying as moot #94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #98 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting #99 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting #100 Motion for Permanent Injunction. The Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Orders (Doc. Nos. 98-1, 99-1, 100-1) are ADOPTED and incorporated herein as a part of this Order. The Court retains jurisdiction over this action, including over the construction, modification, and enforcement of the Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Orders. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/18/2020. (MEH) ctp
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Daniel J. Barsky to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/8/2020. (LAK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel J. Barsky to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Bennington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/8/2020 (DMA).
May 5, 2020 Filing 100 Joint STIPULATION for Entry of Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Defendants, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC, William W. Howell, Jr., Roderic Lee Boling, III, and Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc. by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Quinn, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2020 (SPM). Modified on 5/6/2020 (DMA).
May 5, 2020 Filing 99 Joint STIPULATION for Entry of Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Defendants, Best Defense Law, P.A. and Andrea M. Roebuck by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quinn, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2020 (SPM). Modified on 5/6/2020 (DMA).
May 5, 2020 Filing 98 Joint STIPULATION for Entry of Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Defendants, Allan Campbell and Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC a/k/a Best Defense Law Team by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quinn, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2020 (SPM). Modified on 5/6/2020 (DMA).
April 3, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of settlement affecting claims at issue re #94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Quinn, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2020 (DMA).
March 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSED ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/21/2020. (Baker, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction by Best Defense Law, P.A., Andrea M. Roebuck. (McMahon, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 2, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Entry of Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit E-3, #8 Exhibit E-4A, #9 Exhibit E-4B, #10 Exhibit E-5A, #11 Exhibit E-5B, #12 Exhibit E-6A, #13 Exhibit E-6B, #14 Exhibit E-7, #15 Exhibit E-8, #16 Exhibit E-9, #17 Exhibit E-10, #18 Exhibit E-11, #19 Exhibit E-12, #20 Exhibit F, #21 Exhibit G, #22 Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit I, #24 Exhibit J, #25 Exhibit K, #26 Exhibit L, #27 Exhibit M)(Quinn, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/1/2020 at 8:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (MEH)ctp
February 24, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE canceling Jury Trial Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2020. (MEH) ctp
February 24, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for Trial term commencing on 7/1/2020 at 8:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (MEH)ctp
February 24, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing: Trial Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (MEH) ctp
February 24, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE canceling Final Pretrial Conference Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2020. (MEH)ctp
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/24/2020. (MEH) ctp (MEH).
January 13, 2020 Filing 87 Case transferred back to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:17-cv-1771-ORL-41GJK. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER reassigning this case back to the Honorable Carlos E. Mendoza, with his consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/10/2020. (LAM)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENDORSED ORDER granting #84 Motion to extend time. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures are due January 2, 2020; Defendants' expert disclosures are due February 3, 2020; and the discovery deadline is extended to March 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/3/2019. (LAM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 84 Joint MOTION to extend time to Expert Disclosure and Discovery Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Bennington, Alfred)
April 10, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2019, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2020, Joint final Pretrial statement due by 5/15/2020, All other motions due by 5/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Trial term begins 7/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/1/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/2/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/2/2019 (LMM)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/9/2019. (TKW)
April 8, 2019 Filing 82 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. New case number: 6:17-cv-1771-Orl-31GJK. Judge Carlos E. Mendoza no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/8/2019. (DJD)
January 25, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Best Defense Law, P.A..(McMahon, Gregory)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Order (Doc. 68) directing Defendant Boling to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Responses due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/23/2019. (DJD)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/27/2019, Dispositive motions due by 1/27/2020, Pretrial statement due by 6/9/2020, All other motions due by 5/1/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/29/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/26/2019, Trial Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 7/1/2020 in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/10/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/23/2019. (DJD)
January 23, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Dispositive motions due by 1/27/2020 (JET)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER granting #74 Motion to extend time. The deadlines in this case are continued for 270 days. No additional extensions of time will be granted absent good cause. The parties are permitted to take fifteen depositions per side. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/22/2019. (KMS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Orlando Ventures, Inc..(Wilson, David)
January 18, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL) re #51 MOTION to Dismiss #38 Amended Complaint by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Quinn, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2019 (JET).
December 14, 2018 Filing 74 Joint MOTION to extend deadlines in Case Management and Scheduling Order #24, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion for Scheduling Conference, and permit the parties to take 15 depositions per side by All Parties. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 12/17/2018 (JET).
