Classic Soft Trim, Inc. v. Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC," et al
Plaintiff: Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC
Defendant: Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John P. Held, John Donnellan, Ross Albert, Daniel Valencia, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Clearlight Partners Management, LLC and Katzkin Leather, Inc.
Petitioner: Ron Leslie, David Sheffler and Dan McAra
Case Number: 6:2018cv01237
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Paul G Byron
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 389 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Ross Albert, Including Striking Albert's Answer - Oral Argument and Expedited Ruling Requested by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER denying #349 KATZKIN LEATHER'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO JOSEPH JAMES, JR. Mr. James's deposition shall be rescheduled and conducted within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/8/2020. (HMK)
October 5, 2020 reset scheduling order deadlines: Trial Status Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 3/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. (RMF)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER: the Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines #386 is GRANTED, and the Second Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 80)2 is amended as listed in this Order. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/5/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 1, 2020 Filing 386 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #383 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dispositive, #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #28 Case management and scheduling order , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Quimby, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 28, 2020 Filing 385 RESPONSE in Opposition re #373 Second MOTION to Disqualify Counsel / Revoke Pro Hac Vice Admission MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Offering Improper Inducements to Fact Witnesses filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
September 28, 2020 Sealed Document: S-384 (LDJ)
September 24, 2020 Filing 383 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dispositive by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Forrister Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Albert Excerpts)(Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #354 DEFENDANT KATZKIN LEATHER'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC. AND ROADWIRE, LLC ; granting in part and denying in part #355 DEFENDANT KATZKIN LEATHER'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC. AND ROADWIRE, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/22/2020. (HMK)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting #372 DEFENDANTS KATZKIN LEATHER, INC.'S, UNOPPOSED RENEWED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL UNREDACTED DAUBERT MOTION ; granting #379 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL OR REDACT DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL OR ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY. Katzkin shall file an unredacted copy of the Daubert motion, which the Clerk shall accept under seal for the Court's review. Katzkin shall file unredacted copies of Aaron Forrister's deposition and Dr. Kahwaty's expert report under seal, which the Clerk shall accept under seal for the Court's review. The duration of the seal shall be for one year from the date of this order or until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/22/2020. (HMK)
September 21, 2020 Filing 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #16 Declaration of Ross Albert, #17 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ross Albert)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 21, 2020 Filing 379 Unopposed MOTION to Seal or Redact Documents Designated Confidential or AEO by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aaron Forrister)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #342 DEFENDANT, ROSS ALBERT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO NON-PARTIES AT&T AND SPRINT. The subpoenas to AT&T and Sprint are modified to exclude the content of any electronic communications. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/21/2020. (HMK)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #333 KATZKIN LEATHER, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MODIFY NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS TO AT&T AND VERIZON. The subpoenas to AT&T and Verizon are modified to exclude the content of any electronic communications. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/21/2020. (HMK)
September 18, 2020 Filing 376 RESPONSE in Opposition re #367 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rule 702 filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ENDORSED ORDER granting #364 DEFENDANT, ALBERT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH ORDER (#350) ON MOTION TO COMPEL (#302). The deadline to comply with this Court's order on the Motion to Compel is extended to September 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/16/2020. (HMK)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER denying as moot #343 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY DAN MCCLAIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/15/2020. (HMK)
September 14, 2020 Filing 373 Second MOTION to Disqualify Counsel / Revoke Pro Hac Vice Admission, MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Offering Improper Inducements to Fact Witnesses by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 10, 2020 Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted copy of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rule 702 [Dkt. 367] by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 8, 2020 Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #354 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #368 DEFENDANT KATZKIN LEATHER, INC.'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL UNREDACTED DAUBERT MOTION. Prior to the refiling of Defendant's Motion, Plaintiff shall provide a direct response to Defendant regarding whether the relief requested is opposed or unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/8/2020. (HMK)
September 4, 2020 Filing 368 MOTION to Seal Unredacted copy of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rule 702 [Dkt. 367] by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 4, 2020 Filing 367 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rule 702 by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #305 PLAINTIFFS CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC. AND ROADWIRE, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ROSS ALBERT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER PLAINTIFFS' MAY 22, 2020 RULE 34 DEMANDS WITH SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Defendant Ross Albert shall comply and produce the relevant devices for forensic imaging within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. See details in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/2/2020. (HMK)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER denying without prejudice #356 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL OR REDACT DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL OR AEO for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) and this Court's standing order regarding motions to seal or redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/2/2020. (HMK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 364 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/9/20 to Complete Discovery by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 9/2/2020 (LDJ).
August 27, 2020 Filing 363 RESPONSE in Opposition re #349 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Non-Testifying Expert Consultant Joseph James, Jr filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 362 Defendant Katzkin Leather, Inc.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #104 Amended Complaint by Katzkin Leather, Inc..(Howarth, Don)
August 27, 2020 Filing 361 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #104 Amended Complaint by Ross Albert.(Wilson, Courtney)
August 26, 2020 Filing 360 RESPONSE re #357 Notice (Other) filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 359 SUPPLEMENT re #343 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Dan McClain re: Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Subpoena by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
August 25, 2020 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands filed by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Courtney)
August 25, 2020 Filing 357 NOTICE of Compromise by Ross Albert re #342 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Non-Parties, AT&T and Sprint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Courtney) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (LDJ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 356 MOTION to Seal or Redact Documents Designated Confidential or AEO by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 24, 2020 Filing 355 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 24, 2020 Filing 354 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 21, 2020 Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re #342 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Non-Parties, AT&T and Sprint filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER: Defendant has not met its burden to show that Judge Baker's Order #188 was clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Thus, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED the Objections #200 are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/20/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER denying #304 PLAINTIFF ROADWIRE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 34 DEMAND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/18/2020. (HMK)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #302 PLAINTIFF CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC. AND ROADWIRE, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ROSS ALBERT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER PLAINTIFFS' RULE 34 DEMANDS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/18/2020. (HMK)
August 14, 2020 Filing 349 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Non-Testifying Expert Consultant Joseph James, Jr by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 14, 2020 Filing 348 RESPONSE re #345 Supplement filed by Plaintiffs Regarding Motion to Compel (Doc. 304) filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER: Defendant Katzkin Leather, Inc.'s Amended Dispositive Motion to Dismiss #170 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs' second, fifth, sixth, and seventh claims against Katzkin are DISMISSED without prejudice. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED. Defendants Clearlight Partners, LLC's and Clearlight Partners Management, LLC's Amended Joint Dispositive Motion to Dismiss #169 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Clearlight Partners, LLC and Clearlight Partners Management, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate Clearlight Partners, LLC and Clearlight Partners Management, LLC as defendants in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/13/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #290 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. ROBERT KNEUPER'S DAMAGES OPINIONS AND PRECLUDE DR. ROBERT KNEUPER FROM OFFERING EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DAMAGES. Defendants have filed an unredacted version of this motion under seal at Doc. No. 303. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/12/2020. (HMK)
August 12, 2020 Filing 345 SUPPLEMENT re #304 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, Set Three Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(G) Regarding the Status of Meet and Confer Efforts in Support of Motion by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #320 DEFENDANT, ALBERT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL ALBERT #305. The parties shall engage in a substantive meet and confer via telephone or video conference within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Defendant may file a response to the Second Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 305) within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, after the conferral requirement has been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/11/2020. (HMK)
August 10, 2020 Filing 343 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Dan McClain by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 7, 2020 Filing 342 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Non-Parties, AT&T and Sprint by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 6, 2020 Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re #290 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Robert Kneuper's Damages Opinions and Preclude Dr. Robert Kneuper from Offering Expert Testimony on Damages filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER denying #278 DEFENDANT KATZKIN LEATHER'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC. AND ROADWIRE, LLC OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO APPOINT DISCOVERY MASTER OR FACILITATOR. The parties shall engage in a substantive meet and confer via telephone or video conference prior to filing any additional motions related to the requests to produce that are the subject of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/24/2020. (HMK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #320 MOTION to Strike #305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ENDORSED ORDER granting #317 DEFENDANTS CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS AND KATZKIN LEATHER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKEPLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. ROBERT KNEUPER'S DAMAGES OPINIONS (DKT.290). Defendants may file a reply of no more than ten (10) pages within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (HMK)
July 22, 2020 Filing 337 MINUTES: Telephonic Conference re Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Case is called. Counsel state their telephonic appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding Katzkin Leather, Inc.'s Motion to Quash or, in the Alternative, Modify Non-Party Subpoenas. Court orders as follows. After atelephonic hearing with counsel for the moving and opposing parties, the Court orders the motion to quash TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida per FRCP 45(f). The Court finds "exceptional circumstances" as stated on the record. {held on 6/24/2020 in the Central District of California} (MAA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 336 LETTER BRIEF re #335 Memorandum in opposition and #333 MOTION to Quash or Modify filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/23/2020}(MAA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #333 Motion to Quash or Modify filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/22/2020} (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas L. Mahaffey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(MAA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 334 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Katzkin Leather, Inc., Ron Leslie, Dan McAra, David Sheffler {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/12/2020}; #1 Notice of Assignment {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/16/2020); #2 Proof of Service {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/18/2020}; #3 Proof of service {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/18/2020}; #4 Notice of Assignment {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/192020}; #5 Notice of Telephonice Discovery Conference {originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/19/2020} (MAA). Modified on 7/22/2020 (MAA).
