Ojito v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Felix Ojito
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida, Orlando Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2018cv01210
Filed: July 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Osceola
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Dismissing Case re #19 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/10/2018. (RMF)
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Felix Ojito (Stoller, David)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Defendants' answer or response due 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/4/2018. (MB)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/10/18 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Mercado-Santana, Victor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 10/4/2018 (RMF).
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Manuel Mercado-Santana on behalf of Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida, Orlando Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security (Mercado-Santana, Victor)
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of compliance re #14 Summons returned executed as to USA Kimberly D. Dean, Orlando Field Office Director by Felix Ojito (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Felix Ojito. Orlando Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of compliance re #12 Summons returned executed as to USA Katherine Baranowski, District Director by Felix Ojito (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Felix Ojito. District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida served on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of compliance re #10 Summons returned executed as to USA L. Francis Cissna, Director by Felix Ojito (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Felix Ojito. Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of compliance re #8 Summons returned executed as to USA Kirstjen N. Nielsen, Secretary by Felix Ojito (Stoller, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Felix Ojito. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Stoller, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Felix Ojito. (Stoller, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Felix Ojito. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/15/2018, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/15/2018. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 8/1/2018. (RMF)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Felix Ojito. (Stoller, David)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Felix Ojito. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida, Orlando Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (ALL)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL075540) filed by Felix Ojito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ojito v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida
Represented By: Victor Manuel Mercado-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Victor Manuel Mercado-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Victor Manuel Mercado-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Victor Manuel Mercado-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Ojito
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?