December 13, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of change of address and firm name by Andrea Roebuck (Roebuck, Andrea) Modified on 12/14/2018 (JET).
December 11, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of change of address by Gregory Paul McMahon (McMahon, Gregory)
December 10, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul McMahon on behalf of Best Defense Law, P.A., Andrea M. Roebuck (McMahon, Gregory)
December 10, 2018 Filing 70 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #38 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrea M. Roebuck.(McMahon, Gregory) Modified on 12/11/2018 (JET).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying #66 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, RODERIC LEE BOLING, III, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 55(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/6/2018. (HMK)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Boling by 12/19/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/5/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 4, 2018 Filing 67 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Roderic Lee Boling, III.(JET)
December 4, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for default Against Defendant, Roderic Lee Boling, III, for No Response re #38 Second Amended Complaint (see #63 Summons returned executed, #39 Summons issued) by All Plaintiffs. (Bennington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 12/5/2018 (JET).
November 21, 2018 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #54 Interested persons order by Andrea M. Roebuck. (Roebuck, Andrea)
November 19, 2018 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #52 Interested persons order by Best Defense Law, P.A.. (Roebuck, Andrea)
November 15, 2018 Filing 63 RETURN of service executed on 11/7/18 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. as to Roderic Lee Boling, III. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 14, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss #38 Amended Complaint filed by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennington, Alfred)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER granting #60 Defendant's Supplement to the Motion for Extension to File Response to the Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Andrea M. Roebuck shall file a response to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/13/2018. (HMK)
November 9, 2018 Filing 60 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/14/18 to File Answer or otherwise respond to Second Amended Complaint by Andrea M. Roebuck. (Roebuck, Andrea) Modified on 11/13/2018 (JET).
November 9, 2018 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #58 Interested persons order by Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc.. (Wilson, David)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Nashville Tennessee Ventures by 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/8/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #53 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/7/2018. (HMK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc..(Wilson, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by David Anthony Wilson on behalf of Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc. (Wilson, David)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Roebuck by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/7/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 6, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 7, 2018, to File Answer or otherwise respond to #38 Amended Complaint by Andrea M. Roebuck. (Roebuck, Andrea) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 11/7/2018 (JET).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Best Defense Law, P.A. by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/5/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 2, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss #38 Amended Complaint by Best Defense Law, P.A. (Roebuck, Andrea) Modified on 11/5/2018 (JET). ORIGINALLY FILED USING EVENT CODE FOR ANSWER.
November 1, 2018 Filing 50 RETURN of service executed on 10/11/2018 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. as to Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc.. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 1, 2018 Filing 49 RETURN of service executed on 10/11/2018 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. as to Best Defense Law, P.A.. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 1, 2018 Filing 48 RETURN of service executed on 10/16/2018 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. as to Andrea M. Roebuck. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 1, 2018 Filing 47 RETURN of service on Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc., on 10/11/18, by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/2/2018 (JET). ORIGINALLY FILED AS PROOF OF SERVICE.
November 1, 2018 Filing 46 RETURN of service as to Best Defense Law, P.A., by service on Administrator, on 10/11/18, by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/2/2018 (JET). ORIGINALLY FILED AS PROOF OF SERVICE.
November 1, 2018 Filing 45 RETURN of service as to Andrea M. Roebuck on 10/16/18 by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/2/2018 (JET). ORIGINALLY FILED AS PROOF of service.
October 29, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Allan Campbell.(Campbell, Allan) Modified on 10/30/2018 (JET).
October 29, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC.(Campbell, Allan) Modified on 10/30/2018 (JET).
October 25, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC.(Wilson, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by William W. Howell, Jr.(Wilson, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #38 Amended Complaint by Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc..(Wilson, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS issued as to Best Defense Law, P.A., Roderic Lee Boling, III, Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc., Andrea M. Roebuck. (JET)
October 8, 2018 Filing 38 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, Allan Campbell, Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC, Andrea M Roebuck, Roderic Lee Boling, III, Best Defense Law, P.A., Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc. filed by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 10/9/2018 (JET).
October 3, 2018 Set/reset deadline: Second Amended Complaint due by 10/10/2018 (JET)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. On or before October 10, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/3/2018. (KMS)
August 29, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Proposed Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, with attached exhibits)(Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 8/30/2018 (JET).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to strike #34 Notice of unavailability filed by Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/25/2018. (DJD)
July 24, 2018 Filing 34 ***STRICKEN*** NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC from May 14, 2019 to June 5, 2019. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 7/25/2018 (JET). STRICKEN PER ORDER #35.