July 22, 2020 Filing 333 MOTION to Quash or, in the alternative, MOTION to Modify Non-Party Subpoenas to AT&T and Verizon by Katzkin Leather, Inc., Ron Leslie, David Sheffler, Dan McAra.{originally filed in the Central District of California on 6/12/2020} (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #10 Declaration of Ron Leslie, #11 Proposed Order)(MAA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 22, 2020 Filing 332 TRANSFER IN of associated miscellaneous case from the Central District of California; their case number: 8:20-mc-00011. (copy of CACD docket sheet attached to this entry) (MAA)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ENDORSED ORDER granting #315 DEFENDANT, ALBERT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL #302. Defendant's Response shall be due on or before July 13, 2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/22/2020. (HMK)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #312 DEFENDANTS KATZKIN LEATHER AND CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS' MOTION TO RENEW SEALING[Dkt. 135]. The seal ordered in this Court's previous Order (Doc. No. 135) is renewed for one year from the date of this order or until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/21/2020. (HMK)
July 20, 2020 Filing 329 RESPONSE in Opposition re #316 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against Albert #104 Amended Complaint MOTION to Disqualify Counsel #13 Douglas Mahaffey and Mahaffey Law Group, PC MOTION to Strike #104 Amended Complaint, #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Strike DEF Albert's Deposition filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of David Yarnall)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 20, 2020 Filing 328 NOTICE canceling Final Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 11/17/2020 (RMF)ctp
July 20, 2020 reset scheduling order deadlines: Trial Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. (RMF)
July 17, 2020 Reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 8/24/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/27/2020, Pretrial statement due by 11/29/2020, All other motions due by 11/1/2020 (LDJ)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #298 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER FOR A LIMITED PERIOD OF 60 DAYS. See details in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/17/2020. (HMK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition re #312 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Renew July 19, 2019 Sealing Order [Dkt. 135] filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ENDORSED ORDER denying #318 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/13/2020. (HMK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re #302 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Defendant, Albert's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel filed by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Courtney)
July 11, 2020 Filing 323 OBJECTION re #313 Supplement filed by Plaintiffs Regarding the Status of Meet and Confer Efforts (Dkt. 313). (Howarth, Don)
July 9, 2020 Filing 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re #308 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts and Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Undisclosed Experts, Renewed Pursuant to May 5, 2020 Order [Dkt. 267] filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Dr. Robert Kneuper)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 9, 2020 Filing 321 RESPONSE in Opposition re #307 MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiffs' Damages Claims Not Properly Disclosed, Renewed Pursuant to May 5, 2020 Order [Dkt. 267] filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 9, 2020 Filing 320 MOTION to Strike #305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 9, 2020 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #304 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, Set Three filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Declaration of Elizabeth Chavez)(Howarth, Don)
July 8, 2020 Filing 318 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document : Reply and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Modify the Case Management Order Dkt. 298 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 7, 2020 Filing 317 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Robert Kneuper's Damages Opinions (Dkt. 290) by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 7/8/2020 (LDJ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 316 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against Albert #104 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Disqualify Counsel #13 Douglas Mahaffey and Mahaffey Law Group, PC, MOTION to Strike #104 Amended Complaint, #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Strike DEF Albert's Deposition by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 6, 2020 Filing 315 MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/13/20 to File Response/Reply as to #302 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 7/7/2020 (LDJ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 314 OBJECTION re #295 Notice of pendency of related cases by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
July 3, 2020 Filing 313 SUPPLEMENT re #288 Response in Opposition to Motion, #278 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC, or, in the Alternative, to Appoint Discovery Master or Facilitator by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 312 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Renew July 19, 2019 Sealing Order [Dkt. 135] by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 1, 2020 Filing 311 RESPONSE in Opposition re #298 MOTION to Modify #80 Case management and scheduling order for a limited period of 60 days filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #22 Declaration of Jason Hilliard)(Howarth, Don)
June 29, 2020 Filing 310 RESPONSE in Opposition re #290 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Robert Kneuper's Damages Opinions and Preclude Dr. Robert Kneuper from Offering Expert Testimony on Damages filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 309 NOTICE of Transfer of Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas Filed in the Central District of California by Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (LDJ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 308 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts and Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Undisclosed Experts, Renewed Pursuant to May 5, 2020 Order [Dkt. 267] by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 25, 2020 Filing 307 MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiffs' Damages Claims Not Properly Disclosed, Renewed Pursuant to May 5, 2020 Order [Dkt. 267] by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #301 DEFENDANTS KATZKIN LEATHER AND CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS' MOTION TO RENEW SEALING [Dkt. 135]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/25/2020. (HMK)
June 25, 2020 Filing 305 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiffs' May 22, 2020 Rule 34 Demands by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 25, 2020 Filing 304 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, Set Three by Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 24, 2020 Sealed Document S-303. (MAA)
June 22, 2020 Filing 302 MOTION to Compel Ross Albert to Produce Documents by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 3.04 Statement re Depo Notice, #2 3.04 Statement re Set 3, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 20, 2020 Filing 301 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Renew July 19, 2019 Sealing Order [Dkt. 135] by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #291 DEFENDANTS KATZKIN LEATHER, INC., CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS, LLC, and CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS MANAGEMENT, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/19/2020. (HMK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 299 NOTICE of compliance re #285 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Padraic J. Glaspy by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Glaspy, Padraic)
June 17, 2020 Filing 298 MOTION to Modify #80 Case management and scheduling order for a limited period of 60 days by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #287 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEN ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/17/2020. (HMK)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #228 PLAINTIFF ROADWIRE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 34 DEMAND, AND REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERED FORENSIC EXAMINATION OF CLEARLIGHT PARTNERS, LLC ELECTRONIC DEVICES ; granting in part and denying in part #230 PLAINTIFF ROADWIRE'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 34 DEMAND, AND REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERED FORENSIC EXAMINATION OF KATZKIN LEATHER, INC.'S ELECTRONIC DEVICES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/17/2020. (HMK)
June 16, 2020 Filing 295 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (LDJ).
June 16, 2020 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-16944322 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Padraic J. Glaspy. (Glaspy, Padraic)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER denying #261 NON-PARTY, CLASSIC DESIGNS AUTOMOTIVE, "LLC", MOTION FOR A COURT ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC.'S PAYMENT OF FORENSIC EXAM AND DEPOSITION FEES ; granting in part and denying in part #269 PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR FORENSIC EXAMINATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST NONPARTY FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/15/2020. (HMK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 293 NOTICE to counsel Padraic J. Glaspy of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #273 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE TEN ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS BEYOND THE RULE 30 LIMIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/15/2020. (HMK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 291 MOTION to Seal by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 15, 2020 Filing 290 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Robert Kneuper's Damages Opinions and Preclude Dr. Robert Kneuper from Offering Expert Testimony on Damages by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 14, 2020 Filing 289 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in further support re #281 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
June 12, 2020 Filing 288 RESPONSE in Opposition re #278 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC, or, in the Alternative, to Appoint Discovery Master or Facilitator Opposition filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mahaffey Dec'l, #2 Exhibit Letter to Alvarez, #3 Exhibit Certification, #4 Exhibit Email, 5/29/20, #5 Exhibit Proof, 2/6/20, #6 Exhibit Proof, 3/9/20)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply re #281 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified text on 6/12/2020 (LDJ).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ENDORSED ORDER granting #272 DEFENDANT, ALBERT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. Defendant may respond on or before May 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/11/2020. (HMK)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #284 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/10/2020. (HMK)
June 9, 2020 Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION for Padraic J. Glaspy to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 8, 2020 Filing 283 STATUS report Facilitator's supplemental report by Carolyn Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Alvarez, Carolyn) Modified text on 6/9/2020 (LDJ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 282 Facilitator's Report by Carolyn Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit D)(Alvarez, Carolyn) Modified on 6/5/2020 (DMA). Modified text on 6/9/2020 (LDJ).
June 3, 2020 Filing 281 RESPONSE in Opposition re #273 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion For Leave to Take Ten Additional Depositions Beyond the Rule 30 Limit filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ENDORSED ORDER granting #279 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Meet and Confer Report [Dkt. 267:8] on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel. The report shall be filed on or before June 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/1/2020. (HMK)
May 29, 2020 Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Meet and Confer Report on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 28, 2020 Filing 278 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC, or, in the Alternative, to Appoint Discovery Master or Facilitator by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #10 Declaration of Padraic Glaspy, #11 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Padraic Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 28, 2020 Filing 277 RESPONSE to Motion re #269 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of former Defendants Classic Design Automotive, John Held and John Donnellan and Request for Sanctions for Violation of Court Order Dkt 229 filed by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Composite Exhibit 2, #3 Composite Exhibit 3, #4 Composite Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Finnigan, John)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #262 Motion for attorney fees. Defendants are directed to pay Plaintiffs $7,500.00 in attorney's fees within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/28/2020. (LAK)
May 27, 2020 Filing 275 RESPONSE in Opposition re #269 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of former Defendants Classic Design Automotive, John Held and John Donnellan and Request for Sanctions for Violation of Court Order Dkt 229 filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
May 21, 2020 Filing 274 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 21, 2020. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Wolf, Kay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 273 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion For Leave to Take Ten Additional Depositions Beyond the Rule 30 Limit by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 18, 2020 Filing 272 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/28/20 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 5/19/2020 (LDJ).
May 18, 2020 Reset deadline: Status Report due by 5/29/2020. (LDJ)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ENDORSED ORDER granting #270 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/18/2020. (Baker, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report on Motions to Compel by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 14, 2020 Filing 269 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of former Defendants Classic Design Automotive, John Held and John Donnellan and Request for Sanctions for Violation of Court Order Dkt 229 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 5, 2020 Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition re #261 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Classic Soft Trim, Inc.'s Payment of Forensic Examination and Deposition Fees filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying without prejudice #223 Motion to Strike ; ruling deferred #228 Motion to Compel ; ruling deferred #230 Motion to Compel ; denying without prejudice #242 Motion to Strike ; denying #244 Motion to Compel ; granting in part and denying in part #247 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/5/2020. (LAK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #262 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don)
April 30, 2020 Reset scheduling order deadline: Conduct mediation hearing by 5/22/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (LDJ)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ENDORSED ORDER granting #264 Motion for extension of deadline. No further extensions should be sought absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 4/30/2020. (Baker, David)
April 29, 2020 Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Modify Scheduling Order Extending the Mediation Deadline One Week to May 22, 2020 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 27, 2020 Filing 263 RESPONSE re #257 Objection filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
April 21, 2020 Filing 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 21, 2020 Filing 261 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Classic Soft Trim, Inc.'s Payment of Forensic Examination and Deposition Fees by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Richard Connor CV, #2 Exhibit 2-Richard Connor Invoice 3-24-20, #3 Exhibit 3-Richard Connor Invoice 4-13-20)(Finnigan, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 17, 2020 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Opposition re #247 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Fourth Deposition of Aaron Forrister filed by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Wilson, Courtney)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 It is hereby ORDERED that Kay L. Wolf, Kay L. Wolf Mediation Services, LLC, 801 Silver Drive, Orlando, FL 32804 is appointed as the mediator in this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/16/2020. (RMF)ctp/copy emailed to mediator Kay L. Wolf
April 14, 2020 Filing 258 RESPONSE to Jointly Request Court Appointment of a Mediator re #248 Order on Motion to ModifyOrder on Motion to ExpediteOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on Motion for Leave to File Document to Jointly Request Court Appointment of a Mediator filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don) Modified text on 4/15/2020 (LDJ).