March 26, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of compliance with Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Allan Campbell. (Campbell, Allan) Modified on 3/27/2018 (JET).
March 26, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of compliance with Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC. (Campbell, Allan) Modified on 3/27/2018 (JET).
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Plaintiff, Diamond Resorts Corporation's, Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendants, Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC a/k/a Best Defense Law Team and Allan Campbell, Individually. The parties shall comply with the instructions stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/13/2018. (DWG)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #26 Plaintiff, Diamond Resorts Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/14/2018. (DWG)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Allan Campbell, Esq. has withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Orlando Ventures, Inc., Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC, and William W. Howell, Jr. and is hereby terminated from the case as to those Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/24/2018. (DWG)
January 23, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendants, Allan Campbell, Attorney at Law, LLC aka Best Defense Law Team and Allan Campbell, Individually by Diamond Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail, #2 Exhibit Discovery)(Bennington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 12, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Attorney David Wilson in place of Attorney Allan Campbell by Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC (Campbell, Allan) Modified on 1/12/2018 (JET). (Originally erroneously filed as a Notice rather than a Motion.)
January 11, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Diamond Resorts Corporation. (Bennington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 2, 2018 Filing 25 CASE REFERRED to Mediation; Gary Salzman appointed as Mediator. (SPM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2018, Discovery due by 4/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2019, Pretrial statement due by 9/13/2019, All other motions due by 8/2/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2019, Trial Status Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 10/1/2019 in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/2/2018. (DJD)
December 22, 2017 Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement (Certificate of Interested Persons re #7 Interested Persons Order) by Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, Allan Campbell, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., and William W. Howell, Jr. (Campbell, Allan) Modified on 12/26/2017 (JET).
December 22, 2017 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement (Certificate of Interested Persons re #7 Interested Persons Order) by Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Allan Campbell and Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC. (Campbell, Allan) Modified on 12/26/2017 (JET).
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Order (Doc. 7) directing Defendants to file a certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement. Responses due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/7/2017. (DJD)
December 1, 2017 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 28, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc., Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC.(Campbell, Allan) Modified on 11/29/2017 (JET).
November 28, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, Allan Campbell.(Campbell, Allan) Modified on 11/29/2017 (JET).
November 16, 2017 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 11/14/17 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. as to Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Notice (Doc. 8) requiring participation in the Middle District of Florida's electronic filing system. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/13/2017. (DJD)
November 9, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC. (JET)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #9 Order to Show Cause. In light of Plaintiff's Response (Doc. 13), the Court is satisfied that, facially, diversity jurisdiction has been established. No response from Defendants is required. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/9/2017. (KMS)
November 8, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #9 filed by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/9/2017 (JET).
November 8, 2017 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/9/2017 (JET).
November 6, 2017 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC for Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC.. (Bennington, Alfred)
November 6, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Related case(s): No (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 11/7/2017 (JET).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, Allan Campbell, Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2017. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/27/2017. (DJD)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Allan Campbell to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by 11/6/17. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/23/2017. (DJD) ctp
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/6/2017. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/23/2017. (DJD) ctp
October 23, 2017 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/6/2017. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 10/23/2017. (DJD) ctp
October 20, 2017 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:17-cv-01771-Orl-41-GJK. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (DMA)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/20/2017. (SC)
October 18, 2017 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC, Allan Campbell, Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc., William W. Howell, Jr, Orlando Ventures, Inc..(DMA)
October 12, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed in State Court on 9/1/17. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(JP)
October 12, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2017-CA-008161-O filed in State Court on 09/01/2017. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL67749 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Documents)(JP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al v. Orlando Ventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helping Timeshare Owners, Inc.
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Campbell Attorney at Law, LLC
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Howell, Jr.
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Campbell
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea M. Roebuck
Represented By: Andrea Roebuck
Represented By: Daniel J. Koleos
Represented By: Gregory Paul McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Defense Law, P.A.
Represented By: Andrea Roebuck
Represented By: Daniel J. Koleos
Represented By: Gregory Paul McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timeshare Lawyer Services, LLC
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Defense Law Team
Represented By: Allan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderic Lee Boling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashville Tennessee Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?