April 13, 2020 Filing 257 OBJECTION re #249 Order on Motion to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
April 10, 2020 Reset deadline as to #247 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Fourth Deposition of Aaron Forrister. Responses due by 4/17/2020 (LDJ)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENDORSED ORDER granting #253 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply ; granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 4/10/2020. (Baker, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #242 MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiffs' Damages Claims Not Properly Disclosed filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
April 9, 2020 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #242 MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiffs' Damages Claims Not Properly Disclosed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 9, 2020 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #247 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Fourth Deposition of Aaron Forrister by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 7, 2020 Filing 252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #244 MOTION to Compel Re-Opening of Deposition of Aaron Forrister filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas L. Mahaffey)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
April 3, 2020 Filing 251 RESPONSE re #238 Objection filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, and Request for Court Ordered Forensic Examination of Katzkin Leather Inc.'s Electronic Devices filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER. #222 Motion to dismiss for violation of court order is denied and Plaintiffs are awarded their fees associated with responding to the Motion. On or before April 7, 2020, Plaintiffs' counsel shall confer with Defendants' counsel via telephone in a good faith effort to agree on the amount of attorney's fees awarded pursuant to this order. If the parties are unable to agree on the amount of attorney's fees, then on or before April 21, 2020, Plaintiffs may file a motion to quantify the fees awarded in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/30/2020. (LAK)
March 27, 2020 reset scheduling order deadlines per Order #248: Discovery due by 6/24/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2020, Conduct mediation hearing by 5/15/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (RMF)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Ruling Seeking Sixty-Day Continuance of all Case Management Order Deadlines #233 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk is directed to extend the Second Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order #80 deadlines as laid out in this Order. ORDER denying as moot #211 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for a Limited Period of 90 Days; denying as moot #239 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion Regarding California Lockdown Orders; denying as moot #246 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Other Notice of Supplemental Material Changes to Facts Supporting Docs. 233, 239, and 241. The parties are DIRECTED to select a mediator and advise this Court of their choice by April 17, 2020 or one will be appointed. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/27/2020. (RMF)
March 27, 2020 Filing 247 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Fourth Deposition of Aaron Forrister by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 25, 2020 Filing 246 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Notice of Supplemental Material Changes to Facts Supporting Motion and Emergency Motion to Extend Deadlines (Dkt. 233, 239) and Request For Telephonic Hearing (DKT. 241) by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Supplemental Material Changes)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 25, 2020 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #241 Request for oral argument filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 24, 2020 Filing 244 MOTION to Compel Re-Opening of Deposition of Aaron Forrister by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 24, 2020 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #228 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, and Request For Court Ordered Forensic Examination of Clearlight Partners, LLC's Electronic Devices filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
March 24, 2020 Filing 242 MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiffs' Damages Claims Not Properly Disclosed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 23, 2020 Filing 241 REQUEST for oral argument by Telephonic Hearing (Expedited Ruling Requested) re #239 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Regarding California Lockdown Orders Justifying Continuing All CMO Deadlines Sixty Days by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 22, 2020 Filing 240 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Regarding California Lockdown Orders Justifying Continuing All CMO Deadlines Sixty Days filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Howarth, Don)
March 20, 2020 Filing 239 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Regarding California Lockdown Orders Justifying Continuing All CMO Deadlines Sixty Days by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 20, 2020 Filing 238 OBJECTION re #226 Order on Motion to Redact TranscriptOrder on Motion to ExpediteOrder on Motion for Protective Order filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, and Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don)
March 20, 2020 Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Expedite Ruling Seeking Sixty Day Continuance of All Case Management Order Deadlines and Existing Filing Deadlines filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Howarth, Don)
March 19, 2020 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re #223 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts and Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Undisclosed Expert Testimony filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration of Dr. Kneuper)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ENDORSED ORDER: The hearing on the Motion for Sanctions (doc. no. 222) scheduled for March 24, 2020 is CANCELLED. The Court will take the matter under advisement based on the record as the parties have created it. The discovery related motions (doc. nos. 223, 228 and 230) will be heard at a telephone conference before the undersigned to be set when briefing is complete. The other pending motions in this case (doc. nos. 169, 170, 211 and 233) remain pending before the presiding District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/19/2020. (Baker, David)
March 18, 2020 Filing 234 RESPONSE re 231 Order no pdf filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 233 MOTION to Expedite Ruling Seeking Sixty Day Continuance of All Case Management Order Deadlines and Existing Filing Deadlines by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 18, 2020 Filing 232 RESPONSE re 231 Order no pdf Regarding the Evidentiary Hearing set for March 24, 2020 filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ENDORSED ORDER: Recognizing the uncertainties associated with travel and the rapidly changing guidance as to the advisability of public gatherings during the current National Emergency, the Court is inclined to continue the evidentiary hearing currently scheduled for March 24, 2020. The parties are ORDERED to confer forthwith and then to file by 9:00 a.m. EST Thursday March 19, 2020, a brief statement as to their respective positions as to whether the hearing should go forward as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/18/2020. (Baker, David)
March 14, 2020 Filing 230 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, and Request for Court Ordered Forensic Examination of Katzkin Leather Inc.'s Electronic Devices by Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 3.04 Statement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #196 Motion to Compel ; granting in part and denying in part #197 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/11/2020. (LAK)
March 10, 2020 Filing 228 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand, and Request For Court Ordered Forensic Examination of Clearlight Partners, LLC's Electronic Devices by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 10, 2020 Filing 227 NOTICE of hearing on #222 MOTION to Dismiss for Violation of Court Order. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A Baker. (LAK)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying #203 Motion to redact transcript; granting #205 Motion to lift AEO designation and expedite; granting in part and denying in part #216 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 3/6/2020. (LAK)
March 6, 2020 Filing 225 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 3/6/2020 re #196 MOTION to Compel Non-Parties to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC, #205 MOTION to Expedite Ruling Based on Magistrate Judge Baker's Order Dated January 15, 2020 and Lift AEO Designations filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., #203 MOTION to Redact #186 Transcript filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc., #197 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of Non-Parties' Electronic Devices and to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Digital) (PML)
March 5, 2020 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Action for Violation of Court Order filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas L. Mahaffey, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 223 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts and Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Undisclosed Expert Testimony by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzelle M. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 4, 2020 Filing 222 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Action for Violation of Court Order by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 4, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE of hearing on motions #203 MOTION to Redact, #205 MOTION to Expedite,#196 MOTION to Compel,#216 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order,#197 MOTION to Compel. Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A Baker. (LAK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 220 OBJECTION re #219 Supplement to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Howarth, Don)
March 2, 2020 Filing 219 SUPPLEMENT re #216 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and to Modify Dkt 199 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 218 RESPONSE in Opposition re #216 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and to Modify Dkt 199 filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
February 26, 2020 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #211 MOTION to modify Scheduling Order for a Limited Period of 90 Days filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 24, #22 Exhibit 25, #23 Exhibit 26, #24 Exhibit 27, #25 Exhibit 28, #26 Exhibit 29, #27 Exhibit 30, #28 Exhibit 31, #29 Exhibit 32, #30 Exhibit 33, #31 Exhibit 34, #32 Exhibit 35, #33 Exhibit 36, #34 Exhibit 37, #35 Exhibit 38, #36 Exhibit 39, #37 Exhibit 40, #38 Exhibit 41)(Howarth, Don)
February 26, 2020 Filing 216 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and to Modify Dkt 199 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #207 Motion to Compel ; granting #214 Motion to Withdraw motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 2/24/2020. (Baker, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #207 MOTION to Compel Clearlight Partners, LLC to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 21, 2020 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 MOTION to Compel Clearlight Partners, LLC to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
February 19, 2020 Filing 212 SUPPLEMENTAL as to Certification of Counsel Regarding the Status of Meet and Confer Efforts re #196 MOTION to Compel Non-Parties to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena , #197 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of Non-Parties' Electronic Devices and to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Quimby, Paul) Modified on 2/20/2020 (LDJ).
February 12, 2020 Filing 211 MOTION to modify Scheduling Order for a Limited Period of 90 Days by All Plaintiffs. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
February 11, 2020 Filing 210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION to Expedite Ruling Based on Magistrate Judge Baker's Order Dated January 15, 2020 and Lift AEO Designations filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ENDORSED ORDER granting #208 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 2/10/2020. (Baker, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Exhibits A-T from Dkt 205 by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 207 (WITHDRAWN per Endorsed Order re 215) MOTION to Compel Clearlight Partners, LLC to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand by Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 2/25/2020 (LDJ).
February 6, 2020 Filing 206 RESPONSE re #200 Objection filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 205 MOTION to Expedite Ruling Based on Magistrate Judge Baker's Order Dated January 15, 2020 and Lift AEO Designations by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index)(Exhibits A-T removed per 209 Order) (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Modified on 2/11/2020 (LDJ).
February 6, 2020 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #203 MOTION to Redact #186 Transcript filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 203 MOTION to Redact #186 Transcript by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Tomas Glaspy)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 5, 2020 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of Non-Parties' Electronic Devices and to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena filed by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held. (Finnigan, John)
February 5, 2020 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION to Compel Non-Parties to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena filed by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held. (Finnigan, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 200 OBJECTION re #188 Order on motion to compel . (Howarth, Don)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ENDORSED ORDER granting #198 Motion to modify deposition schedule. Provided, this extension shall not be relied upon for seeking extension of any other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 1/28/2020. (Baker, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION to modify order to extend deposition dates re #188 Order on motion to compel by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 1/28/2020 (LDJ).
January 23, 2020 Filing 197 MOTION to Compel Forensic Examination of Non-Parties' Electronic Devices and to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas L. Mahaffey in support, #2 Exhibit A to Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Decl.)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 23, 2020 Filing 196 MOTION to Compel Non-Parties to Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 21, 2020 Filing 195 NOTICE of intent to request redaction by Don Howarth re #186 Transcript (Howarth, Don)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying #192 Renewed Emergency Motionto Stay Magistrate's Discovery Order #188 Pending Objections to that Order. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/17/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 17, 2020 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 Renewed Emergency MOTION to stay re #188 Order on motion to compel Magistrate's Discovery Order Pending Objections to that Order filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 16, 2020 Filing 192 Renewed Emergency MOTION to stay re #188 Order on motion to compel Magistrate's Discovery Order Pending Objections to that Order by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Wilson, Courtney) Modified on 1/17/2020 (LDJ).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying without prejudice #189 Emergency Motion to Stay Magistrate's Discovery Order Pending Objections to that Order. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/16/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 16, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 Emergency MOTION to stay Magistrate's Discovery Order (DOC. 188) Pending Objections to That Order filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
January 16, 2020 Filing 189 Emergency MOTION to stay Magistrate's Discovery Order (DOC. 188) Pending Objections to That Order by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Wilson, Courtney)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #157 Motion to Compel ; granting in part and denying in part #158 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 1/15/2020. (LAK)
January 15, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters. (NLP)
January 15, 2020 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, continuation of hearing held 1/3/2020 held on January 9, 2020 before Judge David A. Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nikki Peters,Telephone number courttranscripts@outlook.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 2/5/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2020. (NLP)
January 9, 2020 Filing 185 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 1/9/2020 re #158 First MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC, #157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (PML)
January 6, 2020 Filing 184 NOTICE of Hearing re: #158 MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels , #157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 08:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A Baker. (LAK)
January 6, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather L. Jewett. (HLJ)
January 6, 2020 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Defendant Katzkin Leather's Motion to Compel #157 and Plaintiff Classic Soft Trim's Motion to Compel #158 held on 01/03/2020 before Judge David A. Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Jewett, RPR, FCRR, heatherjewett.focr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2020. (HLJ)
January 3, 2020 Filing 181 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 1/3/2020 re #158 First MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC, #157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (digital) (KKA)
December 24, 2019 Filing 180 SUPPLEMENTAL Filing Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g) Regarding the Status of Parties' Meet and Confer Efforts [Dkt. No. 158] by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 12/26/2019 (LDJ).
December 10, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE of hearing on motions #158 MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels , and #157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A Baker. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to meet in person in advance of the hearing (rooms are available adjacent to the Courtroom foyer for this purpose) at 9:00 a.m.(LAK)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #168 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Thirty Day Continuance of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Supplemental Opposition to Re-Filed Motions to Dismiss because Plaintiffs filed their Memorandum in Opposition (Doc. 172) on October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/1/2019. (RAJ)
October 31, 2019 Sealed Document: S-177 (BIA)
October 30, 2019 Filing 176 RESPONSE re #173 Declaration, #172 Memorandum in opposition filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kim, #2 Declaration of Ronald Leslie, #3 Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
October 30, 2019 Sealed Document: S-175 (BIA)
October 30, 2019 Sealed Document: S-174 (BIA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 173 DECLARATION of Douglas L. Mahaffey re #172 Memorandum in opposition by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #169 Motion to dismiss, #170 Motion to dismiss filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ENDORSED ORDER granting #167 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw Doc. Nos. 163 and 164 and striking #163 Plaintiffs' Opposed MOTION for Temporary Stay or Continuance of the Court's Consideration of the Pending Motions to Dismiss and For Leave to File Supplemental Brief and #164 Douglas L. Mahaffey's Declaration in Support thereto from the docket. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/25/2019. (RAJ)
October 24, 2019 Filing 170 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huy Quang Dang Vu, #2 Declaration of Peter Kim, #3 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry)(Howarth, Don)
October 24, 2019 Filing 169 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huy Quang Dang Vu, #2 Declaration of Peter Kim, #3 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry)(Howarth, Don)
October 23, 2019 Filing 168 OPPOSED MOTION for 30 day continuance of Plaintiff's Deadline to file Supplement Oppositions to re-filed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 10/24/2019, to edit docket title. (SPB).
October 23, 2019 Filing 167 First MOTION to Withdraw #163 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Stay and Continuance of the Court's Consideration of the Pending Motion to Dismissal and For Leave to File Supplemental Brief, #164 Declaration by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #158 First MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Manassero, #2 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry, #3 Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #17 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Directing Compliance: Defendant ClearLight Partners, LLC's and Defendant ClearLight Partners Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #114 is STRICKEN from the docket. Defendants may amend their Motions to Dismiss to adhere to the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida within seven days. Defendant Katzkin Leather, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #115 is STRICKEN from the docket. Defendant may amend its Motion to Dismiss to adhere to the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida within seven days. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum #148 is STRICKEN from the docket. Plaintiffs may amend their Supplemental Memorandum within five days of the amended motion to dismiss filings to abide by Judge Kelly's Order #145 and the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida. Defendants' Response #151 is STRICKEN from the docket. Defendants may amend their Response within five days of Plaintiff's amended supplemental memorandum filing to abide by Judge Kelly's Order #145 and the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida. This Court will sua sponte strike from the record any further pleadings that fail to adhere to Local Rules 1.05(a), 3.01(a), 3.01(d) of the Middle District of Florida, or otherwise. Further failures to abide by the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/22/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 22, 2019 Filing 164 (STRICKEN per Endorsed Order re 171)DECLARATION of Douglas L. Mahaffey re #163 Memorandum in opposition by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 10/25/2019 (RMF).
October 22, 2019 Filing 163 (STRICKEN per Endorsed Order re 171)Opposed MOTION for Temporary Stay and Continuance of the Court's Consideration of the Pending Motion to Dismissal and For Leave to File Supplemental Brief re #135 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion to Seal filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 10/23/2019 (BIA). Modified on 10/25/2019 (RMF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Affidavit)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ENDORSED ORDER granting #159 Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' motion to compel on or before October 21, 2019. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs' motion to compel on or before October 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/15/2019. (HMK)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #74 Clearlight Partners LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and denying as moot Katzkin Leather, Inc.'s #77 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/15/2019. (RAJ)
October 10, 2019 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Pending Motions by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 1, 2019 Filing 158 First MOTION to Compel Lifting of Attorney's Eyes Only Labels by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conf. Agreement and Stip. Prot. Order, #2 Exhibit Clearlight's Conf. Agreement, #3 Exhibit Notice of Depo of CST, #4 Exhibit Notice of Depo. Roadwire, #5 Exhibit Email Corr. M&C Exchange)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 30, 2019 Filing 157 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions and Responses to Written Discovery by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #25 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #26 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #27 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #28 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #29 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #30 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #31 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #32 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #33 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #34 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #35 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #36 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 27, 2019 Sealed Document: S-156 (BIA)
August 26, 2019 Sealed Document: S-155 (BIA)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED ORDER granting #149 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Expedited Order to Seal Six More Documents Produced by Defendants and File Them in Support of Supplemental Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Request for Order Shortening Time for Defendants to Respond. Plaintiffs may file the additional documents identified as CLP 0000036, CLP 0000111, CLP 0000162, CLP 00000182, Katzkin 000891-892, and Katzkin 00912 under seal as well as file an unredacted copy of the related supplemental opposition under seal and the Clerk is directed to accept such filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/26/2019. (HMK)
August 22, 2019 Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION for leave to file under seal six additional documents in support of #148 SUPPLEMENTAL Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re 123 Response in Opposition filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
August 20, 2019 Sealed Document: S-152 (BIA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 151 RESPONSE re #148 SUPPLEMENTAL Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re #123 Response in Opposition filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kim, #2 Declaration of Ronald Leslie, #3 Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) STRICKEN pursuant to #165 Order (SPB).
August 13, 2019 Sealed Document: S-150 (BIA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 149 MOTION for leave to file under seal six additional documents in support of #148 SUPPLEMENTAL Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re 123 Response in Opposition by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 8/14/2019 (AC).
August 12, 2019 Filing 148 SUPPLEMENTAL Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re #123 Response in Opposition by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mahaffey)(Quimby, Paul) Modified on 8/13/2019 (DMA). STRICKEN pursuant to #165 Order(SPB).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying #134 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL KATZKIN LEATHER INC. TO PRODUCE UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER PLAINTIFFS' RULE 34 DEMAND BASED ON VIOLATION OF JUDGE KELLY'S MARCH 13, 2018 STANDING ORDER WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/12/2019. (HMK)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #127PLAINTIFF ROADWIRE'S MOTION TO COMPEL KATZKIN LEATHER INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER PLAINTIFF'S RULE 34 DEMAND. Katzkin shall provide documents responsive to requests 1-5 and 7 to Roadwire within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/9/2019. (HMK)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #139 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CONCURRENTLY FILED WITH PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE THE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF UNDER SEAL ; granting #140 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER CONCURRENTLY FILED WITH PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental memorandum in opposition to the Motions to Dismiss of no more than ten (10) pages within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Defendants shall be permitted to file a response to Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum of no more than ten (10) pages within seven (7) days from service of Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum. Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted supplemental memorandum under seal, and the Clerk shall accept the same. Plaintiffs shall file a redacted supplemental memorandum in the public docket. Defendant shall file an unredacted response to Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum under seal, and the Clerk shall accept the same. Defendant shall file a redacted response to the supplemental memorandum in the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/5/2019. (HMK)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ENDORSED ORDER denying #138 Plaintiff Roadwire, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/5/2019. (HMK)
August 5, 2019 Filing 143 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:18-cv-1237-Orl-78GJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 142 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Concurrently Filed with Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File the Supplemental Brief Under Seal filed by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Howarth, Don)
August 1, 2019 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 134 MOTION filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
July 31, 2019 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Court Order Concurrently Filed with Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 8/1/2019 (AC).
July 31, 2019 Filing 139 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Concurrently Filed with Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File the Supplemental Brief Under Seal by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 8/1/2019 (AC).
July 30, 2019 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 134 MOTION by Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 7/31/2019 (AC).
July 24, 2019 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 MOTION to Compel Katzkin Leather Inc to Produce Unredacted Documents Requested per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand Based on Violation of Judge Kelly's March 13, 2018 Standing Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry, #2 Declaration of Don Howarth, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Don Howarth, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
July 22, 2019 Filing 136 OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification Regarding Conditional Motion to Seal re #133 Response re #132 Certificate of counsel. (Howarth, Don) Modified on 7/23/2019 (AC). Modified on 7/23/2019 (AC).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #128 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OR CONTINUANCE OF THE COURT'S CONSIDERATION OF THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS BASED ON PLAINTIFFS' PLANNED SUBMISSION OF A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS ; granting in part and denying in part #131 CONDITIONAL MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. The Court's consideration of the pending Motions to Dismiss shall be stayed for a period of 30 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for leave to file supplemental oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss within 14 days from the date of this Order. ClearLight Documents CLP 0000006-9, 0000018, 0000062, 0000070, 0000200, 0000021, 0000071, 0000083, 0000098, 000164-65, 0000219, 0000379, 0000414-417, and 000042; and Katzkin documents 000888, 000889 (alternately identified as 000899), 902, 914, shall be filed under seal with this Court. The duration of the seal shall be for one year from the date of this order or until further order of this Court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/19/2019. (HMK)
July 18, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION to Compel Katzkin Leather Inc to Produce Unredacted Documents Requested per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand Based on Violation of Judge Kelly's March 13, 2018 Standing Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 7/19/2019 (AC).
July 18, 2019 Filing 133 RESPONSE re #132 Certificate of counsel filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 132 CERTIFICATION of counsel re #131 Conditional MOTION to Seal Documents Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g) by Don Howarth on behalf of Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 7/18/2019 (AC).
July 11, 2019 Filing 131 Conditional MOTION to Seal Documents by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Robert Manassero, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Brooks Mayberry, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 7/12/2019 (AC).
July 11, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION to stay re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint or, the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Howarth, Don)
July 2, 2019 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION to Compel Katzkin Leather Inc. to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth)(Howarth, Don)
June 28, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to stay re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint or, the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mahaffey)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel Katzkin Leather Inc. to Produce Documents Requested Per Plaintiff's Rule 34 Demand by Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED ORDER vacating 125 Endorsed Order striking Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Clearlight Partners and Clearlight Partners Management's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Katzkin Leather's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/4/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 VACATED PER 126 ORDER ENDORSED ORDER striking Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Clearlight Partners and Clearlight Partners Management's Motion to Dismiss #123 and Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Katzkin Leather's Motion to Dismiss #124 for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(b). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/4/2019. (SCM) Modified on 6/4/2019 (GNB).
May 13, 2019 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #115 Motion to dismiss filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ENDORSED ORDER granting #121 Motion for Leave to File Superseding Amended Opposition Briefs. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/10/2019. (JRJ)
May 9, 2019 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION Requesting Leave to File Superseding, Amended Opposition Briefs to Katzkin's and Clearlight's Motions To Dismiss and to Withdraw Prior Oppositions filed at Docket Nos. 119 and 120 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2019 (AC).
May 7, 2019 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #115 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Alternative Request to Allow Plaintiffs to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery; Declaration of Douglas L. Mahaffey filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 5/8/2019 (AC).
May 7, 2019 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #114 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Alternative Request to Allow Plaintiffs to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 5/8/2019 (AC).
May 2, 2019 Filing 118 Non-Parties NOTICE of compliance re #109 Order on motion to compel by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held (Finnigan, John) Modified on 5/3/2019 (AC).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER granting #112 Defendant, Albert's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the Second Amended Complaint within fourteen days of the Court's disposition of Katzkin and Clearlight's pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/24/2019. (HMK)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #103 Motion to Strike and Disregard Declarations Doc. Nos. 98-100 Submitted in Support of Defendants Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend or Alternatively to Allow Plaintiffs to Complete Pending Discovery as to Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/24/2019. (HMK)
April 23, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint or, the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huy Quang Dang Vu, #2 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry, #3 Declaration of Peter Kim)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 4/24/2019 (BIA). STRICKEN pursuant to #165 Order (SPB).
April 23, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC, Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huy Quang Dang Vu, #2 Declaration of Brooks Mayberry, #3 Declaration of Peter Kim)(Howarth, Don) STRICKEN pursuant #165 Order (spb).
April 23, 2019 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Clearlight Partners Management, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Katzkin Leather, Inc., Other Affiliate Clearlight Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate CLP Auto Interior Corporation, Other Affiliate Westec Security Group, Inc. for Clearlight Partners Management, LLC.. (Howarth, Don)
April 22, 2019 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #104 Amended Complaint by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 18, 2019 Filing 111 SUMMONS issued as to Clearlight Partners Management, LLC. (MAA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 110 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #86 PLAINTIFF CLASSIC SOFT TRIM INC.'S MOTION [TO] COMPEL NON-PARTIES CLASSIC DESIGN AUTOMOTIVE LLC, JOHN HELD, AND JOHN DONELLAN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW.)CDA, Held, and Donellan shall comply with the subpoenas and produce documents responsive to requests 1, 2, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order at the location previously stated on the subpoenas at a time mutually agreeable to the parties. The parties shall comply with this Court's standing order regarding confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/12/2019. (HMK)
April 10, 2019 Filing 108 Joint Opposition in RESPONSE re #103 MOTION to Strike #98 Declaration, #99 Declaration, #100 Declaration filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 4/11/2019 (AC).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #94 PLAINTIFFS, CLASSIC SOFT TRIM, INC.'S AND ROADWIRE, LLC'S, COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS KATZKIN AND CLP'S RULE 12 MOTIONS, AND THEIR MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE, COMBINED WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The proposed Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 104) shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/10/2019. (HMK)
April 9, 2019 Filing 106 RESPONSE re #105 Notice of Commencement of Action in California filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Howarth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MAA).
April 8, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Commencement of Action in the Central District of California for Discovery and Notice of Lodgment of Notice of Hearing in the Central District of California on the Motion to Compel Between Plaintiffs Classic Soft Trim, Inc. and Roadwire, Inc. and Defendant ClearLight Partners, LLC by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice filed in Central District)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 4/9/2019 (AC).
April 5, 2019 Filing 104 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Ross Albert, Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc., Clearlight Partners Management, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC.(Mahaffey, Douglas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Strike #98 Declaration, #99 Declaration, #100 Declaration by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 4 in support)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting #101 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Replace Doc. No. 94-2 with Revised Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the Revised Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/3/2019. (HMK)
April 2, 2019 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Replace Doc. No. 94-2 with Revised Second Amended Complaint by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Second Amended Complaint)(Mahaffey, Douglas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Peter Kim re #97 Response in Opposition to Motion by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 28, 2019 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Brooks Mayberry re #97 Response in Opposition to Motion by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 28, 2019 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Huy Quang Dang Vu re #97 Response in Opposition to Motion by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 28, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Combined Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions and Their Motion for Change of Venue filed by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part #95 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Doc. 94-2 from the docket. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/18/2019. (MMW)
March 17, 2019 Filing 95 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remove Doc 94-2 from public filing and MOTION to Seal Doc 94-2 re #94 MOTION for leave by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 3/18/2019 (DMA).
March 15, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Combined Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions and Their Motion for Change of Venue by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 March 14 email exchange, # 2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint***REMOVED PER #96 ORDER**)(Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 3/19/2019 (DMA).
March 14, 2019 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 Amended MOTION to Compel Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held. (Finnigan, John)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #89 Motion for Reinstatement of Amended Complaint. The Court's March 6, 2019, Order (Doc. #87) is VACATED. The Amended Complaint (Doc. #35) is REINSTATED. The Court extends Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' dismissal motions to Friday, March 15, 2019. To the extent Plaintiffs seek to file an Amended Complaint (Doc. #89, p. 2), they shall file a motion to amend in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/13/2019. (JRJ) Modified/Regenerated on 3/13/2019 (DMA).
March 12, 2019 Filing 91 REPLY re #90 RESPONSE re #89 Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Comply with the Court's March 6, 2019, Order by Filing a Second Amended Complaint, and Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement of Amended Complaint and for a Proposed Track Three Case Management Order Amended Schedule filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 3/13/2019 (DMA).
March 12, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE re #89 Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Comply with the Court's March 6, 2019, Order by Filing a Second Amended Complaint, and Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement of Amended Complaint and for a Proposed Track Three Case Management Order Amended Schedule by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Howarth, Don) Modified on 3/13/2019 (DMA).
March 12, 2019 Filing 89 Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Comply with the Court's March 6, 2019, Order by Filing a Second Amended Complaint, and Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement of Amended Complaint and for a Proposed Track Three Case Management Order Amended Schedule by Roadwire, LLC (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 3/13/2019 (DMA).
March 6, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/13/2019 (DMA)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER of re-designation. This case is hereby converted to a Track Three. All parties must comply with the requirements established in Local Rule 3.05 for Track Three cases. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 **VACATED PER #92 ORDER** ORDER granting #74 #77 Motions to Dismiss. The #35 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Wednesday, March 13, 2019, Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint. Failure to timely file will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice as to Defendants ClearLight Partners, LLC, and Katzkin Leather, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2019. (JRJ) Modified on 3/13/2019 (DMA).
March 1, 2019 Filing 86 Amended MOTION to Compel Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena Duces Tecum by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #68 Plaintiff Class Soft Trim Inc.'s Motion to Compel Non-Parties Classic Design Automoti[v]e LLC, John Held. and John Donellan to Produce Documents Requested per Subpoena Duces Tecum (With Supporting Memorandum of Law) as duplicative second motion with all exhibits was filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/28/2019. (HMK)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying #71 PLAINTIFF CLASSIC SOFT TRIM INC.'S MOTION COMPEL NON-PARTIES CLASSIC DESIGN AUTOMOTI[V]E LLC, JOHN HELD. AND JOHN DONELLAN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/28/2019. (HMK)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENDORSED ORDER granting #82 Defendants Katzkin Leather and Clearlight Partners' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Select a Mediator. The parties shall select a mediator within fourteen (14) days from the entry of an order resolving the pending motions to dismiss filed by Defendants Katzkin and Clearlight. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/26/2019. (HMK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Select a Mediator by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 9.04, the parties are DIRECTED to advise the Court of the chosen mediator within 14 days of this Order or one will be appointed. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/21/2019. (MMW)
February 12, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/21/2020 (DMA)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/12/2019. (MMW)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER granting #73 motion to amend/correct. A second amended case management and scheduling order will follow. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/12/2019. (MMW)
February 12, 2019 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Brooks Mayberry re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Brooks Mayberry re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Howarth, Don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Huy Quang Dang Vu re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Howarth, Don)
February 12, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners, LLC. (Howarth, Don)
February 11, 2019 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Report Expert Exchange Date by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 72 CASE REFERRED to Mediation (Mediator: TBD). (DMA)
February 1, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/20/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/21/2019, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/27/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Discovery due by 4/24/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020, Pretrial statement due by 9/30/2020, All other motions due by 10/1/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 12/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (DMA)
February 1, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Compel MOTION COMPEL NON-PARTIES CLASSIC DESIGN AUTOMOTICE LLC, JOHN HELD. AND JOHN DONELLAN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/1/2019. (MMW)
February 1, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/1/2019. Court Reporter: Heather L. Jewett (GNB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel Produce Documents Requested Per Subpoena Duces Tecum by All Plaintiffs. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 31, 2019 Filing 67 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Howarth, Don) Modified on 2/1/2019 (DMA).
January 31, 2019 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Clearlight Partners, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Westec Security Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Katzkin Leather, Inc., Other Affiliate Katzkin Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate CLP Auto Interior Corporation for Clearlight Partners, LLC.. (Howarth, Don)
January 28, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 1:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4B before Judge Paul G. Byron. The parties shall call 888-363-4735 five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 3126210. Security Code: 020119. The parties shall be prepared to discuss Track III consideration, and shall meet and confer (telephonically is permitted) in an attempt to agree upon case management deadlines. The parties should attempt to draft a Case Management Report prior to the hearing.(GNB) copies e-mailed
January 24, 2019 Filing 64 Defendant Ross Albert's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #35 Amended Complaint by Ross Albert.(Wilson, Courtney)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER granting #62 Defendants Katzkin Leather, Inc. and Clearlight Partners, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendants Katzkin and Clearlight shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint on or before February 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/23/2019. (HMK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time through and including February 12, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #35 Amended Complaint by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Howarth, Don) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/22/2019 (DMA).
January 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. of Acceptance of Service of First Amended Complaint (Howarth, Don)
January 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of compliance re #57 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice for Tomas Glaspy by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Glaspy, Tomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of compliance re #57 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice for Suzelle M. Smith by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Smith, Suzelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of compliance re #57 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice for Don Howarth by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Howarth, Don)
January 16, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Don Howarth, appearing on behalf of Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL079958.) Related document: #54 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Don Howarth to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
January 16, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Suzelle Smith, appearing on behalf of Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL079958.) Related document: #56 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Suzelle Smith to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
January 16, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Tomas Glaspy, appearing on behalf of Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL079958.) Related document: #55 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Tomas Glaspy to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 DEFENDANTS' AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT ; granting #55 DEFENDANTS' AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT; granting #56 DEFENDANTS' AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/15/2019. (HMK)
January 14, 2019 Filing 56 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Suzelle Smith to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/15/2019 (DMA).
January 14, 2019 Filing 55 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Tomas Glaspy to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/15/2019 (DMA).
January 14, 2019 Filing 54 AMENDED Unopposed MOTION for Don Howarth to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/15/2019 (DMA).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED ORDER granting #46 Katzkin Leather's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Objections to Order on Motion to Compel. Defendant Katzkin shall file any objections to the Court's Order on the Motion to Compel on or before January 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (HMK)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #49 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (HMK)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #48 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (HMK)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #47 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/11/2019. (HMK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Don Howarth to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 11, 2019 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Suzelle M. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 11, 2019 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Tomas S. Glaspy to appear pro hac vice by Clearlight Partners, LLC, Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 11, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #37 Order on motion to compel by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
January 10, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Katzkin Leather, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Katzkin Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate CLP Auto Interior Corporation, Other Affiliate Westec Security Group, Inc. for Katzkin Leather, Inc... (Wilson, Courtney)
January 10, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Wilson, Courtney)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Defendant Ross Albert's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint on or before January 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/10/2019. (HMK)
January 10, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time through and including January 24, 2019 to File Answer re #35 Amended Complaint by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/10/2019 (DMA).
January 8, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order; re 36 Order by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 1/9/2019 (DMA).
January 8, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice; re 36 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC. Related case(s): no (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 1/9/2019 (DMA).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Katzkin Leather's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Comply with Order on Motion to Compel. Defendant shall comply with this Court's order on or before January 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 1/8/2019. (HMK)
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to comply with the Court's Order (Doc. 37) by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Wilson, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #26 PLAINTIFF CLASSIC SOFT TRIM INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY KATZKIN LEATHER INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED PER SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/28/2018. (HMK)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER directing plaintiff Roadwire, LLC and defendant Katzkin Leather, Inc. to file a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(d) and a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. See Docs. #8 and #9 for required forms. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/28/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 27, 2018 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Injunctive Relief Sought against Ross Albert, Katzkin Leather, Inc, Clearlight Partners, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Classic Soft Trim, Inc., Roadwire, LLC (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Modified on 12/28/2018 (DMA).
December 26, 2018 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/27/2018 (DMA)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 PLAINTIFF CLASSIC SOFT TRIM'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES AND CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/26/2018. (HMK)
December 5, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #32 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K. Shaughnessy's Letter)(Wilson, Courtney)
November 21, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #26 Motion to Compel State Court Subpoena filed by Katzkin Leather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brooks Mayberry)(Wilson, Courtney)
November 14, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by Ross Albert re #28 Case management and scheduling order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Part 2 State Court Documents)(Wilson, Courtney) Modified on 11/15/2018 (DMA).
November 9, 2018 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT Rule 3.01(G) Certification of Entry into Confidentiality Agreement and Failure of Third Party Katzkin to File a Motion for Protective Order by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email)(Quimby, Paul)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 11/21/2018, Discovery due by 4/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2019, Pretrial statement due by 8/2/2019, All other motions due by 9/6/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Byron, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/8/2018. (HMK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2018. Court Reporter: Heather L. Jewett (KKA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Katzkin Leather to Produce Documents w/Supporting Memo of Law by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Subpoena, #3 Exhibit C - Aug. 2, 2018 Corresp., #4 Exhibit D - Aug. 23, 2018 Email, #5 Exhibit E - Oct. 16, 2018 Email, #6 Exhibit F - Nov. 6, 2018 Corresp.)(Quimby, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Rule 16 Conference hearing is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: for 11/7/2018 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (DMA)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF OCTOBER 31, 2018 RULE 16 CONFERENCE UNTIL THE WEEK OF NOVEMBER 5, 2018. The Rule 16 conference is rescheduled to Wednesday, November 7, 2018 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/25/2018. (HMK)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of 10/31/18 Rule 16 Conference until the week of November 5, 2018 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Quimby, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2018 (DMA).
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 10/31/2018 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (DMA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Rule 16 Conference. On WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 31, 2018, at 9:00A.M., the undersigned will hold a Rule 16 Conference in Courtroom No. 3C, 401 W. Central Boulevard, Orlando, FL 32801. Lead counsel must attend in person. Counsel shall be prepared to address all matters necessary to prepare a plan for the orderly and efficient disposition of this matter; and the parties shall be prepared to address all case management deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/23/2018. (HMK)
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wilson, Courtney)
October 15, 2018 Set/reset deadlines: Case management report due by 10/22/2018 (DMA)
October 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. The Case Management Report shall be submitted on or before October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/14/2018. (JRJ)
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Ross Albert. (Alter, Lindsay)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Compliance with Order Approving Admission of Douglas L. Mahaffey re: #13 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Mahaffey, Douglas) Modified on 10/10/2018 (ALL).
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Ross Albert. (Wilson, Courtney)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roadwire, Inc. for Classic Soft Trim, Inc... (Quimby, Paul)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Quimby, Paul)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas L. Mahaffey. Mr. Mahaffey is directed to comply with the instructions stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/14/2018. (DWG)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER regarding #7 Notice of Request for Removal from CM/ECF Notifications and Service List. The Clerk is directed to terminate Krista A. Sivick, Esq. from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/14/2018. (DWG)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ross Albert. Related case(s): no (Wilson, Courtney) Modified on 8/15/2018 (DMA).
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Douglas L. Mahaffey to appear pro hac vice by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Quimby, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 9, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Douglas L. Mahaffey, appearing on behalf of Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL075939.). (JP)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/9/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/9/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION/NOTICE of Request for Removal from CM/ECF Notifications and Service List by Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Quimby, Paul) Modified on 8/7/2018 (DMA).
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander Quimby on behalf of Classic Soft Trim, Inc. (Quimby, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal filed in State Court on 07/17/2018 by Daniel Valencia (DMA)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal filed in State Court on 05/31/2018 by Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held (DMA)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 10/25/2017 by Ross Albert.(DMA)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ross Albert, Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,", John Donnellan, John P. Held, Daniel Valencia with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 8/22/2017 by Classic Soft Trim, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2)(DMA)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Orange County, case number 2017-CA-007700-O filed in State Court on 8/22/2017. Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL075644 filed by Ross Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Classic Soft Trim, Inc. v. Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC," et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Designs Automotive, "LLC,"
Represented By: John M. Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Held
Represented By: John M. Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Donnellan
Represented By: John M. Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Albert
Represented By: Courtney B. Wilson
Represented By: Lindsay Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearlight Partners, LLC
Represented By: Courtney B. Wilson
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Tomas S. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearlight Partners Management, LLC
Represented By: Courtney B. Wilson
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Tomas S. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Represented By: Lindsay Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katzkin Leather, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney B. Wilson
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Tomas S. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Represented By: Lindsay Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Classic Soft Trim, Inc.
Represented By: Krista A. Sivick
Represented By: Kevin W. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Paul Alexander Quimby
Represented By: Douglas L. Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadwire, LLC
Represented By: Kevin W. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Paul Alexander Quimby
Represented By: Douglas L. Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ron Leslie
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Sheffler
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dan McAra
Represented By: Padraic J. Glaspy
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Suzelle M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?